Rodriguez v. Go Florida Investments, Inc.
Plaintiff: Irene Rodriguez
Defendant: Go Florida Investments, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01101
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FLSA FAST-TRACK SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/8/2024. (JGG)
January 8, 2024 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Go Florida Investments, Inc.. (Boy, Suzanne)
January 8, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Go Florida Investments, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Boy, Suzanne)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Suzanne Makayla Boy on behalf of Go Florida Investments, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Suzanne Boy. (Boy, Suzanne)
January 4, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Go Florida Investments, Inc..(Boy, Suzanne)
December 22, 2023 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 12/14/2023 by Irene Rodriguez as to Go Florida Investments, Inc. (Yormak, Benjamin)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/1/2023. (WRW)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Go Florida Investments, Inc. (EAM)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:23-cv-01101-JES-NPM. (TRF)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Benjamin H. Yormak on behalf of Irene Rodriguez. Lead Counsel: Benjamin H. Yormak, Esq.. (Yormak, Benjamin)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Irene Rodriguez. (Yormak, Benjamin)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Irene Rodriguez. Related case(s): No (Yormak, Benjamin)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Go Florida Investments, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21508344) filed by Irene Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Yormak, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Go Florida Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Rodriguez
Represented By: Benjamin H. Yormak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Florida Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Suzanne Makayla Boy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?