Brise v. Loving Hands Home Health Agency, Inc.
Plaintiff: Verlande Brise
Defendant: Loving Hands Home Health Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv01145
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FLSA FAST-TRACK SCHEDULING ORDER: See order for court deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/22/2024. (AEH)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond. By February 6, 2024, defendant must respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/22/2024. (TLP)
January 19, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Loving Hands Home Health Agency, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Shulby, Todd)
January 19, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Civil Action Order by Loving Hands Home Health Agency, Inc.. (Shulby, Todd)
January 19, 2024 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Loving Hands Home Health Agency, Inc.. (Shulby, Todd) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
January 19, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd W. Shulby on behalf of Loving Hands Home Health Agency, Inc. (Shulby, Todd)
January 16, 2024 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 1/2/2024 by Verlande Brise as to Loving Hands Home Health Agency, Inc. (Yormak, Benjamin)
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/8/2023. (WRW)
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Loving Hands Home Health Agency, Inc.. (JDR)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:23-cv-1145-SPC-NPM. (RLK)
December 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Benjamin H. Yormak on behalf of Verlande Brise. Lead Counsel: Benjamin H. Yormak, Esq.. (Yormak, Benjamin)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Verlande Brise. (Yormak, Benjamin)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Verlande Brise. Related case(s): No (Yormak, Benjamin)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Loving Hands Home Health Agency, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21535951) filed by Verlande Brise. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Yormak, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brise v. Loving Hands Home Health Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verlande Brise
Represented By: Benjamin H. Yormak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loving Hands Home Health Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Todd W. Shulby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?