Taylor Morrison, Inc. v. Ricardo De Camps
Plaintiff: Taylor Morrison, Inc.
Defendant: Ricardo De Camps
Case Number: 2:2022cv00313
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kyle C Dudek
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
2 Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Kyle C Dudek. New case number: 2:22-cv-313-SPC-KCD. Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy no longer assigned to the case. (LMF)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 06/14/2022 by Taylor Morrison, Inc. as to Ricardo De Camps. (Cula, Steven)
May 13, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Civil Action Order by Taylor Morrison, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Taylor Morrison Home Corporation for Taylor Morrison, Inc. (Cula, Steven)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Steven S. Cula on behalf of Taylor Morrison, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Steven S. Cula. (Cula, Steven)
May 12, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Ricardo De Camps. (JK)
May 12, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Steven S. Cula of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
May 12, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/12/2022. (JK)
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-0313-JES-MRM. (SJB)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ricardo De Camps with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19559707) filed by Taylor Morrison, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Cula, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor Morrison, Inc. v. Ricardo De Camps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Morrison, Inc.
Represented By: Steven S. Cula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo De Camps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?