Moreno v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Anna Moreno
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2023cv01066
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 plaintiff's application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs. The court has reviewed the application submitted by plaintiff under 28 U.S.C. 1915 and finds plaintiff qualifies to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed without paying the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/14/2023. (JMM)
November 22, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Anna Moreno. Related case(s): No (Avard, Carol)
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Anna Moreno. (Avard, Carol)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE: Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) became effective on December 1, 2022. The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules also apply to this proceeding except to the extent they are inconsistent with the supplemental rules. The Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases entered on December 7, 2021, no longer applies. The parties must review the supplemental rules to determine the governing deadlines, including the deadline to file the plaintiff's brief, the Commissioner's brief, and the plaintiff's reply brief. (GL)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/22/2023. (WRW)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:23-cv-01066-NPM. (JG)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Anna Moreno. (Avard, Carol)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. The plaintiff CONSENTS to jurisdiction of the United States magistrate judge filed by Anna Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Avard, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Moreno
Represented By: Mark V. Zakhvatayev
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nadine DeLuca Elder
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?