Briscoe v Pennymac Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Akkima Dannielle Briscoe
Defendant: Pennymac Services, LLC, Harold Smith and Sharon Smith
Case Number: 2:2022cv00267
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Replevin & Conversion
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the complaint and to consolidate cases (Doc. #21) because the Court dismissed without prejudice this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction (Doc. #16; Doc. #19; Doc. #21). If Plaintiff wishes to pursue her claims, then she should file a new civil action under a new case number and pay the filing fee or move to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/13/2022. (CMC)
June 10, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend Complaint, MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Akkima Dannielle Briscoe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jmc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 2, 2022 Filing 20 JUDGMENT (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JK)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDERED: This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly, terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/31/2022. (AEH)
May 24, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend Complaint #1 by Akkima Dannielle Briscoe. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(jmc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. 2 copies of "Motion to Amended Complaint"
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED: Akkima Dannielle Briscoe's pro se paper (Doc. #1) seeking a permanent injunction is DENIED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Briscoe may file an amended complaint by May 24, 2022. Failure to do so will result in the Court closing this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/10/2022. (AEH)
May 9, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Akkima Dannielle Briscoe. (jmc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
May 9, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Seal Case by Akkima Dannielle Briscoe. (jmc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
May 9, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Knowledge of Fact of Akkima Briscoe by Akkima Dannielle Briscoe. (jmc)
May 9, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Trust by Akkima Dannielle Briscoe (jmc)
May 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of change of address by Akkima Dannielle Briscoe. Address updated. (jmc)
May 5, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Pennymac Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company, LLC, Other Affiliate PennyMac Financial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate PNMAC Holdings, Inc. for Pennymac Services, LLC. (Cardenal, Daniel)
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Pennymac Services, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Cardenal, Daniel)
May 3, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Replevin for Return of Property by Akkima Dannielle Briscoe. (jmc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (jmc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2022: #1 Supplement) (jmc).
April 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William P. Heller on behalf of Pennymac Services, LLC (Heller, William)
April 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Cardenal on behalf of Pennymac Services, LLC (Cardenal, Daniel)
April 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin E. Hekkanen on behalf of Pennymac Services, LLC (Hekkanen, Justin)
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 MISCELLANEOUS CASE 2:22-mc-7 transferred to civil docket. All further proceedings are to be docketed in civil case number 2:22-cv-267-SPC-MRM. (jmc)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Upon review of the initial pro se filing in this matter, the court finds that the clerk should not have accepted any of the papers as a foreign judgment to be registered with this court and that a miscellaneous action for judgment-enforcement proceedings should not have been opened. The clerk is therefore DIRECTED to terminate all motions and scheduled events in this matter, close the miscellaneous file, convert it to a civil action, and assess plaintiff $353 for the deficiency in the required filing fee (the plaintiff erroneously paid a $49 filing fee when this matter was opened). By May 9, 2022, plaintiff shall either pay the remaining $353 balance or file a motion to proceed without prepaying fees or costs (AO Form 239). A failure to timely pay the balance of the filing fee or seek permission to proceed without paying it will result in the dismissal of this action. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/25/2022. (GSK)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Writ of Assistance) by Akkima Dannielle Briscoe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Foreign Judgment)(jmc)
April 20, 2022 FEES Paid by Akkima Dannielle Briscoe (Filing fee $49.00, Receipt Number FTM015782). (SPB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briscoe v Pennymac Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akkima Dannielle Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennymac Services, LLC
Represented By: Justin E. Hekkanen
Represented By: Daniel Cardenal
Represented By: William P. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?