In Re: MDL - 1698 American General Life & Accident Insurance Co. Retiree Benefits ERISA litigation Featured Case
Defendant: American General Life & Accident Insurance Company
Consol Plaintiff: Eleanor M. Acres, Shirley R. Acuff, Margaret R. Allen, John S. Andreason, Sr., Ruth S. Atkinson, John A. Banks, Mary A. Barber, Ethel P. Barnes, Loyselle W. Barrs, Warren J. Beckley, Joy M. Behr, Charles A. Bell, Sr., James L. Bell, Vivian S. Bennett, James F. Bilderback, Virginia L. Bilderback, Shirley M. Bilheimer, Frances H. Blake, Horace E. Booth, S. Colleen Borklund, Clifford W. Bozeman, Michael E. Braswell, William L. Brooks, Sidney D. Brown, Minnie Lou Bullington, Robert M. Butler, Paul Byrd, Erna V. Cable, Milagros C. Cabrera, Frances B. Carrera, Nicholas V. Carrera, Sr., George F. Carswell, Jr., Nancy E. Cassidy, Anita R. Cates, Jeanette E. Cavannaugh, Lynn Chalmers, William C. Chambers, Sr., Ian M. Charlton, Charles E. Clark, Evelyn C. Clay-Woodard, Floyd E. Clevenger, Jr., Charles R. Clouse, Mary L. Cole, Morris F. Coleman, Forest B. Combs, Winfred L. Costine, Ronald A. Cox, Nancy M. Crenshaw, Roy N. Crews, Rubye T. Crews, Arthur T. Criswell, Emma Lee Purcell Crumpton, Thomas B. Culbreth, Dorothy E. Culpepper, Jay L. Daugherty, Elmer T. Dawkins, David P. Day, James G. Day, Ana R. De Leon, Willie D. Dewitt, Annie S. Dilmore, Joyce L. Dipatri, Joan Dresslar, Richard P. Dresslar, James E. Dugan, Harold A. Duprey, Dorothy Y. Ellerbe, Harold H. Ellerbe, Armand R. Emanuel, George P. Escobio, Floyd Evans, June A. Falls, Frances E. Fernley, Edward L. Forrest, Janice J. Freeman, Harry A. French, Elmer B. Frost, Jr., Paul D. Frye, Fernan A. Garess, Melvin J. Garyn, Patricia E. Gast, Donald P. Gatewood, Harvey C. George, Ella Mae Gibson, William V. Gifford, Howard Gilbert, Roberta J. Gimbel, Graham Gore, Jaunelle C. Grace, Kathryn C. Grover, Irma C. Guilmette, James R. Guthrie, Harold K. Harlow, James B. Harris, Lorraine H. Hatcher, Andrew J. Hayes, Mildred Hebert, Virginia H. Heidtman, Mary E. Henry, Catherine M. Hess, Donald E. Hill, James Hobbs, Spessard D. Holland, Thomas C. Hollingsworth, Rhonda G. Holt, Jackie M. Horne, Kevin E. Howell, Sr., Elizabeth S. Hughes, LLoyd A. Hurst, June C. J. Hyer, George T. Inglett, Robert H. Ivey, William D. Jackson, Jr., Vernell A. Johnson, Carol J. White, Elmer G. Kates, Jr., Julian B. Kirkland, Sr., Raymond D. Kitchens, John J. Kowal, Mary S. Kuyrkendall, Annette W. Lang, Ellen F. Leslie, Marvin Locke, Wylodine F. E. Long, Madelaine Lopez, Marie Y. Lupato, Charlotte A. Luten, Judith C. Lynch, Lucy M. Lynch, Kathleen M. Main, Ralph J. Marlow, Sr., John A. Mathis, Jr., Tom N. Mathis, Gladys M. Maxwell, Milton R. Mays, Richard L. McAdams, Sr., Roscoe L. McCulley, Gerlad P. McGovern, Eva H. McHenry, Anna A. McIntosh, Robert F. Melillo, William F. Melillo, Doyle E. Melton, Robert A. Miller, Sarah F. Mills, Frances B. Mizzell, Joe D. Mobley, Sr., William L. Moraca, Edna E. Morrison, Lucille C. Morrison, William K. Mouro, William R. Norton, Sr., Helen K. Odom, Billy Ottenberg, Julian W. Pafford, Doris D. Card, June K. Partin, John E. Pate, Ruth P. Paulk, Donald R. Peak, Maurice L. Perkins, James D. Perry, Betty L. Phillips, William J. Phillips, Jr., Mildred V. Philyaw, Katheryn L. Pisanelli, Samuel E. Poole, Catherine E. Powell, Lorene J. Pryor, Otto L. Quick, Christine M. Rawles, Herman E. Reeves, Mildred N. Renfroe, Owen M. Revels, John W. Rice, Jr., Ursula V. Rice, Doris M. Rizer, Marilyn D. Roaf, John B. Robinson, Jr., Margie Roche, Brenda C. Rochester, Joseph E. Rodrigue, Robin L. Roundtree, Roy J. Rutherford, Martha R. San-Martin, Glorida K. Sauwdens, Anthony J. Schleman, Lester W. Seaborn, Jr., Geraldine Selph, Roger O. Shepard, Jr., Robert W. Sheppard, William M. Sisco, John J. Sittie, Jean T. Smith, Lonnie G. Smith, Roy E. Smith, William A. Smith, Jr., Billy C. Smoak, Richard K. Snyder, Lydia V. Sockwell, Florine T. Solano, Arthur D. Stabile, Ronald F. Stanford, William T. Stinson, Ray J. Stone, Nancy M. Storch, Marcelle Suggs, Arthur A. Swanigan, Margaret R. Taylor, Robert L. Taylor, John W. Thompson, Leslie O. Thompson, Opal D. Thompson, Samuel H. Thompson, Frederick S. Thranhardt, Robert G. Topper, Josephine B. Townsend, Arthur S. Upton, Evelia Vilardebo, Linzie L. Walker, Willie Walker, Iris Wall, Lorraine E. Wallace, Norma J. Ward, Sharon K. Warren, Louis A. Washer, Dorothy L. Watson, Johnny W. Watson, Vesta M. Watson, Barbara N. Wedekind, Mary A. G. Wells, Leroy Westberry, Gettis L. White, John D. Williams, Larry W. Williams, Martha J.C. Williams, Thomas D. Williams, Marvin E. Wilson, William C. Woodham, Jr., Madeline J. Woodward, Marilyn C. Wright, Henrietta T. Wyndham, Ernestine Wynn, Reginald W. Yancy, Claude D. Yarborbough, Sr., Barbara J. Zeigler, Evelyn S. Hamrick, Diana L. McDougall, Diane L. McDougall, June Appling, Bertha L. Avant, Edward Gilbert Ayres, Helen L. Bailey, Norman B. Baity, Lola M. Baker, Myrtle Baker, Metz L. Barnes, Sr., Robert D. Bass, Iva O. Beard, Paul J. Bell, Paul Thurmond Beshers, Sr., Dane F. Branson, Doris C. Breland, Walter Britton, Paul B. Bullington, Virginia Carmichael, Loyd S. Carter, Arthur T. Carver, Edward W. Cavin, Aileen M. Clark, Joe W. Collier, Marjorie A. Collins, Gayle S. Davis, Joanne Davis, John Lawrence Dubose, Paul Frye, Lennie C. Giddens, Phyllis Glisson, Kathleen Louise Grenville, William Andrew Gwynn, Gerald M. Hagan, Judith M. Hegedus, Vera M. Hall, Martha S. Harris, Delores S. Harrison, Walter Hawkins, Margaret A. Hines, Patricia Houston, Katherine Stoy Howell, Beatrice R. Hughes, Beverly Jo Ivey, Gerald C. Iwanowski, Jerry Koger, Chiquita A. Lowry, Sandra Milligan, Kathryn M. Moody, Helen Lawanna Oliver, Betty Jo Parks, Louise M. Powell, J. B. Robinson, Jr., Anthony Jack Schleman, Frank Slappy, Jr., Raymond P. Smallwood, Louane Brooks Smith, Mary E. Smith, Dolores T. Taylor, Bennie June Terry, Martha Teston, Willie Teston, James N. Thomas, Willie Eva Thompson, Frederick A. Tyner, Jr., Earle Bentley Waterfield, Fred Holmes Wheeler, Robert D. Williams, Eva Mae Willis, Martha Worsley, Thomas Jefferson Ennis, Jr., Hiram Winston Estes, William T. Fleming, Charles F. Forehand, Sr., William Edward Fountain, Evelyn Garner, Hudson D. Gilliand, Luther H. Gilliland, Rolly Edward Thompson, Charles K. Alton, Mitchell Beard, Milo K. Beesley, Jr., Leroy Bouldin, Frederick A. Brink, Jr., Errett L. Bristor, Charles R. Broach, Frederick J. Brown, Jr., Moses Cage, Auburn H. Chance, Joy W. Coats, Helen A. Collins, Mildred W. Cooper, Wilford S. Cox, Joni A. Creech, Jack B. Crist, Jesse Earl Culbreth, Annemarie T. Cunningham, Edward R. Cunningham, Roland D. Dye, Oral E. Estep, Hiram Houston Fairchild, Lucy Ann Ferguson, Fred O. Getha, Karl M. Graman, Joseph P. Grantham, Allen R. Gray, Retha B. Guthery, Herschel H. Hollingsworth, Brian G. Hooker, Samuel B. Hucks, Martha C. Hughes, Lester A. Jenkins, Robert L. Jenkins, Ray E. Jones, Mary C. Lamberth, Carolyn S. Ledford, Joe B. Lee, Louise R. Lee, Winifred K. Luter, Alton E. Lutz, James E. Lynch, Eugene F. Mainzer, Jr., Sam L. Martin, Walter A. May, Jr., Clyde D. McCabb, Joseph A. McCall, Betty M. McDaniel, James H. McInnis, Vickie McWhirter, James W. Medley, George Edward Nentrup, Johnson Ray, Henry L. Reeves, Jr., Jesse Daniel Rhoden, Edwin Bernard Richman, Mary June Ricketts, Rossie L. Robertson, James B. Saunders, William N. Sheppard, Franklin L. Speckman, Raymond E. Stanley, Sr., Archie Jr. Stover, Leonard Eugene Straub, Jr., Henry L. Suer, Junior N. Symes, Carl O. Tangredi, Chestine B. Thrash, Clyde Walker, Margaret Malinda Walker, Mary E. Walters, Margie R. Warfield, Enola M. Warren, Willie Ruth Williams, J. B. Wilson, Robert C. Wood, Wilbur L. Woods, Antionette S. Slay, Herschel A. Adair, Auburn P. Adams, Marvin F. Adams, Herman C. Allen, Betty J. Batten, Chloe L.S. Bickford, Sarah Anita Bell Black, William B. Bowling, Carlton Bracewell, Willie R. Brock, Virginia J. Bryant, Graydon C. Burks, Wynelle F. Campbell, Clommie G. Carlton, Sue W. Carswell, Eugene Carver, Helen Chambers, Velma Chambers, Roy J. Charles, Frances C. Christian, Emmett S. Clanton, Jr., Karen L. Griner, Howard F. Clemons, James S. Cobb, James H. Coile, Claude Cravey, Willie G. Crummey, Sidney De La Rosa, William L. Donaldson, Sr., Tom W. Dooley, Christine H. Flowers, James L. Flowers, William T. Forehand, Amelda S. Freeman, Jean C. Fuller, Wayne A. Gay, Frances E. McMichael Gibson, William E. Gill, James W. Ginn, Howard R. Griffin, Joseph P. Griffin, Marguerite G. Griffin, Martha H. Grimes, Elmer J. Griner, James A. Gunnells, Louie E. Gurley, Bob A. Hale, Charlie H. Harrell, Leragee C. Harris, Fred R. Hart, Fred R. Haymons, Sr., Jack D. Herring, George C. Hester, Herman M. Hilton, Bobby E. Hughes, Eugene T. Humphrey, Elijah Hursey, Edward E. Infinger, Charlie J. Jackson, Henry R. Jones, James M. Jones, Mozelle T. Jones, Melvin V. Jordan, Robert F. Jowers, Nolan R. Kent, Bobby B. Kincaid, Kathryn L. Lipe, Leroy F. Little, Coleman Lovett, Wilburn J. Luke, Neal R. Lumpkin, Grady E. Lutes, Reed Maxwell, Pansy H. McGowen, Grady F. Michael, Harold E. Moore, Betty A. Cushman, John C. Morris, Sr., Betty J. Moss, Joseph B. Parker, Jr., Euphrates A. Pate, Walter W. Pierce, Joe J. Preston, Jr., Billy D. Price, Cleon B. Price, Sarah A.B. Prothro, Joedy D. Putnal, Stafford H. Putnal, Willie L. Pye, Harold G. Ramsey, Joann J. Reis, Robert F. Ritch, Treston E. Richardson, Claude B. Rogers, Henry F. Smith, Ray A. Smith, Faye D. Spencer, Olin Stephens, Robert E. Stone, Nellie F. Stuckey, William L. Sweat, Mary Sweath, Gordon B. Taffar, Jacqueline Thomason, Julius E. Thompson, Bobbie S. Toney, Jesse L. Wainwright, Elizabeth P. Wall, Robert G. Ward, Jr., Runelle C. Warren, Arthur R. Washington, Charles L. Waters, Roy Watson, John D. Weatherly, Jewel M. White, John D. Whitmire, Jack K. Wilkerson, James M. Williams, James W. Williams, Ennis Williford, Jr., Edmond C. Yarbrough, Sr., Verdie B. Coleman, Gerald W. Jones, Donnie Pope, Paul A. Flanigan, Robart W. Alexander, Ernest Bailey, Charles E. Bishop, Sr., William E. Blassingame, James C. Boozer, James W. Bowen, Sr., Aaron T. Brigman, Richard L. Britt, Frank C. Brooks, Robert L. Bryant, Dewey F. Carver, Ira L. Callahan, Jack G. Caldwell, Don Grady Collins, Sarah B. Cope, Bobby E. Courtney, John L. Cox, Sr., Ferman M. Crapps, Robert E. Culbreath, James Dacus, Nelson E. Dailey, Everett N. Davidson, Irma E. Davis, Randolph E. Dawkins, Ray T. Dendy, James Aaron Devaney, Betty J. Donnelly, Theodore C. Donnelly, Jr., Peggy A. Dover, Donald R. Ekern, Herbert Washington Fallaw, Carl S. Flury, John B. Frick, Ivan Dale Funk, Von H. Gambrell, Helen W. Gilreath, James D. Gilstrap, Ray C. Goforth, Jack D. Graham, Harold K. Grant, Wesley R. Griggs, Hubert Grizzard, Harold J. Grubbs, Bob Adams Hale, Willaim A. Hannah, Jr., Henry A. Harbin, III, Cladys P. Harrison, Frasier Herndon, Edward H. Heuer, Jr., Emory H. Hipp, Charles G. Holland, Dorothy M. Hueble, James E. Hunter, Daniel E. James, Sr., Floyd Jennings, Jerry Wayne Johnson, Elbert D. Jones, Robert M. Jones, Jr., Paul T. Jordan, Ermeta U. Lahm, Cecile L. Cothran, Samford James Larson, Dozier S. Leitner, Frank Leviner, Jr., Joseph Kennith Mann, Sr., Archie E. Martin, John C. Mason, John F. Massey, Barbara L. Mathis, Geraldine P. Mattison, Miller L. McCraw, Kathryn J. McCune, Teddie N. McGraw, Lewis N. McKelvey, Bessie Pearl Marks McKenry, Effie Geneva Melton, Shirley W. Middleton, Carl Otis Miller, William E. Moody, Olin R Morris, James W. Morrison, Alice B. Morton, Lewis E. Nichoals, Elizabeth F. Owens, William R. Pace, Charles W. Page, Sr., Fred C. Perry, Jr., Grover E. Reid, William Richard Rhea, Clinton D. Ridings, Leland W. Rogers, Boyd P. Sample, Thomas J. Sanders, Tilman R. Satterfield, Elsie P. Seigler, Harold E. Southerland, Clifton W. Speares, Kenneth Stamps, Albert T. Stanford, Donald M. Stephens, Ormond W. Stephens, Thelma E. Johnson, Jack L. Strickland, Aldora J. Thompson, William P. Thornley, Jake O. Trantham, Ben I. Turner, James F. Turner, Kearney R. Turner, Jr., Helen S. Vickery, Chester Alpheus Vittum, Bradley K. Wallace, C. B. Waters, Cecil W. Watson, Josie M. Watson, Robert Watson, Jr., Theodore Russell Wells, Jr., Danny D. Woods, Walter R. Youngblood, Raymond L. Addison, Lorraine F. Brown, Eugene Burns, George Herman Bush, John M. Butler, Walter C. Carnes, Jr., Charlie V. Cartee, Sammie Clyde Cartee, Robert L. Carter, Fred Cotney, Billy E. Crow, Charles Ronald Culbreth, Frances Mulder Dinsmore, Magnolia S. Edwards, Aime G. Ellison, Jr., Jack Carroll Hardwich, Billy Sidney Headrick, Harold Hill, Hennon Lamar Hill, Harry R. Hinson, Margie R. Allison, W.L. Boyd, Robert E. Brooks, Shirley Ann Lollar, Warren S. Maddox, Norma H. Maloney, Horace F. Martin, James R. Matthews, Walter Leon McNeil, Charles Edwin Meeks, Doyle Melton, Don A. Nall, Emily Mildred Nall, Raymond D. Taylor, James E. Themits, James E. Thomas, Lewis E. Varner, John Franklin Walker, Milton Wylie, Ora Lee Hudson, Johnny H. Jordan, Larry Arthur Knox, Kenneth Grady Johnson, Jack M. Holley, Sr., Ruby B. Yates, Marlin Orell Yates, Jessie C. Whitley, Perry Lee Walker, William C. Trawick, Jerry Roberson, Thomas E. Roberson, Marial Alfred Nall, Billy Floyd Nelson, Carl Nelson, Jr., James E Oden, Waldo R. Pafford, Horace Clifton Randolph, Albert Malcom Rice, Clay Morris Smith, Walter Earl Smith, Grace J. Taylor, Mildred M. Benton, Willa Breland, Pearlie Carpenter, Caroline B. Thompson, Jean L. Danner, Theodore F. Rust, III, Kerry Fossett, Alice L. Geiger, Esther A. Thompson, Norma T. Ingalls, Victoria Herschovich, Curtis Wolf, Caroline Berck, Larry Wood, Jr. and Karen Taylor
Consol Third Party Plaintiff: American General Life and Accident Insurance Co. and American General Life and Accident Insurance Company
Consol Third Party Defendant: John H. Askew, Jr., Jacob F. Bryan, IV, John and Jane Doe 1 through 100, Wilford C. Lyon, Jr., Anna H. White, Walter R. Youngblood, John Askew, Eugene H. Carver, Stafford H. Putnal, Robert Wendell Sheppard, Anna White, R. Wendell Sheppard and John and Jane Doe 1 through 123
Consol Defendant: Oliver H. Bunton, Jr. and Aldora J. Thompson
Consol Counter Claimant: American General Life and Accident Insurance Company
Consol Counter Defendant: Raymond L. Addison
Mediator: Terrence M. White
Counter Claimant: American General Life & Accident Insurance Company
Counter Defendant: W.L. Boyd
Case Number: 3:2005md01698
Filed: August 19, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: Duval
Presiding Judge: Henry Lee Adams
Presiding Judge: Monte C. Richardson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the MDL case as well as all member cases. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 3/26/2009. (MO)
March 23, 2009 Filing 280 STIPULATION of Dismissal by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Settlement Agreement)(Dewberry, Michael)
March 20, 2009 Filing 279 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jack B. Crist, Jesse Earl Culbreth, Annemarie T. Cunningham, Edward R. Cunningham, Roland D. Dye, Oral E. Estep, Hiram Houston Fairchild, Lucy Ann Ferguson, Walter Lee Fossett, Fred O. Getha, Karl M. Graman, Joseph P. Grantham, Allen R. Gray, Retha B. Guthery, Herschel H. Hollingsworth, Brian G. Hooker, Samuel B. Hucks, Martha C. Hughes, Lester A. Jenkins, Robert L. Jenkins, Ray E. Jones, Mary C. Lamberth, Carolyn S. Ledford, Joe B. Lee, Louise R. Lee, Winifred K. Luter, Alton E. Lutz, James E. Lynch, Eugene F. Mainzer, Jr, Sam L. Martin, Walter A. May, Jr, Clyde D. McCabb, Joseph A. McCall, Betty M. McDaniel, James H. McInnis, Vickie McWhirter, James W. Medley, George Edward Nentrup, Johnson Ray, Henry L. Reeves, Jr, Jesse Daniel Rhoden, Edwin Bernard Richman, Mary June Ricketts, Rossie L. Robertson, James B. Saunders, William N. Sheppard, Franklin L. Speckman, Raymond E. Stanley, Sr, Archie Jr. Stover, Leonard Eugene Straub, Jr, Henry L. Suer, Junior N. Symes, Carl O. Tangredi, Chestine B. Thrash, Clyde Walker, Margaret Malinda Walker, Mary E. Walters, Margie R. Warfield, Enola M. Warren, Willie Ruth Williams, J. B. Wilson, James R. Wood, Jr, Robert C. Wood, Wilbur L. Woods, Antionette S. Slay, American General Life and Accident Insurance Company, John H. Askew, Jr, Jacob F. Bryan, IV, Eugene H. Carver, John and Jane Doe 1 through 100, Wilford C. Lyon, Jr, Stafford H. Putnal, Robert Wendell Sheppard, Anna White, Walter R. Youngblood, Herschel A. Adair, Auburn P. Adams, Marvin F. Adams, Herman C. Allen, Betty J. Batten, Van V. Benton, Chloe L.S. Bickford, Sarah Anita Bell Black, William B. Bowling, Carlton Bracewell, Willie R. Brock, Virginia J. Bryant, Oliver H. Bunton, Jr, Graydon C. Burks, Wynelle F. Campbell, Clommie G. Carlton, Sue W. Carswell, Eugene Carver, Helen Chambers, Velma Chambers, Roy J. Charles, Frances C. Christian, Emmett S. Clanton, Jr, Karen L. Griner, Howard F. Clemons, James S. Cobb, James H. Coile, Claude Cravey, Willie G. Crummey, Sidney De La Rosa, William L. Donaldson, Sr, Tom W. Dooley, Christine H. Flowers, James L. Flowers, William T. Forehand, Amelda S. Freeman, Jean C. Fuller, Wayne A. Gay, Frances E. McMichael Gibson, Herman A. Gieger, William E. Gill, James W. Ginn, Howard R. Griffin, Joseph P. Griffin, Marguerite G. Griffin, Martha H. Grimes, Elmer J. Griner, James A. Gunnells, Louie E. Gurley, Bob A. Hale, Charlie H. Harrell, Leragee C. Harris, Fred R. Hart, Fred R. Haymons, Sr, Jack D. Herring, George C. Hester, Herman M. Hilton, Bobby E. Hughes, Eugene T. Humphrey, Elijah Hursey, Edward E. Infinger, Charlie J. Jackson, Henry R. Jones, James M. Jones, Mozelle T. Jones, Melvin V. Jordan, Robert F. Jowers, Nolan R. Kent, Bobby B. Kincaid, Kathryn L. Lipe, Leroy F. Little, Coleman Lovett, Wilburn J. Luke, Neal R. Lumpkin, Grady E. Lutes, Reed Maxwell, Pansy H. McGowen, Grady F. Michael, Harold E. Moore, Betty A. Cushman, John C. Morris, Sr, Betty J. Moss, Joseph B. Parker, Jr, Euphrates A. Pate, Walter W. Pierce, Joe J. Preston, Jr, Billy D. Price, Cleon B. Price, Sarah A.B. Prothro, Joedy D. Putnal, Willie L. Pye, Harold G. Ramsey, Joann J. Reis, Robert F. Ritch, Treston E. Richardson, Claude B. Rogers, Henry F. Smith, Ray A. Smith, Faye D. Spencer, Olin Stephens, Robert E. Stone, Nellie F. Stuckey, William L. Sweat, Mary Sweath, Gordon B. Taffar, Jacqueline Thomason, Clifford Thompson, Julius E. Thompson, Bobbie S. Toney, Jesse L. Wainwright, Elizabeth P. Wall, Robert G. Ward, Jr, Runelle C. Warren, Arthur R. Washington, Charles L. Waters, Roy Watson, John D. Weatherly, Jewel M. White, John D. Whitmire, Jack K. Wilkerson, James M. Williams, James W. Williams, Robert D. Williams, Ennis Williford, Jr, Edmond C. Yarbrough, Sr, Verdie B. Coleman, Gerald W. Jones, Anna H. White, Donnie Pope, R. Wendell Sheppard, Paul A. Flanigan, Robart W. Alexander, Ernest Bailey, Charles E. Bishop, Sr, William E. Blassingame, James C. Boozer, James W. Bowen, Sr, George L. Breland, Jr, Aaron T. Brigman, Richard L. Britt, Frank C. Brooks, Robert L. Bryant, Dewey F. Carver, Ira L. Callahan, Jack G. Caldwell, Don Grady Collins, Sarah B. Cope, Bobby E. Courtney, John L. Cox, Sr, Ferman M. Crapps, Robert E. Culbreath, James Dacus, Nelson E. Dailey, Everett N. Davidson, Irma E. Davis, Randolph E. Dawkins, Ray T. Dendy, James Aaron Devaney, Betty J. Donnelly, Theodore C. Donnelly, Jr, Peggy A. Dover, Donald R. Ekern, Herbert Washington Fallaw, Carl S. Flury, John B. Frick, Ivan Dale Funk, Von H. Gambrell, Helen W. Gilreath, James D. Gilstrap, Ray C. Goforth, Jack D. Graham, Harold K. Grant, Wesley R. Griggs, Hubert Grizzard, Harold J. Grubbs, Bob Adams Hale, Willaim A. Hannah, Jr, Henry A. Harbin, III, Cladys P. Harrison, Frasier Herndon, Edward H. Heuer, Jr, Emory H. Hipp, Charles G. Holland, Dorothy M. Hueble, James E. Hunter, Daniel E. James, Sr, Floyd Jennings, Jerry Wayne Johnson, Elbert D. Jones, Robert M. Jones, Jr, Paul T. Jordan, Ermeta U. Lahm, Cecile L. Cothran, Samford James Larson, Dozier S. Leitner, Frank Leviner, Jr, Joseph Kennith Mann, Sr, Archie E. Martin, John C. Mason, John F. Massey, Barbara L. Mathis, Geraldine P. Mattison, Miller L. McCraw, Kathryn J. McCune, Teddie N. McGraw, Lewis N. McKelvey, Bessie Pearl Marks McKenry, Effie Geneva Melton, Shirley W. Middleton, Carl Otis Miller, William E. Moody, Olin R Morris, James W. Morrison, Alice B. Morton, Lewis E. Nichoals, Elizabeth F. Owens, William R. Pace, Charles W. Page, Sr, Fred C. Perry, Jr, Grover E. Reid, William Richard Rhea, Clinton D. Ridings, Leland W. Rogers, Boyd P. Sample, Thomas J. Sanders, Tilman R. Satterfield, Elsie P. Seigler, Harold E. Southerland, Clifton W. Speares, Kenneth Stamps, Albert T. Stanford, Donald M. Stephens, Ormond W. Stephens, Thelma E. Johnson, Jack L. Strickland, Aldora J. Thompson, John W. Thompson, William P. Thornley, Jake O. Trantham, Ben I. Turner, James F. Turner, Kearney R. Turner, Jr, Helen S. Vickery, Chester Alpheus Vittum, Bradley K. Wallace, C. B. Waters, Cecil W. Watson, Josie M. Watson, Robert Watson, Jr, Theodore Russell Wells, Jr, Danny D. Woods, John and Jane Doe 1 through 123, Raymond L. Addison, Lorraine F. Brown, Eugene Burns, George Herman Bush, John M. Butler, Walter C. Carnes, Jr, Melvin J. Carpenter, Charlie V. Cartee, Sammie Clyde Cartee, Robert L. Carter, Fred Cotney, Billy E. Crow, Charles Ronald Culbreth, Frances Mulder Dinsmore, Magnolia S. Edwards, Aime G. Ellison, Jr, Jack Carroll Hardwich, Billy Sidney Headrick, Harold Hill, Hennon Lamar Hill, Harry R. Hinson, American General Life & Accident Insurance Company, Margie R. Allison, W.L. Boyd, Robert E. Brooks, Shirley Ann Lollar, Warren S. Maddox, Norma H. Maloney, Horace F. Martin, James R. Matthews, Walter Leon McNeil, Charles Edwin Meeks, Doyle Melton, Don A. Nall, Emily Mildred Nall, Raymond D. Taylor, James E. Themits, James E. Thomas, Raphael P. Thompson, Lewis E. Varner, John Franklin Walker, Milton Wylie, Ora Lee Hudson, Johnny H. Jordan, Larry Arthur Knox, Kenneth Grady Johnson, Jack M. Holley, Sr, Ruby B. Yates, Marlin Orell Yates, Eleanor M. Acres, Jessie C. Whitley, Perry Lee Walker, William C. Trawick, Jerry Roberson, Shirley R. Acuff, Thomas E. Roberson, Marial Alfred Nall, Billy Floyd Nelson, Carl Nelson, Jr, Margaret R. Allen, James E Oden, Waldo R. Pafford, Horace Clifton Randolph, Albert Malcom Rice, John S. Andreason, Sr, Clay Morris Smith, Walter Earl Smith, Grace J. Taylor, Ruth S. Atkinson, John A. Banks, Mary A. Barber, Ethel P. Barnes, Loyselle W. Barrs, Mildred M. Benton, Willa Breland, Pearlie Carpenter, Warren J. Beckley, Caroline B. Thompson, Jean L. Danner, Theodore F. Rust, III, Kerry Fossett, Alice L. Geiger, Esther A. Thompson, Norma T. Ingalls, Joy M. Behr, Victoria Herschovich, Curtis Wolf, Caroline Berck, Larry Wood, Jr, Karen Taylor, Charles A. Bell, Sr, Terrence M. White, James L. Bell, Vivian S. Bennett, James F. Bilderback, Virginia L. Bilderback, Shirley M. Bilheimer, Frances H. Blake, Horace E. Booth, S. Colleen Borklund, Clifford W. Bozeman, Michael E. Braswell, William L. Brooks, Sidney D. Brown, Minnie Lou Bullington, Robert M. Butler, Paul Byrd, Erna V. Cable, Milagros C. Cabrera, Frances B. Carrera, Nicholas V. Carrera, Sr, George F. Carswell, Jr, Nancy E. Cassidy, Anita R. Cates, Jeanette E. Cavannaugh, MDL - 1698 American General Life & Accident Insurance Co. Retiree Benefits ERISA Litigation, Lynn Chalmers, William C. Chambers, Sr, Ian M. Charlton, Charles E. Clark, Evelyn C. Clay-Woodard, Floyd E. Clevenger, Jr, Charles R. Clouse, Mary L. Cole, Morris F. Coleman, Forest B. Combs, Winfred L. Costine, Ronald A. Cox, Nancy M. Crenshaw, Florene Walker, Roy N. Crews, Rubye T. Crews, Arthur T. Criswell, Robert A Mills, James G. Day, Joan Dresslar, Harold A. Duprey, Harold K. Harlow, James Hobbs, June C. J. Hyer, Maurice L. Perkins, Samuel E. Poole, Otto L. Quick, Robert W. Sheppard, Lonnie G. Smith, William A. Smith, Jr, Robert L. Taylor, Emma Lee Purcell Crumpton, Frederick S. Thranhardt, Thomas B. Culbreth, Dorothy E. Culpepper, Melvin O. Danner, James A. Davaney, Jay L. Daugherty, John B. Robinson, Jr, Paul B. Bullington, William Andrew Gwynn, Katherine Stoy Howell, Gerald C. Iwanowski, Frederick A. Tyner, Jr, Elmer T. Dawkins, David P. Day, Ana R. De Leon, Willie D. Dewitt, Annie S. Dilmore, Joyce L. Dipatri, Richard P. Dresslar, James E. Dugan, Dorothy Y. Ellerbe, Harold H. Ellerbe, Armand R. Emanuel, George P. Escobio, Floyd Evans, June A. Falls, Frances E. Fernley, Edward L. Forrest, Janice J. Freeman, Harry A. French, Elmer B. Frost, Jr, Paul D. Frye, Fernan A. Garess, Melvin J. Garyn, Patricia E. Gast, Donald P. Gatewood, Harvey C. George, Ella Mae Gibson, William V. Gifford, Howard Gilbert, Roberta J. Gimbel, Graham Gore, Jaunelle C. Grace, Kathryn C. Grover, Irma C. Guilmette, James R. Guthrie, James B. Harris, Lorraine H. Hatcher, Andrew J. Hayes, Mildred Hebert, Virginia H. Heidtman, Mary E. Henry, Catherine M. Hess, Donald E. Hill, Spessard D. Holland, Thomas C. Hollingsworth, Rhonda G. Holt, Jackie M. Horne, Kevin E. Howell, Sr, Elizabeth S. Hughes, LLoyd A. Hurst, John M. Ingalls, George T. Inglett, Robert H. Ivey, William D. Jackson, Jr, Vernell A. Johnson, Caro
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER Setting Status Conference for 3/24/2009 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 10A. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 3/6/2009. (MO)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting 276 Motion to Stay Proceedings; staying case for 60 days to finalize the settlement. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr on 12/19/2008. (MO)
December 18, 2008 Filing 276 Joint MOTION to stay Proceedings by all parties. (Brigham, Leroy)
December 10, 2008 Mail address to David R. Wells returned as Not at Law firm/unable to forward re: 267 Order on motion for extension of time to answer. (SJW)
December 8, 2008 Filing 275 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 264 Amended complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against John B. Robinson, Jr, Paul B. Bullington, William Andrew Gwynn, Katherine Stoy Howell, Gerald C. Iwanowski, Frederick A. Tyner, Jr by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company.(Braden, Gregory)
December 8, 2008 Filing 274 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 263 Amended complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against George L. Breland, Jr, James A. Davaney, Charles E. Bishop, Sr, Aaron T. Brigman, Irma E. Davis, Frasier Herndon, William E. Moody, Kenneth Stamps, Albert T. Stanford, Walter R. Youngblood by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company.(Braden, Gregory)
December 8, 2008 Filing 273 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 262 Amended complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Raymond L. Addison by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company.(Braden, Gregory)
December 8, 2008 Filing 272 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 261 Amended complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Oliver H. Bunton, Jr, Willie G. Crummey, Howard R. Griffin, Joseph P. Griffin, Leragee C. Harris, Fred R. Haymons, Sr, James M. Jones, Grady E. Lutes, Joedy D. Putnal, Olin Stephens, Jesse L. Wainwright by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company.(Braden, Gregory)
December 8, 2008 Filing 271 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 265 Amended complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Robert A Mills, William L. Brooks, Morris F. Coleman, James G. Day, Joan Dresslar, Harold A. Duprey, Harold K. Harlow, James Hobbs, June C. J. Hyer, Maurice L. Perkins, Samuel E. Poole, Otto L. Quick, Robert W. Sheppard, Lonnie G. Smith, William A. Smith, Jr, Robert L. Taylor, Frederick S. Thranhardt by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company.(Braden, Gregory)
December 8, 2008 Filing 270 NOTICE Filing Amended Exhibit D by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company re 269 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaints or, in the alternative MOTION for more definite statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D)(Braden, Gregory)
December 3, 2008 Filing 269 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaints or, in the alternative, MOTION for more definite statement by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Braden, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER Signed by Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 11/19/2008. (SJW) (Modified on 12/1/2008 to modify Judge) (SJW).
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting 266 Unopposed Motion to Enlarge the Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints by 12/8/2008. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 11/18/2008. (JDF) (Modified on 11/19/2008 to edit entry) (SJW).
November 17, 2008 Filing 266 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead re 262 Amended complaint, 263 Amended complaint, 261 Amended complaint, 265 Amended complaint, 264 Amended complaint and all other Amended Complaints by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
November 10, 2008 Filing 265 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against American General Life & Accident Insurance Company filed by Eleanor M. Acres.(George, Robert)
November 10, 2008 Filing 264 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against American General Life & Accident Insurance Company filed by June Appling.(George, Robert)
November 7, 2008 Filing 263 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American General Life & Accident Insurance Company filed by Paul A. Flanigan.(Brigham, Leroy)
November 7, 2008 Filing 262 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American General Life & Accident Insurance Company filed by Raymond L. Addison.(Brigham, Leroy)
November 7, 2008 Filing 261 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American General Life & Accident Insurance Company filed by Herschel A. Adair.(Brigham, Leroy)
November 3, 2008 Filing 260 MOTION to amend/correct 235 Pretrial Statement Exhibit 4 by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Braden, Gregory)
October 17, 2008 Filing 259 NOTICE OF MEDIATION to be held on December 10 & 11, 2008, before Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger in Courtroom 10C. (GWR)
October 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER denying as moot 231 Motion to extend time; denying as moot 237 motion to amend/correct; denying 239 Motion to bifurcate; granting 251 Motion to continue; granting 255 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr on 10/10/2008. (SJW)
October 8, 2008 Filing 257 RESPONSE in opposition re 246 MOTION in limine regarding Excluding Testimony of Witnesses not Disclosed and Excluding Inadmissible Deposition Testimony filed by Morris F. Coleman, Harold K. Harlow, George T. Inglett, Sarah F. Mills, Joe D. Mobley, Sr, John W. Rice, Jr, Doris M. Rizer, Frank Slappy, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit)(Brigham, Leroy)
October 8, 2008 Filing 256 RESPONSE in opposition re 245 MOTION in limine regarding Exclude Evidence filed by Morris F. Coleman, Harold K. Harlow, George T. Inglett, Sarah F. Mills, Joe D. Mobley, Sr, John W. Rice, Jr, Doris M. Rizer, Frank Slappy, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Brigham, Leroy)
October 6, 2008 Filing 255 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 246 MOTION in limine regarding Excluding Testimony of Witnesses not Disclosed and Excluding Inadmissible Deposition Testimony, 245 MOTION in limine regarding Exclude Evidence by Morris F. Coleman, Harold K. Harlow, George T. Inglett, Sarah F. Mills, Joe D. Mobley, Sr, John W. Rice, Jr, Doris M. Rizer, Frank Slappy, Jr. (Brigham, Leroy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
October 3, 2008 Filing 254 NOTICE by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company re 246 MOTION in limine regarding Excluding Testimony of Witnesses not Disclosed and Excluding Inadmissible Deposition Testimony Corrected Motion and Memorandum in Limine (Braden, Gregory) (Modified on 10/6/2008 to correct event)(SJW).
October 3, 2008 Filing 253 RESPONSE re 249 Order of September 26, 2008 re Mediation filed by Eleanor M. Acres. (Brigham, Leroy)
October 3, 2008 Filing 252 NOTICE by Jacob F. Bryan, IV, Wilford C. Lyon, Jr re 249 Order regarding Mediation (Coll, Patrick)
October 1, 2008 Mail returned as Forward Time Expired : 249 Order. Mail resent to David Wells, Matthew McDonald @ 505 20th Street N. Ste #500, Birmingham, AL 35203. (SJW)
September 30, 2008 Filing 251 Joint MOTION to continue to facilitate mediation by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company, Eleanor M. Acres. (Brigham, Leroy)
September 29, 2008 Filing 250 NOTICE by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company re 249 Order for Mediation Statement (Braden, Gregory)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER directing the parties to, within five (5) days, file a statement re: their position on mediaton presided over by the Honorable Harvey E. Schlesinger. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 9/26/2008. (MO)
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER amending 244 Order on Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 9/19/2008. (JDF)
September 18, 2008 Filing 247 TRIAL CALENDAR for trial term commencing 10/6/08 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 10 A before Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr on 9/18/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List and Tags)(PJG)
September 18, 2008 Filing 246 MOTION in limine regarding Excluding Testimony of Witnesses not Disclosed and Excluding Inadmissible Deposition Testimony by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Braden, Gregory)
September 18, 2008 Filing 245 MOTION in limine regarding Exclude Evidence by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7)(Braden, Gregory)
September 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting 242 Motion to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; granting 243 Motion to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice. Christopher A. Weals and Russell R. Bruch are premitted to appear pro hac vice for Defendant with Michael J. Dewberry as local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 9/17/2008. (JDF)
September 15, 2008 Filing 243 MOTION for Russell R. Bruch to appear pro hac vice by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
September 15, 2008 Filing 242 MOTION for Christopher A. Weals to appear pro hac vice by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
September 12, 2008 Filing 241 RESPONSE in opposition re 239 MOTION to bifurcate Trial filed by Morris F. Coleman, Harold K. Harlow, George T. Inglett, Sarah F. Mills, John W. Rice, Jr, Doris M. Rizer, Frank Slappy, Jr. (Brigham, Leroy)
September 5, 2008 Filing 240 MEMORANDUM in support re 239 Motion to bifurcate Trial filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
September 5, 2008 Filing 239 MOTION to bifurcate Trial by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
August 29, 2008 Filing 238 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/29/2008. Court Reporter: Deanne Moore (PJG)
August 28, 2008 Filing 237 MOTION to amend/correct 231 MOTION to extend time to have trial /Postpone Trial to Facilitate Mediation and Repleading by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
August 28, 2008 Filing 236 RESPONSE in opposition re 231 MOTION to extend time to have trial /Postpone Trial to Facilitate Mediation and Repleading filed by Eleanor M. Acres. (Brigham, Leroy)
August 26, 2008 Filing 235 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company, Eleanor M. Acres, Jacob F. Bryan, IV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Braden, Gregory)
August 18, 2008 Filing 234 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Statement Concerning Mediation re 230 ORDER by Eleanor M. Acres (George, Robert) (Modified on 8/19/2008 to add relationship) (SJW).
August 18, 2008 Filing 233 NOTICE Concerning Mediation re 230 ORDER by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company (Braden, Gregory) (Modified on 8/19/2008 to add relationship) (SJW).
August 18, 2008 Filing 232 NOTICE of Mediation re 230 Order by Jacob F. Bryan, IV, Wilford C. Lyon, Jr (Coll, Patrick) (Modified on 8/19/2008 as to docket text) (SJW).
August 15, 2008 Filing 231 MOTION to extend time to have trial /Postpone Trial to Facilitate Mediation and Repleading by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER defendants motion to server(Dkt.30 in Acres-04-cv-1274 mooted by Dkt. 70 and Dkt. 12 in Appling 05-cv-258 mooted by Dkt 51) are DENIED. Plaintiffs shall have sixty days to amend their complaints to include a definite statment of the elements of each plaintiff's claims. Parties are directed to file a notice with the Court notifying it of the next mediation within 10 days. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr on 8/8/2008. (SJW)
August 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER reassigning all MDL 1698 cases to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt until further notice. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 8/4/2008. (MO)
July 28, 2008 Filing 228 RESPONSE in opposition re (55 in 3:05-cv-00258-HLA-MCR) MOTION to strike Test Plaintiffs' Affidavits filed by Morris F. Coleman, Harold K. Harlow, George T. Inglett, Sarah F. Mills, Joe D. Mobley, Sr, John W. Rice, Jr, Doris M. Rizer, Frank Slappy, Jr. Associated Cases: 3:05-md-01698-HLA-JRK, 3:04-cv-01274-HLA-TEM, 3:05-cv-00258-HLA-MCR(Brigham, Leroy)
July 22, 2008 Filing 227 CERTIFICATE of compliance re 226 MOTION to strike Portions of Affidavits Plaintiffs Submitted in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(g) by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
July 11, 2008 Filing 226 MOTION to strike Portions of Affidavits Plaintiffs Submitted in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by American General Life and Accident Insurance Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 3:05-md-01698-HLA-JRK et al.(Dewberry, Michael)
July 9, 2008 Filing 225 REDACTION to 219 Response in opposition to motion Exhibit 5 by Morris F. Coleman, Harold K. Harlow, George T. Inglett, Sarah F. Mills, Joe D. Mobley, Sr, John W. Rice, Jr, Doris M. Rizer, Frank Slappy, Jr. (Brigham, Leroy)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER denying 221 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 7/2/2008. (MO)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER striking Exhibit 5 to 219 Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to remove this Exhibit from the official court record. A redacted Exhibit is due by 7/15/2008 and upon receipt shall be attached by the Clerk to 219 Response. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 7/2/2008. (MO)
July 1, 2008 Filing 222 RESPONSE in opposition re 221 MOTION for leave to file To File a Reply Brief in Further Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Morris F. Coleman, Harold K. Harlow, George T. Inglett, Sarah F. Mills, Joe D. Mobley, Sr, John W. Rice, Jr, Doris M. Rizer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Brigham, Leroy)
June 27, 2008 Filing 221 MOTION for leave to file To File a Reply Brief in Further Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 48)(Braden, Gregory)
June 18, 2008 Filing 220 Unopposed NOTICE of Filing Additional Exhibits to Test Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Morris F. Coleman, Harold K. Harlow, George T. Inglett, Sarah F. Mills, Joe D. Mobley, Sr, John W. Rice, Jr, Doris M. Rizer, Frank Slappy, Jr re 219 Response in opposition to motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 33, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 35, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 37, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 39, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 40, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 42)(George, Robert) (Modified on 6/19/2008 as to docket text)(SJW).
June 6, 2008 Filing 219 RESPONSE in opposition re 215 MOTION for summary judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Morris F. Coleman, Harold K. Harlow, George T. Inglett, Sarah F. Mills, Joe D. Mobley, Sr, John W. Rice, Jr, Doris M. Rizer, Frank Slappy, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 2, # 3 Exhibit Exh. 3, # 4 Exhibit Exh. 4, # 5 Exhibit Exh. 5, # 6 Exhibit Exh. 6, # 7 Exhibit Exh. 7, # 8 Exhibit Exh. 8, # 9 Exhibit Exh. 9, # 10 Exhibit Exh. 10, # 11 Exhibit Exh. 11, # 12 Exhibit Exh. 12, # 13 Exhibit Exh. 13, # 14 Exhibit Exh. 14, # 15 Exhibit Exh. 15, # 16 Exhibit Exh. 16, # 17 Exhibit Exh. 17, # 18 Exhibit Exh. 18, # 19 Exhibit Exh. 19, # 20 Exhibit Exh. 20, # 21 Exhibit Exh. 21, # 22 Exhibit Exh. 22, # 23 Exhibit Exh. 23, # 24 Exhibit Exh. 24, # 25 Exhibit Exh. 25, # 26 Exhibit Exh. 26, # 27 Exhibit Exh. 27, # 28 Exhibit Exh. 28, # 29 Exhibit Exh. 29, # 30 Exhibit Exh. 30, # 31 Exhibit Exh. 31, # 32 Exhibit Exh. 32, # 33 Exhibit Exh. 33, # 34 Exhibit Exh. 34, # 35 Exhibit Exh. 35, # 36 Exhibit Exh. 36, # 37 Exhibit Exh. 37, # 38 Exhibit Exh. 38, # 39 Exhibit Exh. 39, # 40 Exhibit Exh. 40, # 41 Exhibit Exh. 41, # 42 Exhibit Exh. 42, # 43 Exhibit Exh. 43, # 44 Exhibit Exh. 44, # 45 Exhibit Exh. 45, # 46 Exhibit Exh. 46, # 47 Exhibit Exh. 47, # 48 Exhibit Exh. 48, # 49 Exhibit Exh. 49, # 50 Exhibit Exh. 50)(Brigham, Leroy) (MODIFIED on 7/3/2008 as to exhibit #5 STRICKEN per order #223) (SJW).
May 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting 217 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 215 Motion for Summary Judgment; Response due by 6/6/2008. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 5/21/2008. (MO)
May 20, 2008 Filing 217 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 215 MOTION for summary judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Morris F. Coleman, Harold K. Harlow, George T. Inglett, Sarah F. Mills, Joe D. Mobley, Sr, John W. Rice, Jr, Doris M. Rizer, Frank Slappy, Jr. (Brigham, Leroy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
May 2, 2008 Filing 216 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr: Status Conference held on 5/2/2008. Order to enter Court Reporter: Deanne Moore (PJG)
April 20, 2008 Filing 215 MOTION for summary judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Exhibit 39, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41, # 43 Exhibit 42, # 44 Exhibit 43, # 45 Exhibit 44, # 46 Exhibit 45, # 47 Exhibit 46, # 48 Exhibit 47)(Braden, Gregory)
April 14, 2008 Filing 214 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 201 Order on motion to extend time, to Defendant's motions to sever claims in the Acres and Appling cases filed by Eleanor M. Acres. (Brigham, Leroy)
April 14, 2008 Filing 213 RESPONSE re 191 Order on motion to amend/correct,, (Defendant's Position Regarding Severance) filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Braden, Gregory)
April 14, 2008 Filing 212 RESPONSE re 191 Order on motion to amend/correct,, (Third Party Defendants' Position Regarding Severance) filed by Jacob F. Bryan, IV, Wilford C. Lyon, Jr. (Coll, Patrick)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting 210 Motion for Enlargement of Time. American General shall have until 9:00 a.m. on 4/21/2008 to file its Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 4/14/2008. (MO)
April 11, 2008 Filing 210 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Brief by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER setting Status Conference for 5/2/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10A before Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 4/11/2008. (MO)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER denying 207 Motion for Reconsideration of 206 Order on Motion for Enlargement of Page Limit. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 4/11/2008. (MO)
April 10, 2008 Filing 207 MOTION for reconsideration re 206 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Dewberry, Michael)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting in part 205 Motion for Enlargement of Page Limit; American General may file a single dispositive motion of no more than 40 pages. Plaintiffs shall be allowed a 40-page opposition to the motion. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 4/10/2008. (MO)
April 9, 2008 Filing 205 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file excess pages for dispositive motions by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Dewberry, Michael)
April 4, 2008 Filing 204 STATUS REPORT REGARDING MEDIATION by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
April 4, 2008 Filing 203 STATUS REPORT REGARDING MEDIATION by Jacob F. Bryan, IV, Wilford C. Lyon, Jr. (Coll, Patrick)
April 4, 2008 Filing 202 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Response to March 28, 2008 Order by Eleanor M. Acres. (George, Robert)
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting 200 Motion to extend time. Plaintiffs, defendant, and third party defendants shall have until April 14, 2008, to file a single dispositive motion and single supplemental severance memoranda if desired. Parties shall have until April 4, 2008 to file a status report regarding mediation. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr on 3/28/2008. (SJW)
March 27, 2008 Filing 200 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to File Dispositive Motions and Supplemental Severance Memoranda by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Dewberry, Michael)
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER striking 198 Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/17/2008. (JW)
March 11, 2008 Filing 198 AMENDED DOCUMENT by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. Initial Disclosures. (Dewberry, Michael) (Modified on 3/18/2008 as to STRICKEN per order #199) (SJW).
March 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting 196 Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's First Requests for Admissions. Responses due March 19, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/10/2008. (JW)
March 7, 2008 Filing 196 MOTION to extend time to Respond to Defendant's First Requests for Admissions dated February 8, 2008 and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by George T. Inglett. (George, Robert)
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER denying without prejudice 194 Motion to withdraw as attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 2/27/2008. (JW)
February 25, 2008 Filing 194 MOTION for C. Eric Stevens and Heather H. Hubbard to withdraw as attorney by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (SJW) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER denying 189 Motion to Compel Attendance at Mediation. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 2/8/2008. (MO)
February 4, 2008 Filing 192 RESPONSE to motion re 189 MOTION to compel Attendance of Interested Parties at Mediation filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 191 AMENDED TEST PLAINTIFF CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER granting 176 Motion to Amend Pretrial Order; Expert witness disclosure due 4/1/2008; discovery due 3/11/2008; dispositive motions due 4/3/2008 and responses are due 30 days after the respective motion is filed; pretrial conference is 8/29/2008 at 1:30 p.m. and trial remains set for the term beginning 10/6/2008 at 9:30 a.m.; the parties shall have until 4/3/2008 to supplement their pleadings regarding severance; Defendants are directed to respond to 189 by the close of business on 2/7/2008. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 2/4/2008. (MO)
February 1, 2008 Filing 190 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 185 Motion to consolidate cases, filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Dewberry, Michael)
February 1, 2008 Filing 189 MOTION to compel Attendance of Interested Parties at Mediation by Eleanor M. Acres. (Brigham, Leroy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
January 29, 2008 Filing 188 RESPONSE in opposition re 176 MOTION to amend/correct 154 Case management and scheduling order,, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Jesse Daniel Rhoden, Betty J. Batten, Sidney De La Rosa, Randolph E. Dawkins, Charles G. Holland, John F. Massey, W.L. Boyd, James E. Thomas, William C. Trawick, Jerry Roberson, Morris F. Coleman, Harold K. Harlow, George T. Inglett, Sarah F. Mills, Joe D. Mobley, Sr, John W. Rice, Jr, Doris M. Rizer, Frank Slappy, Jr, Rolly Edward Thompson, Charles R. Broach, Joy W. Coats. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Brigham, Leroy)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting 186 Motion to withdraw as attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/24/2008. (JW)
January 22, 2008 Filing 186 MOTION for Beverly P. Baker and James A. Patton, Jr. to withdraw as attorney by Jacob F. Bryan, IV, Wilford C. Lyon, Jr. (DH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
January 17, 2008 Filing 185 MOTION to consolidate cases for trial in this Court by Jesse Daniel Rhoden, Betty J. Batten, Sidney De La Rosa, Randolph E. Dawkins, Charles G. Holland, John F. Massey, W.L. Boyd, James E. Thomas, Jerry Roberson, Rolly Edward Thompson, Joy W. Coats. (Brigham, Leroy)
January 17, 2008 Filing 184 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by William Edward Fountain (Brigham, Leroy)
January 17, 2008 Filing 183 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Archie E. Martin (Brigham, Leroy)
January 17, 2008 Filing 182 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Helen Chambers (Brigham, Leroy)
January 17, 2008 Filing 181 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wynelle F. Campbell (Brigham, Leroy)
January 17, 2008 Filing 180 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ray J. Stone (Brigham, Leroy)
January 17, 2008 Filing 179 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Marilyn D. Roaf (Brigham, Leroy)
January 17, 2008 Filing 178 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Elmer B. Frost, Jr (Brigham, Leroy)
January 17, 2008 Filing 177 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jean L. Danner (Brigham, Leroy)
January 14, 2008 Filing 176 MOTION to amend/correct 154 Case management and scheduling order,,, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
December 28, 2007 Filing 175 NOTICE by Eleanor M. Acres Report Regarding Status of Mediation (George, Robert)
December 20, 2007 Filing 174 NOTICE by Jerry Roberson of Filing (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Hoaglund, Eric)
December 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER denying 155 Motion for reconsideration ; granting 168 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The parties are directed to inform the Court regarding the status of future mediation proceedings within 11 days.. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr on 12/6/2007. (EAM)
November 12, 2007 Filing 172 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 169 Amended complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against W.L. Boyd by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company.(Braden, Gregory)
November 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER modifying paragraph three of 6 Practice and Procedure Order re: listing the new individual docket number(s) assigned by the Clerk of this Court; requiring all pleadings relating to the MDL member cases to be filed in the MDL 1698 docket. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. on 11/7/2007. (MO)
November 5, 2007 Case reassigned to Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:05-md-1698-J-25JRK. Judge Monte C. Richardson no longer assigned to the case. (SJW, )
November 2, 2007 Mail address to Beverly Baker and James Patton, Jr. returned as not at law firm re: 151 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,, Order on motion to dismiss,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, Order on motion to amend/correct,.. (SJW, )
October 25, 2007 Filing 170 RESPONSE in opposition re 155 MOTION for reconsideration re 151 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,, Order on motion to dismiss,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, Order on motion to amend/correct, MOTION for reconsideration re 151 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,, Order on motion to dismiss,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, Order on motion to amend/correct, By All Plaintiffs filed by Eleanor M. Acres. (Brigham, Leroy)
October 24, 2007 Filing 169 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American General Life & Accident Insurance Company filed by W.L. Boyd.(Irby, R.)
October 23, 2007 Filing 168 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 155 MOTION for reconsideration re 151 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,, Order on motion to dismiss,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, Order on motion to amend/correct, MOTION for reconsideration re 151 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,, Order on motion to dismiss,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, Order on motion to amend/correct, by All Plaintiffs by Eleanor M. Acres. (Brigham, Leroy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
October 23, 2007 Filing 167 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint American General's Third-Party Complaint by Stafford H. Putnal, R. Wendell Sheppard, John Askew, Eugene H. Carver, Anna White.(Brigham, Leroy)
October 23, 2007 Filing 166 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint American General's Counterclaim by Walter R. Youngblood.(Brigham, Leroy)
October 23, 2007 Filing 165 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint American General's Third-Party Complaint by Anna White, R. Wendell Sheppard, Walter R. Youngblood, John Askew.(Brigham, Leroy)
October 23, 2007 Filing 164 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint American General's Counterclaim by Eugene Carver, Stafford H. Putnal.(Brigham, Leroy)
October 23, 2007 Filing 163 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint American General's Third-Party Complaint by Anna White, R. Wendell Sheppard, Walter R. Youngblood, John Askew, Eugene H. Carver, Stafford H. Putnal.(Brigham, Leroy)
October 23, 2007 Filing 162 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint American General's Third-Party Complaint by Walter R. Youngblood, John Askew, Anna White.(Brigham, Leroy)
October 23, 2007 Filing 161 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint American General's Counterclaim by Edward L. Forrest, Robert W. Sheppard.(Brigham, Leroy)
October 23, 2007 Filing 160 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint by John H. Askew, Jr, Eugene H. Carver, Stafford H. Putnal, Robert Wendell Sheppard, Anna White, Walter R. Youngblood, Anna H. White, R. Wendell Sheppard, John Askew.(Stephens, James)
October 23, 2007 Filing 159 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to complaint by John H. Askew, Jr, Eugene H. Carver, Stafford H. Putnal, Robert Wendell Sheppard, Anna White, Walter R. Youngblood, Anna H. White, R. Wendell Sheppard, John Askew.(Stephens, James)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ENDORSED ORDER granting 156 Motion for extension of time to answer or respond. Movants' response due no later than 10/23/07. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/15/2007. (LGH)
October 12, 2007 Filing 157 JOINDER in motion by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company re 155 MOTION for reconsideration re 151 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,, Order on motion to dismiss,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, Order on motion to amend/correct, MOTION for reconsideration re 151 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,, Order on motion to dismiss,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, Order on motion to amend/correct, filed by Jacob F. Bryan, IV, Wilford C. Lyon, Jr.. (Braden, Gregory)
October 12, 2007 Filing 156 MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead by Edward L. Forrest, John A. Mathis, Jr, Anna H. White, Walter R. Youngblood, John Askew, Eugene H. Carver, Stafford H. Putnal, Robert Wendell Sheppard. (Brigham, Leroy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
October 11, 2007 Filing 155 MOTION for reconsideration re 151 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,, Order on motion to dismiss,, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, Order on motion to amend/correct, by Jacob F. Bryan, IV, Wilford C. Lyon, Jr. (Coll, Patrick)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 154 TEST PLAINTIFF CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert witness disclosure deadline is 4/1/2008, Discovery due by 2/1/2008, Dispositive motions due by 3/3/2008, Responses to dispositive motions due 30 days after the respective motion is filed, Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2008 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 10A before Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr., Bench Trial set for trial term commencing 8/4/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10A before Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. on 10/3/2007. (MO)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting in part 83 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Claims by Bryan IV and Lyon; granting 85 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 91 Motion to File Consolidated Motion to Dismiss; denying 92 Motion to Strike Motion to Dismiss; granting 99 Motion to Strike Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings;striking 95 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 111 Motion for Leave to File Response. (See Order for rulings re: specific member cases). Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. on 10/3/2007. (MO)
October 1, 2007 Filing 152 NOTICE of change of address by R. Brent Irby (Irby, R.)
September 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER denying 78 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 84 Bryan IV, et al's Motion to Dismiss; granting 85 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 141 W.L. Boyd's Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. on 9/25/2007. (MO)
September 19, 2007 Filing 150 REPLY to response to motion re 141 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint filed by W.L. Boyd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A; (2) Exhibit B; (3) Exhibit C (Excerpts of Deposition of W.L. Boyd))(Irby, R.) Modified text on 9/20/2007 (SPW).
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ENDORSED ORDER granting 148 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint is due no later than 9/19/2007.Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/6/2007. (LGH)
September 5, 2007 Filing 148 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 147 Order on motion to amend/correct by W.L. Boyd. (Irby, R.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
September 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to file reply no later than 9/11/07 re 141 motion to amend/correct. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 9/4/2007. (SHS, )
August 31, 2007 Filing 146 RESPONSE in opposition re 141 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Braden, Gregory)
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ENDORSED ORDER granting 144 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Defendant's response to 141 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend is due no later than 8/31/2007. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/28/2007. (LGH)
August 27, 2007 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 141 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
August 20, 2007 Filing 143 CERTIFICATE of compliance re 142 Order on motion to amend/correct Local Rule 3.01(g) Statement by W.L. Boyd. (Irby, R.)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER requiring Plaintiff's counsel to file a 3.01(g) statement no later than 8/20/07 re: 141 motion to amend/correct. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/15/2007. (LGH)
August 9, 2007 Filing 141 MOTION to amend/correct Complaint by W.L. Boyd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Irby, R.)
July 16, 2007 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by MDL - 1698 American General Life & Accident Insurance Co. Retiree Benefits ERISA Litigation (SJW, )
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORAL ORDER: Mr. Mathis may not attend the deposition of Mr. Holland. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/10/2007. (LGH)
July 10, 2007 Filing 138 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Monte C. Richardson : on 7/10/2007. (digital) (LGH)
June 21, 2007 Filing 137 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Braden, Gregory)
June 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER selecting test plaintiffs; directing the parties to submit a joint proposed case management report re: the test plaintiffs within 20 days. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. on 6/1/2007. (MO)
May 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting in part Defendant's 124 Motion for protective order, in accordance with this Order. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 5/25/2007. (LGH)
May 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ENDORSED ORDER denying 128 Motion for leave to file reply and striking 129 Defendant's reply. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 5/24/2007. (LGH)
May 23, 2007 Filing 133 AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Monte C. Richardson : on 5/22/2007. (digital) (LGH)
May 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ENDORSED ORDER striking 131 minute entry on Motion Hearing. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 5/23/2007. (LGH)
May 22, 2007 Filing 131 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Monte C. Richardson: Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2007 re 124 MOTION for protective order filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (digital) (LGH) (MODIFIED on 5/24/2007 as to STRICKEN per order #132) (SJW, ).
May 22, 2007 Filing 130 NOTICE by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company Correcting of the Record of the Discovery Hearing conducted May 22, 2007 (Braden, Gregory)
May 21, 2007 Filing 129 REPLY to response to motion re 124 MOTION for protective order filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Braden, Gregory) (MODIFIED ON 5/25/2007 AS TO STRICKEN PER ORDER #134)(SJW, ).
May 21, 2007 Filing 128 MOTION for leave to file To file Reply Brief to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braden, Gregory)
May 16, 2007 Filing 127 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on 124 MOTION for protective order: Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2007 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (LGH)
May 14, 2007 Filing 126 RESPONSE in opposition re 124 MOTION for protective order filed by Eleanor M. Acres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T)(Brigham, Leroy)
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 122 Motion to withdraw as attorney. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 5/2/2007. (LGH)
May 1, 2007 Filing 124 MOTION for protective order by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Braden, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
May 1, 2007 Filing 123 NOTICE of change of address by Gregory C. Braden (Braden, Gregory)
May 1, 2007 Filing 122 Amended MOTION for H. Douglas Hinson, Michael G. Monnolly, Nancy B. Pridgen to withdraw as attorney by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email to Opposing Counsel)(Pridgen, Nancy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying without prejudice 120 Motion to withdraw as counsel. Signed by Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/18/2007. (LGH)
April 12, 2007 Filing 120 MOTION for Michael G. Monnolly, H. Douglas Hinson, and Nancy B. Pridgen to withdraw as attorney by American General Life and Accident Insurance Company, American General Life & Accident Insurance Company, American General Life and Accident Insurance Co.. (Monnolly, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
March 30, 2007 Filing 119 RESPONSE re 117 Response, of Defendant to The Court's Notice of Test Plaintiff Selection Process filed by Eleanor M. Acres. (Attachments: # 1)(Brigham, Leroy)
March 29, 2007 Filing 118 RESPONSE re 117 Response, of Defendant to the Court's Notice of Test Plaintiff Selection Process filed by Eleanor M. Acres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Brigham, Leroy) (MODIFIED on 3/30/2007 as to signature; counsel notified to refile) (SJW, ).
March 16, 2007 Filing 117 RESPONSE re 116 Order re Notice of Test Plaintiff Selection Process filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Barber Deposition Excerpts# 2 Exhibit Bennett Deposition Excerpts# 3 Exhibit Crews Deposition Excerpts# 4 Exhibit Selph Deposition Excerpts# 5 Exhibit Lynch Deposition Excerpts# 6 Exhibit Andreason Deposition Excerpts)(Braden, Gregory)
February 22, 2007 Case reassigned to Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:05-md-1698-J-25MCR. Judge Marcia Morales Howard no longer assigned to the case. (SJW, )
February 20, 2007 Filing 116 NOTICE OF TEST PLAINTIFF SELECTION PROCESS. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. on 2/20/2007. (MO)
December 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 113 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 12/5/2006. (JLW)
December 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER taking under advisement 113 Motion to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice. Counsel shall have until December 15, 2006 to submit the required fee and to meet the e-mail registration requirement. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 12/4/2006. (JLW)
November 30, 2006 Filing 113 MOTION for Nancy B. Pridgen to appear pro hac vice by American General Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Dewberry, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Marcia Morales Howard.
October 3, 2006 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in support re 111 Motion for leave to file Response to Third-Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response Brief)(Braden, Gregory)
October 3, 2006 Filing 111 MOTION for leave to file Response to Motion to Dismiss by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braden, Gregory)
September 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. Signed by Judge Howard T. Snyder on 9/27/2006. (LU)
September 27, 2006 Filing 109 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Howard T. Snyder: Telephone Conference held on 9/27/2006. Hearing scheduled on short notice regarding a deposition dispute. (DIGITAL) (WEB)
September 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants shall have until 9/11/06 to object to Platintiffs' desingation regarding individual Plaintiffs that need to be deposed on an expedited basis. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. on 9/5/2006. (LRB)
September 1, 2006 Filing 107 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Plaintiffs' Expedited Deposition List by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Dewberry, Michael)
August 24, 2006 Filing 106 MDL TRANSFER ORDER 3:06-cv-764-J-25MMH. Signed by Michael J. Beck/Clerk of the Panel on 5/3/06. (SJW, )
August 22, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER and ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR. Terrence M. White, Esq. is appointed as mediator in this action. The issue of whether the Court will designate test Plaintiffs remains under advisement. The parties are directed to notify the Court when a decision on the merits is reached in Jones v. American General Life and Accident Insurance Company, 1:01-cv-3-WTM. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. on 8/22/2006. (MO)
August 21, 2006 Filing 104 STIPULATION Joint Proposal Regarding Test Plaintiffs and Mediation by MDL - 1698 American General Life & Accident Insurance Co. Retiree Benefits ERISA Litigation. (George, Robert)
July 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER re: proposed case management plans and ORDER REFERRING CASE to mediation. The discovery stay is lifted. Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants re: Plaintiffs that will be deposed on an expedited basis, within 20 days. Defendants shall have 10 days to object to such designation. The Court will allow distribution of the Third Party Defendant Bryan and Lyon's proposed questionnaire. Plaintiffs shall have 30 days to respond to the questionnaires. The issue re: test Plaintiffs is taken under advisement. A joint proposal re: selection of test Plaintiffs shall be submitted within 20 days. The parties are directed to select a mediator within 20 days. Lead counsel Rutledge R. Liles, Esq. to coordinate dates. Mediation shall be conducted between 8/15/2006 and 10/15/2006. The other issues delineated in the proposed case management plans remain under advisement. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. on 7/28/2006. (MO) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2006 (SJW, ).
May 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 101 Plaintiff's Motion for Substitution of Parties. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 5/11/2006. (JLW)
May 8, 2006 Filing 101 MOTION to substitute party Plaintiffs' Motion for Substitution of Parties by Herschel A. Adair, Clifford Thompson, Paul A. Flanigan, Melvin J. Carpenter, Raphael P. Thompson, Eleanor M. Acres. (George, Robert)
March 29, 2006 Filing 100 RESPONSE in opposition re 99 Cross MOTION to strike 96 Memorandum in support, 95 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Walter R. Youngblood, John H. Askew, Jr, Anna H. White, Eugene H. Carver, Stafford H. Putnal, Robert Wendell Sheppard. (Brigham, Leroy)
March 13, 2006 Filing 99 Cross MOTION to strike 96 Memorandum in support, 95 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
March 13, 2006 Filing 98 RESPONSE to motion re 95 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
February 27, 2006 Filing 97 NOTICE by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company of Filing a Notice of "Tag-Along Action" (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Braden, Gregory)
February 23, 2006 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM in support re 95 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Anna H. White, John H. Askew, Jr, Walter R. Youngblood, Eugene H. Carver, Stafford H. Putnal, Robert Wendell Sheppard. (Brigham, Leroy)
February 23, 2006 Filing 95 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Stafford H. Putnal, Walter R. Youngblood, Anna H. White, John H. Askew, Jr, Eugene H. Carver, Robert Wendell Sheppard. (Brigham, Leroy)
February 23, 2006 Filing 94 RESPONSE in opposition re 92 MOTION to strike Third-Party Defendants Askew, Carver, Putnal, Sheppard, White and Youngblood's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Third-Party Claim filed by R. Wendell Sheppard, John H. Askew, Jr, Anna H. White, Walter R. Youngblood, Eugene H. Carver, Stafford H. Putnal. (Brigham, Leroy)
February 6, 2006 Filing 93 RESPONSE in opposition re 91 MOTION for leave to file Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
February 6, 2006 Filing 92 MOTION to strike Third-Party Defendants Askew, Carver, Putnal, Sheppard, White and Youngblood's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Third-Party Claim by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
January 25, 2006 Filing 91 MOTION for leave to file Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims by Robert Wendell Sheppard, Stafford H. Putnal, John H. Askew, Jr, Anna H. White, Walter R. Youngblood, Eugene H. Carver. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Brigham, Leroy)
December 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 89 Alexandra K. Hedrick's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 12/21/2005. (JLW)
December 20, 2005 Filing 89 MOTION for Alexandra K. Hedrick to withdraw as attorney by American General Life and Accident Insurance Co.. (Hedrick, Alexandra)
December 19, 2005 Filing 88 RESPONSE in opposition re 83 MOTION to dismiss Third-Party Complaints and Memorandum of Law in Support (Dispositive Motion) filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
December 19, 2005 Filing 87 RESPONSE in opposition re 78 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, 84 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints and Memorandum of Law in Support (Dispositive Motion) Exhibits filed by Eleanor M. Acres. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6)(Brigham, Leroy)
December 16, 2005 Filing 86 RESPONSE in opposition re 78 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, 84 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints and Memorandum of Law in Support (Dispositive Motion) Filed By All Plaintiffs, All Counterclaim Defendants, and All Third-Party Defendants Except Bryan and Lyon filed by Eleanor M. Acres. (Brigham, Leroy)
December 16, 2005 Filing 85 MOTION for leave to file excess pages by All Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants and Third-Party Defendants Except Bryan and Lyon by Eleanor M. Acres. (Brigham, Leroy)
November 28, 2005 Filing 84 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints and Memorandum of Law in Support (Dispositive Motion) by Jacob F. Bryan, IV, Wilford C. Lyon, Jr (Coll, Patrick) Modified on 11/29/2005 (SJW, ).
November 28, 2005 Filing 83 MOTION to dismiss Third-Party Complaints and Memorandum of Law in Support (Dispositive Motion) by Jacob F. Bryan, IV, Wilford C. Lyon, Jr, (Coll, Patrick) Modified on 11/29/2005 (SJW, ).
November 23, 2005 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in support re 78 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Braden, Gregory)
November 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting in part 77 Motion to File Brief Exceeding the 20 Page Limit, Defendant shall be permitted to file a brief no more than 25 pages within five days, striking the previously filed brief 79 . The parties are reminded that the Practice and Procedure Order 6 directs all attorneys in this case to begin using the Court's paperless filing system within 30 days of making an appearance in any MDL 1698 case. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. on 11/22/2005. (MO)
November 21, 2005 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM in support re 78 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Braden, Gregory) Modified on 11/23/2005 (STRICKEN per order #81) (SJW, ).
November 21, 2005 Filing 78 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by American General Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Braden, Gregory)
November 21, 2005 Filing 77 MOTION for leave to file excess pages by MDL - 1698 American General Life & Accident Insurance Co. Retiree Benefits ERISA Litigation. (Braden, Gregory)
November 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER. Defendant American General's Motion to Dismiss due by 5:00 p.m. 11/21/05; Third-Party Defendant Bryan and Lyon's Motion to Dismiss due by 5:00 p.m. 11/28/05. Opposition to the motions due 20 days after filing. See Order for directions re: filing pleadings. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. on 11/18/2005. (MO)
November 17, 2005 Filing 76 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr.: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/17/2005. Court Reporter: Deanne Moore (pg)
November 10, 2005 Filing 65 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1162-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-921-J-25MMH (MGG)
November 10, 2005 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1158-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-917-J-25MMH (MGG)
November 10, 2005 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1155-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-914-J-25MMH (MGG)
November 10, 2005 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1154-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-913-J-25MMH (MGG)
November 10, 2005 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1152-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-911-J-25MMH (MGG)
November 10, 2005 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1151-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-910-J-25MMH (MGG)
November 10, 2005 Filing 64 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1142-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-901-J-25MMH (MGG)
November 9, 2005 Filing 63 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7;05-cv-109-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-892-J-25MMH (SJW, )
November 9, 2005 Filing 60 Original record from the Northern District of Alabama Western Division, Case Number 7:05-cv-1169-UWC, New Case Number 3:05-cv-928-J-25-MMH (PAM )
November 9, 2005 Filing 59 Original record from Northern District of Alabama (Western Divison); Case Number 7:05-cv-1149-UWC: New Case Number: 3:05-cv-908-J-25MMH (PAM )
November 8, 2005 Filing 62 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1208-UWC. New Case # 3:05-cv-965-J-25MMH. (pwd, )
November 8, 2005 Filing 58 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1198-UWC. New Case # 3:05-cv-955-J-25MMH. (pwd, )
November 8, 2005 Filing 57 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1196-UWC. New Case # 3:05-cv-953-J-25MMH. (pwd, )
November 8, 2005 Filing 56 Orginal record form Northern District of Alabama Western Division; Case No. 7:05-cv-1136-UWC; New Case Number 3:05-cv-895-J-25MMH (PAM )
November 8, 2005 Filing 55 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1145-UWC. New Case # 3:05-cv-904-J-25MMH. (pwd, )
November 8, 2005 Filing 53 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1148-UWC. New Case # 3:05-cv-907-J-25MMH (pwd, )
November 8, 2005 Filing 52 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1171-UWC. New Case # 3:05-cv-930-J-25MMH (pwd, )
November 8, 2005 Filing 51 Original record from the Northern District of Alabama (Western Division), Case Number 7:05-cv-1156-UWC. New Case Number 3:05-cv-915-J-25MMH (PAM )
November 8, 2005 Filing 50 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1138-UWC. New Case #3:05-cv-897-J-25MMH (LRB)
November 8, 2005 Filing 49 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1141-UWC. New Case # 3:05-cv-900-J-25MMH (pwd, )
November 8, 2005 Filing 48 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1140-UWC. New Case #3:05-cv-899-J-25MMH. (LRB)
November 8, 2005 Filing 47 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1144-UWC. New Case # 3:05-cv-903-J-25MMH (pwd, ) .
November 8, 2005 Filing 46 Remark: Original record from the Southern District of Alabama (Western), Case Number 7:05-cv-1166-UWC, New Case Number 3:05-cv-925-J-25MMH (PAM )
November 8, 2005 Filing 45 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1150-UWC. New Case # 3:05-cv-909-J-25MMH (LRB)
November 8, 2005 Filing 44 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1160-UWC. New Case #3:05-cv-919-J-25MMH. (LRB)
November 8, 2005 Filing 43 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1170-UWC. New Case # 3:05-cv-929-J-25MMH. (LRB)
November 8, 2005 Filing 41 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case No. 7:05-cv-1164-UWC. New Case No. 3:05-cv-923-J-25MMH. (DH )
November 8, 2005 Filing 40 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case No. 7:05-cv-1165-UWC. New Case No. 3:05-cv-924-J-25MMH. (DH )
November 7, 2005 Filing 39 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1181-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-938-J-25MMH. (SJW, )
November 7, 2005 Filing 38 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case No. 7:05-cv-1163-UWC. New Case No. 3:05-cv-922-J-25MMH. (DH )
November 7, 2005 Filing 37 Original record form Northern District of Alabama, case #7:05-cv-1201-UWC. New Case #3:05-cv-958-J-25MMH. (SJW, )
November 7, 2005 Filing 36 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case No. 7:05-cv-1161-UWC. New Case No. 3:05-cv-920-J-25MMH. (DH )
November 7, 2005 Filing 35 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1191-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-948-J-25MMH.(SJW, )
November 7, 2005 Filing 34 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case No. 7:05-cv-1153-UWC. New Case No. 3:05-cv-912-J-25MMH. (DH )
November 7, 2005 Filing 33 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case #7:05-cv-1180-UWC. New case #3;05-cv-937-J-25MMH (SJW, ) Modified on 11/7/2005 (SJW, ).
November 7, 2005 Filing 31 Original record from the Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1202-UWC. New Case # 3:05-cv-959-J-25MMH. (JLM, )
November 7, 2005 Filing 30 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case No. 7:05-cv-1143-UWC. New Case No. 3:05-cv-902-J-25MMH. (DH )
November 4, 2005 Filing 74 Original record from Northern District of Alabama (Western Division); Case Number 7:05-cv-1137-UWC; New Case Number 3:05-cv-896-J-25MMH (DTS)
November 4, 2005 Filing 73 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1147-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-906-J-25MMH (DTS)
November 4, 2005 Filing 72 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case Number 7:05-cv-1157-UWC. New Case Number 3:05-cv-916-J-25MMH. (DTS)
November 4, 2005 Filing 71 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case #7:05-cv-1167-UWC, New Case #05-cv-926-J-25MMH (DTS)
November 4, 2005 Filing 61 Original record from the Northern District of Alambama Western Division; Case Number 7:05-cv-1139-UWC, New Case Number 3:05-cv-898-J-25MMH (PAM )
November 4, 2005 Filing 54 Original record from Northern District of Alabama (Western Division); Case Number 7:05-cv-1146-UWC; New Case Number 3:05-cv-905-J-25MMH (PAM )
November 3, 2005 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case # 7:05-cv-1182-UWC. New Case # 3;05-cv-939-J-25MMH (SJW, )
November 1, 2005 Filing 70 Original record from Northern Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1179-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-936-J-25MMH. (DTS)
November 1, 2005 Filing 69 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case #7:05-cv-1189-UWC. New Case #3:05-cv-946-25MMH. (DTS)
November 1, 2005 Filing 68 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case Number 7:05-cv-1205-UWC. New Case Number 3:05-cv-962-J-25MMH. (DTS)
November 1, 2005 Filing 67 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1206-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-963-J-25MMH (DTS)
November 1, 2005 Filing 66 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1209-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-966-J-25MMH. (DTS)
November 1, 2005 Filing 42 Remark: Original record from the Northern District of Alabama Western Division, Case Number 7:05-cv-1200-UWC. New Case Number: 3:05-cv-957-J-25MMH (PAM )
November 1, 2005 Filing 32 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case #7:05-cv-1199-UWC. New Case #3:05-cv-956-J-25MMH (DTS)
November 1, 2005 Filing 29 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case #7:05-cv-1175-UWC. New Case #3:05-cv-932-J-25MMH (SJW, )
November 1, 2005 Filing 28 Original record from Northern Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1204-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-961-J-25MMH. (MGG)
November 1, 2005 Filing 27 Original record from Northern Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1194-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-951-J-25MMH. (MGG)
November 1, 2005 Filing 26 Original record from Northern Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1184-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-941-J-25MMH. (MGG)
November 1, 2005 Filing 25 Original record from Northern Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1174-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-931-J-25MMH. (MGG)
November 1, 2005 Filing 24 Original record from Northern Alagama, case number 7:05-cv-1177-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-934-J-25MMH (LRB)
November 1, 2005 Filing 23 Original record from the Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-01188-UWC. New Case #3:05-cv-945-J-25MMH. (JLM, )
November 1, 2005 Filing 22 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case Number 7:05-cv-1187-UWC. New Case Number 3:05-cv-944-J-25MMH. (DH )
November 1, 2005 Filing 21 Original record from Northern Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1197-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-954-J-25MMH. (LRB)
November 1, 2005 Filing 20 Original Record from Northern Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1183-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-940-J-25MMH (LRB)
November 1, 2005 Filing 19 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case #7:05-cv-1110-UWC, New Case #05-cv-935 (JLM, ) .
November 1, 2005 Filing 18 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case Number 7:05-cv-1185-UWC. New Case Number 3:05-cv-942-J-25MMH. (DH )
November 1, 2005 Filing 17 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, case number 7:05-cv-1193-UWC. New case #3:05-cv-950-J-25MMH (LRB)
November 1, 2005 Filing 16 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case Number 7:05-cv-1207-UWC. New Case Number 3:05-cv-964-J-25MMH. (DH )
November 1, 2005 Filing 15 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case Number 7:05-cv-1192-UWC. New Case Number 3:05-cv-949-J-25MMH. (DH )
November 1, 2005 Filing 14 ORIGINAL record from Northern District of Alabama, case #7:05-cv-1203-UWC. New Case #3:05-cv-960-J-25MMH. (LRB)
November 1, 2005 Filing 13 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case Number 7:05-cv-1186-UWC. New Case Number 3:05-cv-943-J-25MMH. (DH )
November 1, 2005 Filing 12 Original record from Northern District of Alabama, Case number 7:05-cv-1190-UWC. New case number 3:05-cv-947-J-25MMH. (DH )
October 28, 2005 Filing 11 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. (Dewberry, Michael) Modified on 10/28/2005 (SJW, ).
October 27, 2005 Filing 10 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. (James, Pamela) Modified on 10/28/2005 (SJW, ).
October 27, 2005 Filing 9 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. (Coll, Patrick) Modified on 10/28/2005 (SJW, ).
October 17, 2005 Filing 80 Original record from Southern District of Georgia, case # 1:05-cv-51-BHD. New case # 3:05-cv-970-J-25MMH. (pwd, )
October 17, 2005 Filing 8 Remark Original record from Southern District of Georgia case #1:04-cv-192-DHB. New case #3:05-cv-893-J-25MMH. (LRB)
October 17, 2005 Filing 7 Original record from the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina, Columbia Division, Case Number 3:04-23427-22, MDL Case Number 1698, New Case Number 3:05-cv-894-J-25-MMH. (PAM)
October 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER upon transfer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407(a) and ORDER requiring electronic filing; Initial Pretrial conference set for 11/17/05 at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 10A. Signed by Judge Henry Lee Adams Jr. on 10/7/2005. (Attachments: (1) Schedule A (2) Schedule B (3) Schedule C) (MO)
September 19, 2005 Filing 5 MDL TRANSFER ORDER Signed by Michael J. Beck/Clerk of the Panel on 8/17/05. (SJW, )
September 7, 2005 Filing 4 ORIGINAL record from Middle District of Tennessee 3:05-228. New Case # 3:05-cv-838-J-25MMH. (SJW, )
August 19, 2005 Filing 3 ORIGINAL record from Middle District of Florida, case # 3:04-cv-1274-J-25MMH, ORIGINAL record from middle District of Florida, case # 3:05-cv-258-J-25MMH (SJW, )
August 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER adopting rules of procedures by MDL Panel on 04/02/01. (SJW, )
August 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MDL TRANSFER ORDER 3:04-cv-1274-J-25MMH, and 3:05-cv-258-J-25MMHSigned by Judge Wm. Terrell Hodges on 08/17/05. (SJW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: MDL - 1698 American General Life & Accident Insurance Co. Retiree Benefits ERISA litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: C. Eric Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Eleanor M. Acres
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Shirley R. Acuff
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Margaret R. Allen
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: John S. Andreason, Sr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Ruth S. Atkinson
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: John A. Banks
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Mary A. Barber
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Ethel P. Barnes
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Loyselle W. Barrs
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Warren J. Beckley
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Joy M. Behr
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Charles A. Bell, Sr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: James L. Bell
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Vivian S. Bennett
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: James F. Bilderback
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Virginia L. Bilderback
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Shirley M. Bilheimer
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Frances H. Blake
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Horace E. Booth
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: S. Colleen Borklund
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Clifford W. Bozeman
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Michael E. Braswell
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: William L. Brooks
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Sidney D. Brown
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Minnie Lou Bullington
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Robert M. Butler
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Paul Byrd
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Erna V. Cable
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Milagros C. Cabrera
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Frances B. Carrera
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Nicholas V. Carrera, Sr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: George F. Carswell, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Nancy E. Cassidy
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Anita R. Cates
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Jeanette E. Cavannaugh
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Lynn Chalmers
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: William C. Chambers, Sr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Ian M. Charlton
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Charles E. Clark
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Evelyn C. Clay-Woodard
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Floyd E. Clevenger, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Charles R. Clouse
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Mary L. Cole
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Morris F. Coleman
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Forest B. Combs
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Winfred L. Costine
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Ronald A. Cox
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Nancy M. Crenshaw
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Roy N. Crews
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Rubye T. Crews
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Arthur T. Criswell
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Emma Lee Purcell Crumpton
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Thomas B. Culbreth
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Dorothy E. Culpepper
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Jay L. Daugherty
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Elmer T. Dawkins
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: David P. Day
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: James G. Day
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Ana R. De Leon
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Willie D. Dewitt
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Annie S. Dilmore
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Joyce L. Dipatri
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Joan Dresslar
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Richard P. Dresslar
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: James E. Dugan
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Harold A. Duprey
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Dorothy Y. Ellerbe
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Harold H. Ellerbe
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Armand R. Emanuel
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: George P. Escobio
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Floyd Evans
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: June A. Falls
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Frances E. Fernley
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Edward L. Forrest
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Janice J. Freeman
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Harry A. French
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Elmer B. Frost, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Paul D. Frye
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Fernan A. Garess
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Melvin J. Garyn
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Patricia E. Gast
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Donald P. Gatewood
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Harvey C. George
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Ella Mae Gibson
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: William V. Gifford
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Howard Gilbert
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Roberta J. Gimbel
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Graham Gore
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Jaunelle C. Grace
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Kathryn C. Grover
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Irma C. Guilmette
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: James R. Guthrie
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Harold K. Harlow
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: James B. Harris
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Lorraine H. Hatcher
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Andrew J. Hayes
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Mildred Hebert
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Virginia H. Heidtman
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Mary E. Henry
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Catherine M. Hess
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Donald E. Hill
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: James Hobbs
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Spessard D. Holland
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Thomas C. Hollingsworth
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Rhonda G. Holt
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Jackie M. Horne
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Kevin E. Howell, Sr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Elizabeth S. Hughes
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: LLoyd A. Hurst
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: June C. J. Hyer
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: George T. Inglett
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Robert H. Ivey
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: William D. Jackson, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Vernell A. Johnson
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Carol J. White
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Elmer G. Kates, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Julian B. Kirkland, Sr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Raymond D. Kitchens
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: John J. Kowal
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Mary S. Kuyrkendall
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Annette W. Lang
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Ellen F. Leslie
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Marvin Locke
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Wylodine F. E. Long
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Madelaine Lopez
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Marie Y. Lupato
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Charlotte A. Luten
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Judith C. Lynch
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Lucy M. Lynch
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Kathleen M. Main
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Ralph J. Marlow, Sr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: John A. Mathis, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Tom N. Mathis
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Gladys M. Maxwell
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Milton R. Mays
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Richard L. McAdams, Sr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Roscoe L. McCulley
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Gerlad P. McGovern
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Eva H. McHenry
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Anna A. McIntosh
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Robert F. Melillo
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: William F. Melillo
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Doyle E. Melton
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Robert A. Miller
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Sarah F. Mills
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Frances B. Mizzell
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Joe D. Mobley, Sr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: William L. Moraca
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Edna E. Morrison
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Lucille C. Morrison
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: William K. Mouro
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: William R. Norton, Sr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Helen K. Odom
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Billy Ottenberg
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Julian W. Pafford
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Doris D. Card
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: June K. Partin
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: John E. Pate
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Ruth P. Paulk
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Donald R. Peak
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Maurice L. Perkins
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: James D. Perry
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Betty L. Phillips
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: William J. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Mildred V. Philyaw
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Katheryn L. Pisanelli
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Samuel E. Poole
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Catherine E. Powell
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Lorene J. Pryor
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Otto L. Quick
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Christine M. Rawles
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Herman E. Reeves
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Mildred N. Renfroe
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Owen M. Revels
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: John W. Rice, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Ursula V. Rice
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Doris M. Rizer
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Marilyn D. Roaf
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: John B. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Margie Roche
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Brenda C. Rochester
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Joseph E. Rodrigue
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Robin L. Roundtree
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Roy J. Rutherford
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Martha R. San-Martin
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Glorida K. Sauwdens
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Anthony J. Schleman
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Lester W. Seaborn, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Geraldine Selph
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Roger O. Shepard, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Robert W. Sheppard
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: William M. Sisco
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: John J. Sittie
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Jean T. Smith
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Lonnie G. Smith
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Roy E. Smith
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: William A. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Billy C. Smoak
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Richard K. Snyder
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Lydia V. Sockwell
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Florine T. Solano
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Arthur D. Stabile
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Ronald F. Stanford
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: William T. Stinson
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Ray J. Stone
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Nancy M. Storch
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Marcelle Suggs
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Arthur A. Swanigan
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Margaret R. Taylor
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Robert L. Taylor
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: John W. Thompson
Represented By: Thomas W. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Leslie O. Thompson
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Opal D. Thompson
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Samuel H. Thompson
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Frederick S. Thranhardt
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Robert G. Topper
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Josephine B. Townsend
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Arthur S. Upton
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Evelia Vilardebo
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Linzie L. Walker
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Willie Walker
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Iris Wall
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Lorraine E. Wallace
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Norma J. Ward
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Sharon K. Warren
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Louis A. Washer
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Dorothy L. Watson
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Johnny W. Watson
Represented By: Pamela Sue James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]