Hirani v. Marceno, et al
Plaintiff: Arti Hirani, Esq.
Defendant: Sheriff Carmine Marceno, Lee County Corrections Department and Does 1-5
Case Number: 2:2023cv00923
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Kyle C Dudek
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Filing 17 JUDGMENT dismissing the action without prejudice (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JK)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice (Doc. #15). Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) allows a plaintiff to dismiss an action voluntarily before the opposing party serves an answer or a motion for summary judgment. The dismissal is effective upon filing and requires no further act by the Court. See Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, deny all pending motions as moot, terminate all deadlines, and close the case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/14/2023. (NMC)
November 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Arti Hirani, Esq. (Garcia, Benjamin)
October 26, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Benjamin C. Garcia and John William Dill of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
October 25, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (ECF 1-1 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Pages 37-48) by Lee County Corrections Department, Carmine Marceno. (Jisa, Adriana)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #7) because Defendants have withdrawn it. (See Doc. #11). Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/25/2023. (NMC)
October 24, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of motion re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Carmine MarcenoLee County Corrections Department by Lee County Corrections Department, Carmine Marceno (Jisa, Adriana)
October 24, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2023 at 09:30 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. Case Management Report due by 12/4/2023. Zoom instructions will be sent via separate email to counsel of record. (CGW)
October 23, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Lee County Corrections Department, Carmine Marceno. (Jisa, Adriana)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER. Defendant's disclosure statement (Doc. #6) was improperly filed as a pending motion. Thus, the Court moots the document's status as a pending motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 10/23/2023. (BLW)
October 23, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ECF1-1 (Pages 37-48), Plaintiff's Amended Complained refiled as ECF-4, by Lee County Corrections Department, Carmine Marceno. (Jisa, Adriana)
October 23, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3.03 by Lee County Corrections Department, Carmine Marceno. (Jisa, Adriana) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek.
October 23, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Adriana Mihaela Jisa on behalf of Lee County Corrections Department, Carmine Marceno. Lead Counsel: Adriana M. Jisa. (Jisa, Adriana)
October 23, 2023 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Arti Hirani, Esq. (Filed in State Court on 10/11/2023.)(ABC)
October 23, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/23/2023. (CGW)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:23-cv-923-SPC-KCD. (AA)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Arti Hirani, Esq. v. Carmine Marceno, in his official Capacity as Sheriff of Lee County, case number 2023-CA-0004877 filed in State Court on 3/22/2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21376988 filed by Lee County Corrections Department, Carmine Marceno, in his official capacity as Sheriff of Lee County, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Composite Exhibit A-Docket and State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B-Civil Cover Sheet)(Jisa, Adriana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirani v. Marceno, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arti Hirani, Esq.
Represented By: Benjamin C. Garcia
Represented By: John William Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Carmine Marceno
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County Corrections Department
Represented By: Adriana Mihaela Jisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?