Gomez v. Smart Endeavors ABA, LLC
Plaintiff: Valentina Gomez
Defendant: Smart Endeavors ABA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv01069
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 14 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Smart Endeavors ABA, LLC.(Orr, Douglas)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond. By January 8, 2024, defendant must respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/29/2023. (TLP)
December 28, 2023 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Smart Endeavors ABA, LLC. (Orr, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified on 12/29/2023 to edit docket text (JDR).
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Smart Endeavors ABA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Smart Endeavors ABA LLC for Smart Endeavors ABA, LLC. (Orr, Douglas)
December 18, 2023 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 12/7/2023 by Valentina Gomez as to Smart Endeavors ABA, LLC. (Gunter, Jason)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of compliance re 3 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Valentina Gomez (Foley, Conor)
November 28, 2023 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Valentina Gomez. (Gunter, Jason)
November 28, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jason L. Gunter on behalf of Valentina Gomez. Lead Counsel: Jason L. Gunter, Esq. (Gunter, Jason) Modified text on 11/29/2023 (MCB).
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/27/2023. (WRW)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Smart Endeavors ABA, LLC. (AJS) (AJS).
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Conor Foley and Jason L. Gunter of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Conor Foley of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:23-cv-1069-JLB-NPM. (AA)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smart Endeavors ABA, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21488453) filed by Valentina Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Gunter, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Smart Endeavors ABA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentina Gomez
Represented By: Conor Foley
Represented By: Jason L. Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart Endeavors ABA, LLC
Represented By: Douglas A. Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?