Campbell v. State of Florida et al
Petitioner: Remoi Campbell
Respondent: State of Florida, Linda Doggett, Brenda Forman, Amira D. Fox and Carmine Marceno
Case Number: 2:2024cv00070
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Kyle C Dudek
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Remoi Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. (AA).
March 7, 2024 Filing 17 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #16 Notice of Appeal. (JK)
March 4, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #14 Order on Motion to Compel by Remoi Campbell. Filing fee not paid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(JK)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Hearing / Conference. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 2/23/2024. (BGS)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 2/20/2024. (BGS)
February 8, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel by Remoi Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KME) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek.
February 5, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Rehearing by Remoi Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AM)
January 23, 2024 Filing 11 JUDGMENT in favor of Respondents against Petitioner dismissing petition without prejudice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JK)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing case. 1. Petitioner Remoi Campbell's petition #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. 2. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, deny any pending motions as moot, terminate any deadlines, and close this case. 3. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to provide Petitioner blank copies of the forms for filing habeas corpus petitions under 28 U.S.C. 2241 (AO 242) and 28 U.S.C. 2254 (AO 241). Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 1/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 AO 241 Petiton Under 2254, #2 AO 242 Petition Under 2241)(BGS)
January 22, 2024 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER for all incarcerated pro se litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/22/2024. (CGW)
January 22, 2024 Filing 8 CIVIL Action Order for Confined Plaintiff. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/22/2024. (CGW)
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Dudek. New Case Number: 2:24-cv-70-JLB-KCD. (SMG)
January 19, 2024 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:24-cv-00019. File received electronically
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Fort Myers Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 01/19/2024. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Population Information Detail) (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2024.]
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2024.]
January 19, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus, #3 MOTION for Writ of Common Law Certiorari. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2024.]
January 16, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Writ of Common Law Certiorari, by REMOI CAMPBELL. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2024.]
January 16, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus, by REMOI CAMPBELL. (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2024.]
January 16, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by REMOI CAMPBELL. (No service copies, no IFP motion or fee received.) (alb) [Transferred from flnd on 1/19/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. State of Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Remoi Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda Doggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brenda Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Amira D. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carmine Marceno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?