Zurich American Insurance Company v. Arizona Discount ATV
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Arizona Discount ATV and Arizona Discount ATV, LLC a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as Fat Tire Golf Scooter
Case Number: 2:2022cv00371
Filed: June 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Alexis Marie Costello on behalf of Arizona Discount ATV, LLC. Lead Counsel: Shawn Gillispie. (Costello, Alexis)
July 22, 2022 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Costello, Alexis)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER. On June 17, the Court directed Defendant to show cause why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (Doc. #6). Based on Defendant's supplement (Doc. #15), the Court is satisfied with jurisdiction and will take no further action on its Order at this time. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/1/2022. (KRH)
June 30, 2022 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT re #1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Collier, case number 11-2022-CA-000843 filed by Arizona Discount ATV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application by Foreign Corporation, #2 Exhibit 2 - State of Colorado New Admission, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Kurt Budday, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Diane Budday)(Costello, Alexis) Modified as to docket text and entry relationship on 7/1/2022 (JK).
June 30, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company for Zurich American Insurance Company. (Stevens, Theodore)
June 30, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Zurich American Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Stevens, Theodore) Modified as to docket text on 6/30/2022 (JK).
June 22, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Arizona Discount ATV, LLC. Related case(s): No (Costello, Alexis)
June 22, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Civil Action Order by Arizona Discount ATV, LLC. (Costello, Alexis) Modified as to docket text and entry relationship on 6/23/2022 (JK).
June 22, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Arizona Discount ATV, LLC.(Costello, Alexis)
June 22, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Arizona Discount ATV, LLC (Costello, Alexis) Modified as to docket text on 6/23/2022 (JK).
June 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2022 at 10:20 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 7/25/2022. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 22371. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
June 17, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore A. Stevens on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company (Stevens, Theodore)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED: Defendant must SUPPLEMENT the Notice of Removal (Doc. #1), on or before June 30, 2022, to show cause why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Failure to comply with this Order will result in remand of the case without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/17/2022. (AEH)
June 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
June 16, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/16/2022. (JK)
June 15, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Arizona Discount ATV, LLC filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Filed in STATE Court on 05/20/2022.(JK)
June 15, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:22-cv-0371-SPC-NPM. (SJB)
June 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 20th Judicial Circuit, case number 11-2022-CA-000843 filed in State Court on 06/15/22. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19678443 filed by Arizona Discount ATV. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT , #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Costello, Alexis) Modified to remove duplicate docket text on 6/16/2022 (JK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Arizona Discount ATV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Bernard Stevens
Represented By: Theodore A. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Discount ATV
Represented By: Alexis Marie Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Discount ATV, LLC a Foreign Limited Liability Company doing business as Fat Tire Golf Scooter
Represented By: Julie Clark Ireland
Represented By: Alexis Marie Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?