LANARD TOYS LIMITED v. TOYS "R" US-DELAWARE,INC. et al

Plaintiff: LANARD TOYS LIMITED
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC, JA-RU, Inc. and Toys "R" Us-Delaware, Inc.
Counter_claimant: JA-RU, Inc., Dolgencorp LLC and Toys "R" Us-Delaware, Inc.
Counter_defendant: LANARD TOYS LIMITED, Dolgencorp LLC, JA-RU, Inc. and Toys "R" Us-Delaware, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00849
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: XX Outside US
Referring Judge: Patricia D. Barksdale
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2017 391 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying and administratively closing this case. Joint status reports due every 120 days. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 11/13/2017. (JW)
August 29, 2017 373 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 288 Lanard Toys Limited's motion to compel. See order for details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 8/29/2017. (BGK)
July 14, 2017 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling 257 Plaintiff's Objection to the May 10, 2017 Order of Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale; affirming 253 Order. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 7/14/2017. (JW)
April 24, 2017 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 159 Lanard Toys Limited's motion seeking permission for its counsel to disclose to its employees Ja-Ru, Inc.'s unredacted customer list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/24/2017. (BGK)
December 16, 2016 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 176 Toys "R" Us-Delaware, Inc.'s motion to disqualify counsel; denying 178 Lanard Toys Limited's motion for oral argument and an evidentiary hearing; granting in part and denying in part 197 TRU's disc overy motion; and denying 201 Lanard's request for expenses incurred in responding to the discovery motion. Gordon & Rees must provide TRU the memorandum and unredacted billing records by December 30, 2016. The Court directs the clerk to reope n the case and directs the parties to file an amended joint case management report and any motion to maintain the unredacted version of this order under seal by January 27, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 12/16/2016. (BGK)
July 9, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 61 Amended Complaint and Demand for Trial by Jury. Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint consistent with the directives of this Order on or before August 10, 2015. Failure to do so may result in a dismissal of this action. Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint in accordance with the requirements of Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 7/9/2015. (KAB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANARD TOYS LIMITED v. TOYS "R" US-DELAWARE,INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANARD TOYS LIMITED
Represented By: Richard P. Sybert
Represented By: Robin Taylor Symons
Represented By: Eric R. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgencorp LLC
Represented By: Lewis Anten
Represented By: Ivy Mara Choderker
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Ben Ziggy Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JA-RU, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Anten
Represented By: Ivy Mara Choderker
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Ben Ziggy Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toys "R" Us-Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Anten
Represented By: Ivy Mara Choderker
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Ben Ziggy Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: JA-RU, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Anten
Represented By: Ivy Mara Choderker
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Lewis Anten
Represented By: Ivy Mara Choderker
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Ben Ziggy Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Dolgencorp LLC
Represented By: Lewis Anten
Represented By: Ivy Mara Choderker
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Lewis Anten
Represented By: Ivy Mara Choderker
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Toys "R" Us-Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Anten
Represented By: Ivy Mara Choderker
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Lewis Anten
Represented By: Ivy Mara Choderker
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Ben Ziggy Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: LANARD TOYS LIMITED
Represented By: Richard P. Sybert
Represented By: Robin Taylor Symons
Represented By: Richard P. Sybert
Represented By: Robin Taylor Symons
Represented By: Richard P. Sybert
Represented By: Robin Taylor Symons
Represented By: Richard P. Sybert
Represented By: Robin Taylor Symons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Dolgencorp LLC
Represented By: Lewis Anten
Represented By: Ivy Mara Choderker
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: JA-RU, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Anten
Represented By: Ivy Mara Choderker
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Ben Ziggy Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Toys "R" Us-Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Anten
Represented By: Ivy Mara Choderker
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Ben Ziggy Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?