Family Foot and Leg Center PA v. Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Family Foot and Leg Center PA
Defendant: Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services and Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Case Number: 2:2024cv00004
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (Doc. #18). The Notice is self-executing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); Matthews v. Gaither, 902 F.2d 877, 880 (11th Cir. 1990) (per curiam). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and motions and close the file. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 1/29/2024. (AMB)
January 25, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Family Foot and Leg Center PA (Larsen, Edward)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 motion for special admission of attorney Lau. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/5/2024. (JMM)
January 4, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE by Family Foot and Leg Center PA (Larsen, Edward)
January 4, 2024 Filing 15 PROPOSED Temporary Restraining Order re: #3 Verified MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Family Foot and Leg Center PA (SMG)
January 4, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Yat Fai Lau to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21624056 for $150 by Family Foot and Leg Center PA. (Larsen, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER. On January 3, 2024, Plaintiff filed the Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (the "Motion") (Doc. #3). The Motion seeks a temporary retraining order on an ex parte basis. However, the Motion does not comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1)(B) which requires a certification by Plaintiff's attorney of any efforts made to give notice to Defendants and the reason why it should not be required. The Motion is also deficient in that it fails to comply with M.D. Fla. L. R 6.01(b)(2), which requires a supplemental legal memorandum indicating why notice is impractical, and M.D. Fla. L. R 6.01(a)(5) because the Motion does not include a proposed order. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to STRIKE the Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #3). Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 1/4/2024. (AMB)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward L. Larsen on behalf of Family Foot and Leg Center PA. Lead Counsel: Edward L. Larsen. (Larsen, Edward)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services and U.S. Attorney (AJS)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Edward L. Larsen of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
January 4, 2024 Filing 9 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/4/2024. (WRW)
January 3, 2024 Filing 8 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-00004-JLB-NPM. Motion(s) REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (JG)
January 3, 2024 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Family Foot and Leg Center PA. (Larsen, Edward)
January 3, 2024 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Family Foot and Leg Center PA. (Larsen, Edward)
January 3, 2024 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Family Foot and Leg Center PA. (Larsen, Edward)
January 3, 2024 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Family Foot and Leg Center PA. (Larsen, Edward)
January 3, 2024 Filing 3 STRICKEN per Order 13- Verified MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Time Sensitive by Family Foot and Leg Center PA. (Larsen, Edward) Modified on 1/4/2024 to edit docket text and notified chambers (JDR). Modified on 1/4/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
January 3, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet filed by Family Foot and Leg Center PA.(Larsen, Edward) Modified on 1/4/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
January 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Family Foot and Leg Center PA (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21618188) filed by Family Foot and Leg Center PA.(Larsen, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Family Foot and Leg Center PA v. Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Foot and Leg Center PA
Represented By: Edward L. Larsen
Represented By: Yat Fai Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrator, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?