Zelonka et al v. Gyarmati et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Zelonka and Joan Carrillo
Defendant: Benedict Gyarmati and Tibor Gyarmati
Case Number: 2:2022cv00347
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Benedict Gyarmati, Tibor Gyarmati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dehaan, Elizabeth)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER directing the Clerk to strike discovery notice (Doc. #15). Discovery notices shall not be filed with the court as a matter of course. Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(1)(A). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 7/11/2022. (GSK)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STRICKEN -- NOTICE of mandatory initial disclosures by Stephen Zelonka (Abel, Andrew) Modified to reflect Stricken per 16 Order on 7/11/2022 (JK).
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Dehaan, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Joan Carrillo, Stephen Zelonka. (Abel, Andrew)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Abel, Andrew) Modified as to docket text on 6/30/2022 (JK).
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Benedict Gyarmati, Tibor Gyarmati. (Dehaan, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 7/12/2022. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 22347. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE to counsel Randall L. Spivey of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/2/2022. (JK)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #6 Complaint with Jury Demand by Benedict Gyarmati, Tibor Gyarmati. Filed in STATE Court 04/27/2022.(JK)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Benedict Gyarmati, Tibor Gyarmati with Jury Demand filed by Stephen Zelonka, Joan Carrillo. Filed in STATE Court on 02/14/2022.(JK)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:22-cv-0347-JES-NPM. (SJB)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Benedict Gyarmati, Tibor Gyarmati. Related case(s): No (Dehaan, Elizabeth)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Dehaan on behalf of Benedict Gyarmati, Tibor Gyarmati (Dehaan, Elizabeth)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Elizabeth Dehaan on behalf of Benedict Gyarmati, Tibor Gyarmati. Lead Counsel: Elizabeth A. Dehaan. (Dehaan, Elizabeth)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Collier County Circuit Court, case number 2022-CA-000249 filed in State Court on 02/14/2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19632798 filed by Tibor Gyarmati, Benedict Gyarmati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 State Court COMPLAINT, #10 State Court ANSWER, #11 State Court Docket Sheet, #12 State Court Other Documents, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dehaan, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zelonka et al v. Gyarmati et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Zelonka
Represented By: Randall L. Spivey
Represented By: Andrew William Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Carrillo
Represented By: Randall L. Spivey
Represented By: Andrew William Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benedict Gyarmati
Represented By: Elizabeth Dehaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tibor Gyarmati
Represented By: Elizabeth Dehaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?