Parkervision, Inc. v. Apple Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Parkervision, Inc.
Defendant: LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Apple Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, LG Electronics, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., QUALCOMM Incorporated and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv01477
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: Duval
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
2 Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER denying without prejudice #176 ParkerVision's Unopposed Motion to Seal ParkerVision's Motion to Compel Qualcomm to Answer Interrogatory 11. If necessary, Qualcomm's motion due by 1/2/2020. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 12/23/2019. (RLS)
December 20, 2019 Filing 176 UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file under seal ParkerVision's Motion to Compel Qualcomm to Answer Interrogatory 11 by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Modified on 12/23/2019 to edit text (PAM).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Appointing Jay M. Cohen, Esq. as mediator in this action. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 12/11/2019. (AMP)
December 6, 2019 Filing 174 NOTICE of Court-Approved Mediator by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Modified on 12/9/2019 to edit text (PAM).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ENDORSED ORDER: #172 Joint Motion to Extend Case Management Deadline is GRANTED. The parties shall identify their mediator no later than December 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 12/3/2019. (AMP)
November 29, 2019 Filing 172 JOINT MOTION to extend time to identify mediator by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 12/2/2019 to edit text (PAM).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER VACATING #153 Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order. The following deadlines shall control: Mediator selection due by 11/29/2019; Fact Discovery due by 1/30/2020; Conduct mediation hearing by 4/17/2020; Dispositive motions due by 4/17/2020; Pretrial statement due by 7/15/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Trial set for term commencing on 8/3/2020 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/20/2019. (AMP)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Amended Protective Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 10/28/2019. (TAM)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #168 Joint Amended Motion for a Protective Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 10/28/2019. (TAM)
October 25, 2019 Filing 168 JOINT AMENDED MOTION for protective order (Amended) by Parkervision, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Amended Protective Order)(Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 10/28/2019 to edit text (PAM).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ENDORSED ORDER granting #159 #160 #161 #162 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. If Chandran B. Iyer, Esq., Jason S. Charkow, Esq., Ronald M. Daignault, Esq., and Stephanie R. Mandir, Esq. have not already done so, they each shall immediately pay the admission fee and register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 10/17/2019. (TAM)
October 16, 2019 Filing 166 NOTICE to counsel Ronald M. Daignault of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (PAM)
October 16, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE to counsel Jason S. Charkow of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (PAM)
October 16, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE to counsel Chandran B. Iyer of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (PAM)
October 16, 2019 Filing 163 NOTICE to counsel Stephanie R. Mandir of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (PAM)
October 15, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Chandran B. Iyer, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031846.) Related document: #159 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Chandran B.Iyer to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
October 15, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Stephanie R. Mandir, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031849.) Related document: #162 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Stephanie R. Mandir to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
October 15, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jason S. Charkow, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031847.) Related document: #160 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Jason S. Charkow to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
October 15, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Ronald M. Daignault, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031848.) Related document: #161 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Ronald M. Daignault to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 162 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Stephanie R. Mandir to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 10/16/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings.
October 15, 2019 Filing 161 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Ronald M. Daignault to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 10/16/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings.
October 15, 2019 Filing 160 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Jason S. Charkow to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 10/16/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings.
October 15, 2019 Filing 159 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Chandran B.Iyer to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 10/16/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings.
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying without prejudice #157 Joint Motion for a Protective Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 10/4/2019. (TAM)
September 20, 2019 Filing 157 JOINT MOTION for protective order by Parkervision, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 9/23/2019 to edit text (PAM).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING #155 Joint Motion to Extend Case Management Deadlines. The Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order #153 is further AMENDED to adopt the parties' proposed deadlines. All other remaining deadlines in the Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/5/2019. (AMP)
September 4, 2019 Filing 155 Joint MOTION to extend time to Case Management Deadlines by Parkervision, Inc.. (Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
August 21, 2019 Filing 154 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (PAM)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediator selection due by 11/29/2019; Fact Discovery due by 12/20/2019; Conduct mediation hearing by 4/17/2020; Dispositive motions due by 4/17/2020; Pretrial statement due by 10/14/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Trial set for term commencing on 11/2/2020 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/21/2019. (AMP) Modified on 11/21/2019 (PAM). Vacated Per Order #171
July 30, 2019 Filing 152 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Thomas, John)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #109 Defendant Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment Precluding ParkerVision from Obtaining a Double Recovery, or in the Alternative, Motion to Sever and Stay. The Court's construction of the claim terms or phrases are constructed as provided in this order. The parties shall file a case management report on or before July 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/15/2019. (AMP)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ENDORSED ORDER granting #144 Plaintiff Parkervision, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Designation and Consent to Act. If Louis J. Freeh, Esq., has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 7/3/2019. (TSP)
July 2, 2019 Filing 149 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:15-cv-1477-J-39JBT. Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #144 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Louis J. Freeh to appear pro hac vice. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (SJW)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER of recusal and directing the Clerk of Court to reassign this case to another United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/1/2019. (ASL) Modified on 7/2/2019 to correct the case number on the document. (ASL).
June 26, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Louis J. Freeh, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031097.) Related document: #144 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Louis J. Freeh to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
June 26, 2019 Filing 147 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:15-cv-1477-J-39PDB. Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #144 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Louis J. Freeh to appear pro hac vice. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (SJW)
June 26, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 as to Counsel Louis J. Freeh regarding Special Admission Attorney Certification Form and Special Admission Fee (signed by deputy clerk). (PAM)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER of recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 6/26/2019. (KAW)
June 25, 2019 Filing 144 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Louis J. Freeh to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 6/25/2019 to edit text (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER OVERRULING #142 Plaintiff's Objections to the June 5, 2019 Order on its Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint; AFFIRMING #141 The Magistrate Judge's Order. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 6/21/2019. (AMP)
June 19, 2019 Filing 142 OBJECTION re #141 Order on Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Parkervision, Inc. by Parkervision, Inc.. (Thomas, John)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying #131 ParkerVision, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 6/5/2019. (KAW)
January 14, 2019 Filing 140 SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #131 MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint in Support of its Opposition to Parkervision's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint per Dkt. #138 filed by QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Brigham, Matthew) Modified on 1/15/2019 to edit text (PAM).
January 7, 2019 Filing 139 REPLY to Response to Motion re #131 MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint filed by Parkervision, Inc.. (Thomas, John)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #137 ParkerVision's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply to Qualcomm's Opposition to ParkerVision's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint; reply to #133 Opposition, not to exceed five pages, due 1/7/2019; optional sur-reply, not to exceed five pages, due 1/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 12/28/2018. (KAW)
December 21, 2018 Filing 137 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to #133 Qualcomm's Opposition to ParkerVision's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Modified on 12/21/2018 to create a docket entry relationship. (AEJ)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ENDORSED ORDER: #135 Joint Motion for Leave to File Revised Proposed Schedule is GRANTED. Within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of the Court's forthcoming Markman Order, the parties shall file a revised proposed case management schedule. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 12/18/2018. (AMP)
December 17, 2018 Filing 135 JOINT MOTION for leave to file Revised Proposed Schedule by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Modified on 12/18/2018 to edit text (PAM).
December 12, 2018 Filing 134 RESPONSE to Motion re #131 MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc. (Ferguson, Brian) Modified on 12/12/2018 to edit text (PAM).
December 12, 2018 Filing 133 RESPONSE in Opposition re #131 MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint , filed by QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew J. Brigham, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(Brigham, Matthew)
November 29, 2018 Filing 132 NOTICE of change of address by John R. Thomas (Thomas, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 131 MOTION for leave to file Third Amended Complaint by Parkervision, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Thomas, John)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #128 Anthony E. Faillaci's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Designation and Consent to Act. Anthony E. Faillaci is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff with Stephen D. Busey and John R. Thomas of Smith Hulsey & Busey as local counsel. Mr. Faillaci shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if he has not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 10/29/2018. (MDC)
October 26, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Anthony E. Faillaci, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX029334.) Related document: #128 MOTION for Anthony E. Faillaci to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
October 25, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE of Joint Proposal for Case Management Schedule by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Modified on 10/26/2018 to edit text (PAM).
October 24, 2018 Filing 128 MOTION for Anthony E. Faillaci to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 10/25/2018 (PAM). Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Anthony E. Faillaci regarding E-Filer Registration Form and $150.00 Special Admission Fee
October 4, 2018 Filing 127 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Plaintiff ParkerVision, Inc.'s Answer to Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Counterclaims to Plaintiff ParkerVision's Second Amended Complaint re: #119 by Parkervision, Inc.(Thomas, John)
October 4, 2018 Filing 126 REPLY to #118 Counterclaim by Parkervision, Inc. Related document: #118 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim filed by Apple Inc..(Thomas, John)
October 1, 2018 Filing 125 JOINT NOTICE Regarding Claim Construction by Parkervision, Inc., Apple Inc., and Qualcomm Inc. (Thomas, John) Modified on 10/1/2018 to edit text (PAM).
October 1, 2018 Filing 124 JOINT NOTICE Regarding Claim Construction by Parkervision Inc., Apple Inc., and Qualcomm Inc. (McNamara, Michael) Modifiedon 10/1/2018 to edit text (PAM).
September 20, 2018 Filing 123 RESPONSE re #109 MOTION for summary judgment precluding Parkervision from obtaining a double recovery, or in the alternative, motion to sever and stay filed by QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Brigham, Matthew)
September 20, 2018 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re #109 MOTION for summary judgment precluding Parkervision from obtaining a double recovery, or in the alternative, motion to sever and stay filed by Parkervision, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Weinger)(Thomas, John)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ENDORSED ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Second Amended Complaint attachment re #108 on the Court Docket as of August 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/14/2018. (CKS) Modified on 9/17/2018 to add relationship(SJW).
September 13, 2018 Filing 119 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Parkervision, Inc re #121 Second Amended Complaint. by QUALCOMM Incorporated.(Brigham, Matthew) Modified on 9/17/2018 to link (PAM).
September 13, 2018 Filing 118 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Parkervision, Inc. by Apple Inc re #121 Second Amended Complaint.( Soto, Edward) Modified on 9/17/2018 to link (PAM).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ENDORSED ORDER: #116 Parkervision, Inc.'s Assented to Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. On or before September 20, 2018, Parkervision shall respond to #109 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/13/2018. (AMP)
September 11, 2018 Filing 116 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #109 MOTION for summary judgment precluding Parkervision from obtaining a double recovery, or in the alternative, motion to sever and stay by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit text (PAM).
September 7, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Shelli Kozachenko. (SMK)
September 7, 2018 Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT of Technology Tutorial and Markman Claim Construction Hearing held on 8/31/18 before Judge Brian J. Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shelli Kozachenko,Telephone number 904.301.6842. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 9/28/2018, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2018, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/6/2018. (SMK)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER directing the parties to file on or before October 3, 2018, a joint notice advising the Court whether the parties have reached an agreement on any disputed claim terms or phrases for construction or claim phrases alleged to be indefinite. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/5/2018. (AMP)
August 31, 2018 Filing 121 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., QUALCOMM Incorporated with Jury Demand. filed by Parkervision, Inc. (PAM) Modified on 9/17/2018 to change date (PAM).
August 31, 2018 Filing 113 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Brian J. Davis: TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL AND MARKMAN CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING held on 8/31/2018; granting #108 Parkervision's Assented-To Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Court Reporter: Shelli Kozachenko (CKS)
August 31, 2018 Filing 111 SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE re #109 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/31/2018. (AEJ)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #106 and #107 Plaintiff Parkervision, Inc.'s Unopposed Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Designations and Consents to Act. Samuel F. Davenport and Patrick T. Driscoll are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff with Stephen D. Busey and John R. Thomas of Smith Hulsey & Busey as local counsel. Mr. Davenport and Mr. Driscoll shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/30/2018. (MDC)
August 30, 2018 Filing 109 MOTION for summary judgment precluding Parkervision from obtaining a double recovery, or in the alternative, motion to sever and stay by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of William Noellert, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Robert T. Vlasis, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Declaration of Robert T. Vlasis, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to the Declaration of Robert T. Vlasis)(Ferguson, Brian)
August 30, 2018 Filing 108 Consent MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint by Parkervision, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint)(Thomas, John)
August 28, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Samuel F. Davenport, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX028830.) Related document: #106 Unopposed MOTION for Samuel F. Davenport to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
August 28, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Patrick T. Driscoll, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX028829.) Related document: #107 Unopposed MOTION for Patrick T. Driscoll to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
August 28, 2018 Filing 107 Unopposed MOTION for Patrick T. Driscoll to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc.. (Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (BD). Modified on 8/29/2018 to replace with redacted PDF. (Notified counsel to include full case number including judge's codes on future filings) (BD).
August 28, 2018 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Samuel F. Davenport to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc.. (Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (BD). Modified on 8/29/2018 to replace with redacted PDF (BD).
May 17, 2018 Filing 105 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Brian J. Davis: TELEPHONIC HEARING held on 5/17/2018. Court Reporter: Shelli Kozachenko (CKS)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER SETTING HEARING: This matter is set for hearing to be held on Friday, 8/31/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in Jacksonville Courtroom 12C before Judge Brian J. Davis for the purposes of a Technology Tutorial and a Markman Claim Construction Hearing. The Court has set aside the entire day for these purposes. Counsel for the parties will be responsible for ensuring that all electronic equipment is operational prior to start of the hearing. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/17/2018. (AMP)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #96 Joint Motion to Dismiss Certain Patents and Covenant Not to Sue. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 4/27/2018. (AMP)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #85 Joint Motion to Schedule a Technology Tutorial and ParkerVision Motion to Appoint a Technical Advisor. A TELEPHONIC Case Management Conference is scheduled for 5/17/2018 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Brian J. Davis. See order for details. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 4/27/18. (AMP)
April 16, 2018 Filing 101 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand re #97 Counterclaim by Parkervision, Inc..(Thomas, John)
April 9, 2018 Filing 100 ANSWER to #98 Amended Counterclaim by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Modified on 4/10/2018 to edit text (PAM).
April 5, 2018 Filing 99 UPDATE to JOINT STATEMENT Regarding Scheduling of Claim Construction Markman Hearing by Parkervision, Inc. re #87 Notice (Thomas, John) Modified on 4/6/2018 to edit text (PAM).
March 26, 2018 Filing 98 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand #3 , COUNTERCLAIM against Parkervision, Inc. by QUALCOMM Incorporated.(Brigham, Matthew) Modified on 3/27/2018 to edit text (PAM).
March 26, 2018 Filing 97 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #3 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Parkervision, Inc. by Apple Inc..(Soto, Edward)
March 16, 2018 Filing 96 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Certain Patents and Covenant Not to Sue by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Modified on 3/19/2018 to edit text (PAM).
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER OVERRULING #89 Defendant Qualcomm's Objections to Report and Recommendation; ADOPTING #88 Report and Recommendation; DENYING #58 Defendant Apple's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue; DENYING #60 Defendant Qualcomm's Motion to Transfer to the Southern District of California. Defendant Apple, Inc. is DIRECTED to respond to #3 Amended Complaint on or before March 26, 2018. Defendant Qualcomm may amend on or before March 26, 2018, its Answer and Counterclaims solely for the purpose of making clear it contests venue as to the infringement counts set forth in the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 3/8/2018. (AMP)
February 6, 2018 Filing 94 RESPONSE to objections to #88 Report and Recommendations filed by Parkervision, Inc.. (Thomas, John)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #90 Ibrahim Hallaj's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Designation and Consent to Act. Ibrahim Hallaj is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff with Stephen D. Busey and John R. Thomas of Smith Hulsey & Busey as local counsel. Mr. Hallaj shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if he has not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/30/2018. (MDC)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #91 Qualcomm Incorporated's Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel. Benjamin Damstedt is permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated in this matter. Defendant will continue to be represented by the other counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/29/2018. (MDC)
January 26, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Ibrahim M. Hallaj, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX026582.) Related document: #90 MOTION for Ibrahim Hallaj to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
January 26, 2018 Filing 91 MOTION for Benjamin G. Damstedt to withdraw as attorney by QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Brigham, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
January 25, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION for Ibrahim Hallaj to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc.. (Thomas, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
January 23, 2018 Filing 89 OBJECTION re #88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #60 MOTION to transfer case to the Southern District of California filed by QUALCOMM Incorporated, #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Apple Inc.. . (Brigham, Matthew)
January 9, 2018 Filing 88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding #58 Defendant Apple's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and #60 Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Motion to Transfer to the Southern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/9/2018. (KAW)
January 5, 2018 Filing 87 JOINT STATEMENT Regarding Scheduling of Claim Construction Markman Hearing by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Modified on 1/8/2018 to edit text (PAM).
January 5, 2018 Filing 86 JOINT Claim Construction Chart by Parkervision, Inc. re #55 Case management and scheduling order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thomas, John) Modified on 1/5/2018 to edit text (PAM).
December 21, 2017 Filing 85 JOINT MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Schedule a Technology Tutorial and ParkerVision's Motion to Appoint a Technical Advisor by Parkervision, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thomas, John) Modified on 12/21/2017 to edit text (PAM).
December 14, 2017 Filing 84 RESPONSE re #80 Brief - Plaintiff Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Apple Inc., QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Damstedt, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Damstedt, Benjamin)
December 14, 2017 Filing 83 RESPONSE re #81 Brief - Defendant - ParkerVision's Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Parkervision, Inc.. (Thomas, John)
November 17, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #60 MOTION to transfer case to the Southern District of California by QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brigham, Matthew)
November 16, 2017 Filing 81 DEFENDANT'S BRIEF re #55 Case management and scheduling order Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Apple Inc., QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Behzad Razavi, Ph.D., #2 Declaration of Benjamin G. Damstedt, #3 Exhibit 1-part 1, #4 Exhibit 1-part 2, #5 Exhibit 1-part 3, #6 Exhibit 1-part 4, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10)(Damstedt, Benjamin)
November 16, 2017 Filing 80 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re #55 Case management and scheduling order ParkerVision's Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Parkervision, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit A part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S)(Thomas, John)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REFERRING Motions for Report and Recommendation: #58 Defendant Apple's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and #60 Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Motion to Transfer to the Southern District of California. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/7/2017. (AMP) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
November 3, 2017 Filing 78 JOINT List of Claim Terms for Construction, and the Parties' Proposed Construction of Each Term by All Plaintiffs. (Thomas, John) Modified on 11/6/2017 to edit text. Chambers notified (PAM).
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER APPROVING and GRANTING #76 Stipulation Regarding Expert Testimony Relating to Claim Construction which the Court construes as a Joint Motion to Modify Certain Deadlines in the Case Management and Scheduling Order. Following the conclusion of the claim construction briefing, the parties will be asked to submit a joint statement regarding the scheduling of a Claim Construction Markman Hearing. See order for other details. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/3/2017. (AMP)
November 2, 2017 Filing 76 STIPULATION Regarding Expert Testimony Relating to Claim Construction by QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Brigham, Matthew)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, and Written Designation and Consent to Act. Dena Chen is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated with Michael E. Lockamy and the law firm of Bedell, Dittmar, DeVault, Pillans & Coxe, P.A. as local counsel. Ms. Chen shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if she has not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 10/24/2017. (MDC)
October 23, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Dena Chen, appearing on behalf of QUALCOMM Incorporated (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX025581.) Related document: #74 Unopposed MOTION for Dena Chen to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
October 23, 2017 Filing 74 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Dena Chen to appear pro hac vice by QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Lockamy, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 10/24/2017 to edit text (PAM). Pro Hac Vice Letter sent to Counsel Denal Chen re: Special Admission Attorney Certification Form and Fee Payment.
October 9, 2017 Filing 73 SUR-REPLY re #60 MOTION to transfer case to the Southern District of California filed by Parkervision, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Thomas, John) Modified on 10/10/2017 (PAM).
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #71 ParkerVision's Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply to Qualcomm's Motion to Transfer. ParkerVision may file a sur-reply, not to exceed three (3) pages in length, on or before October 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/25/2017. (AMP)
September 22, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply to Qualcomm's Motion to Transfer by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John)
September 15, 2017 Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re #60 MOTION to transfer case to the Southern District of California filed by QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Damstedt, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Damstedt, Benjamin)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #66 Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Motion for Leave to Reply. Defendant may file a reply, not to exceed three (3) pages in length, on or before September 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/1/2017. (AMP)
August 31, 2017 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION for leave to file Reply in support of Motion to Transfer filed by Parkervision, Inc.. (Thomas, John)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDERED: Plaintiff ParkerVision, Inc. shall file a response to #66 Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Motion For Leave to Reply on or before September 1, 2017, or the Motion will be considered as unopposed. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/25/2017. (AMP)
August 24, 2017 Filing 66 MOTION for leave to file Reply in support of Motion to Transfer by QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Damstedt, Benjamin)
August 14, 2017 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #60 MOTION to transfer case to the Southern District of California filed by Parkervision, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thomas, John)
August 14, 2017 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Parkervision, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thomas, John)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER dismissing without prejudice the claims in this action as to the LG Defendants only. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendants LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. from the Court docket. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/31/2017. (AMP)
July 27, 2017 Filing 62 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. (Vlasis, Robert) Modified on 7/28/2017 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings
July 27, 2017 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Brigham, Matthew)
July 27, 2017 Filing 60 MOTION to transfer case to the Southern District of California by QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Brigham, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration of Matthew R. Dobbins)(Brigham, Matthew)
July 27, 2017 Filing 59 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. (Ferguson, Brian) Modified on 7/28/2017 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings See Doc. #62
July 27, 2017 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Jaynes)(Ferguson, Brian) Modified on 7/28/2017 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings
July 27, 2017 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John)
July 21, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to the LG Defendants Only by Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John) Modified on 7/24/2017 to edit text (PAM).
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The following settings and deadlines shall apply: Discovery Limited to Issues of Claim Construction due by 11/10/2017; Simultaneous Opening Claim Construction (Markman) Briefs due by 11/16/2017; Simultaneous Responsive Claim Construction (Markman) Briefs due by 12/14/2017; Joint Claim Construction Chart Setting Forth Each Claim Term/Phrase and Each Party's Proposed Construction due by 1/5/2018; Claim Construction Hearing to be scheduled for Mid January 2018. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/19/2017. (AMP)
July 6, 2017 Filing 54 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Busey, Stephen)
July 6, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Thomas on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Thomas, John)
June 16, 2017 Filing 52 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/16/2017. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(AMP)
June 13, 2017 Filing 51 RESPONSE re #19 Answer to amended complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff ParkerVision, Inc. Answer to Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Counterclaims by Parkervision, Inc. (Busey, Stephen) Modified on 6/14/2017 to edit text (PAM).
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #48 Motion to Reopen the Case and Lift Stay. The Clerk is DIRECTED to REOPEN this case and place it on the Court's active docket. The parties shall conduct a Case Management Conference within 30 days of this order and file a Joint Case Management Report within 14 days thereafter. See order for details. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/25/2017. (AMP)
May 12, 2017 Filing 49 STATUS report and RESPONSE to ParkerVision's #48 Motion to Open The Case And Lift Stay by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc., Apple Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Brigham, Matthew) Modified on 5/12/2017 to link correctly (PAM).
May 4, 2017 Filing 48 MOTION to Reopen Case and Lift Stay by Parkervision, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bolling, James)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Qualcomm Incorporated's Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel. Timothy S. Teter is permitted to withdraw as counsel of record forDefendant Qualcomm Incorporated in this matter. Defendant will continue to be represented by the other counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/25/2017. (MDC)
January 24, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION for Timothy S. Teter to withdraw as attorney by QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Brigham, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel. Courtney K. Grimm is permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants Qualcomm Incorporated, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc. in this matter. Defendants will continue to be represented by the other counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/23/2016. (MDC)
August 19, 2016 Filing 44 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Courtney K. Grimm to withdraw as attorney by LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., QUALCOMM Incorporated. (DeVault, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 8/19/2016 to edit text (PAM).
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER dismissing without prejudice the claims and counterclaims in this action as to the Samsung Defendants only. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC and Samsung Semiconductor, Inc. from the Court docket. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/10/2016. (AMP)
July 22, 2016 Filing 42 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to the Samsung Defendants Only by Parkervision, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Bolling, James)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting #40 Unopposed Motion to Stay. The Clerk is directed to administratively close the file pending a motion to reopen filed by any party. See order for details. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 2/12/2016. (AMP)
February 9, 2016 Filing 40 UNOPPSED MOTION to stay by Apple Inc., LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., QUALCOMM Incorporated, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Teter, Timothy) Modified on 2/10/2016 to edit text (PAM).
February 9, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Apple Inc., LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., QUALCOMM Incorporated, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Teter, Timothy)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Parkervision's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Qualcomm's Counterclaim. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 4/27/2016 to file a response to Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated's Answer and Counterclaims to Plaintiff Parkervision Inc.'s Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 19). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 2/5/2016. (MDC)
February 4, 2016 Filing 37 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #19 Answer to amended complaint/counterclaim by Parkervision, Inc. (Bolling, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 2/4/2016 to edit text (PAM).
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Attorneys from Service List. Mark Fowler, Aaron Wainscoat, Erik Fuehrer, Erin McLaughlin, Edward Sikorski, and Kevin Hamilton are permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, and Samsung Semiconductor, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 2/3/2016. (MDC)
February 1, 2016 Filing 35 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw Attorneys from Service List by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Elman, Jeremy) Modified on 2/2/2016 to edit text (PAM).
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #28 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, and Written Designation and Consent to Act. Brian R. Nester, Michael R. Franzinger, and Wonjoo Suh are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., and LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A. with John A. DeVault, III and the law firm of Bedell, Dittmar, DeVault, Pillans & Coxe, P.A. as local counsel. Mr. Nester, Mr. Franzinger, and Mr. Suh shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/24/2016. (MDC)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #27 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, and Written Designation and Consent to Act. Stephen C. Neal, Timothy S. Teter, Stephen Smith, Jeffrey Karr, Matthew J. Brigham, Benjamin G. Damstedt, and Eamonn Gardner are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Qualcomm Incorporated with John A. DeVault, III and the law firm of Bedell, Dittmar, DeVault, Pillans & Coxe, P.A. as local counsel. Mr. Neal, Mr. Teter, Mr. Smith, Mr. Karr, Mr. Brigham, Mr. Damstedt, and Mr. Gardner shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/24/2016. (MDC)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #21 and #22 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consents to Designation, and Requests to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Brian E. Ferguson and Robert T. Vlasis are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Apple, Inc. with Edward Soto as local counsel. Mr. Ferguson and Mr. Vlasis shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so. DONE AND ORDERED at Jacksonville, Florida on January 24, 2016 Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/24/2016. (MDC)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendants LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., and LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc. shall have up to and including 4/12/2016 to file a response to the Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 3). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/20/2016. (MDC)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #10 and #11 William A. Meunier's and Michael J. McNamara's Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Designations and Consents to Act. William A. Meunier and Michael J. McNamara are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff with Stephen D. Busey and James A. Bolling as local counsel. Mr. Meunier and Mr. McNamara shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/19/2016. (MDC)
January 19, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Stephen C. Neal, Matthew J. Brigham, Stephen R. Smith, Eamonn Gardner, Benjamin G. Damstedt, Jeffrey Karr, Timothy S. Teter, appearing on behalf of QUALCOMM Incorporated (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX18911.) Related document: #27 Unopposed MOTION for Stephen C. Neal, Matthew J. Brigham, Stephen R. Smith, Eamonn Gardner, Benjamin G. Damstedt, Jeffrey Karr, and Timothy S. Teter to appear pro hac vice. (AET)
January 19, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Michael Franzinger and Brian Nester, appearing on behalf of LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX18910.) Related document: #28 Unopposed MOTION for Michael Franzinger, Brian R. Nester, and Wonjoo Suh to appear pro hac vice. (AET)
January 19, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Wonjoo Suh, appearing on behalf of LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX18909.) Related document: #28 Unopposed MOTION for Michael Franzinger, Brian R. Nester, and Wonjoo Suh to appear pro hac vice. (AET) Modified on 1/20/2016 (AET).
January 19, 2016 Filing 29 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Amended Complaint by LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (DeVault, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 1/20/2016 to edit text (PAM).
January 19, 2016 Filing 28 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Michael Franzinger, Brian R. Nester, and Wonjoo Suh to appear pro hac vice by LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (DeVault, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 1/20/2016 to edit text (PAM).
January 19, 2016 Filing 27 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Stephen C. Neal, Matthew J. Brigham, Stephen R. Smith, Eamonn Gardner, Benjamin G. Damstedt, Jeffrey Karr, and Timothy S. Teter to appear pro hac vice by QUALCOMM Incorporated. (DeVault, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 1/20/2016 to edit text (PAM).
January 19, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing Waiver of Service of Summons on behalf of LG Electronics, Inc. by Parkervision, Inc. (Bolling, James) Modified on 1/19/2016 to edit text (PAM).
January 15, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Brian E. Ferguson, appearing on behalf of Apple Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA34400.). (JNB)
January 15, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Robert T. Vlasis, appearing on behalf of Apple Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA34400.). (JNB)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; #20 Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint; and #24 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint; response deadlines to #3 Amended Complaint are as follows: Defendants LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.: January 20, 2016; Defendant Apple, Inc.: February 29, 2016; Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.; Samsung Electronics America, Inc.; Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC; and Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.: April 12, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 1/14/2016. (KAW)
January 14, 2016 Filing 24 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Elman, Jeremy) Modified on 1/14/2016 to edit text (PAM).
January 14, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Waiver of Service of Summons on behalf of Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. by Parkervision, Inc. (Bolling, James) Modified on 1/14/2016 to edit text (PAM).
January 14, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION for Robert T. Vlasis to appear pro hac vice by Apple Inc.. (Soto, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
January 14, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION for Brian E. Ferguson to appear pro hac vice by Apple Inc. (Soto, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 1/14/2016 to edit text (PAM).
January 14, 2016 Filing 20 UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend time to Respond to the Amended Complaint by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soto, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 1/14/2016 to edit text (PAM).
January 13, 2016 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #3 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Parkervision, Inc. by QUALCOMM Incorporated.(DeVault, John) Modified on 1/14/2016 (PAM).
January 13, 2016 Filing 18 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File for LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A. Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Parkervision, Inc. (Bolling, James) Modified on 1/14/2016 to edit text (PAM).
January 12, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney William A. Meunier, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018866.). (TSW)
January 12, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Michael J. McNamara, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018867.). (TSW)
January 8, 2016 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 12/23/15 by Parkervision, Inc. as to QUALCOMM Incorporated. (Bolling, James)
January 8, 2016 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 12/31/15 by Parkervision, Inc. as to Apple Inc.. (Bolling, James)
January 8, 2016 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 12/23/15 by Parkervision, Inc. as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Bolling, James)
January 8, 2016 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 12/29/15 by Parkervision, Inc. as to LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc.. (Bolling, James)
January 8, 2016 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 12/29/15 by Parkervision, Inc. as to Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Bolling, James)
January 8, 2016 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 12/29/15 by Parkervision, Inc. as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Bolling, James)
January 8, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION for Michael J. McNamara to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc.. (Bolling, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
January 8, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION for William A. Meunier to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc.. (Bolling, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
December 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 , #6 , #7 , and #8 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Designations and Consents to Act; Daniel B. Weinger, Michael T. Renaud, James M. Wodarski, and Kristina R. Cary are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff with Stephen D. Busey and James A. Bolling as local counsel; attorneys shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 12/24/2015. (KAW)
December 23, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Michael T. Renaud, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018695.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Michael T. Renaud to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
December 23, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney James M. Wodarski, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018694.) Related document: #7 MOTION for James M. Wodarski to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
December 23, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Kristina R. Cary, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018692.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Kristina R. Cary to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
December 23, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Daniel B. Weinger, appearing on behalf of Parkervision, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018693.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Daniel B. Weinger to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
December 23, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION for Kristina R. Cary to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc.. (Bolling, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
December 23, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION for James M. Wodarski to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc.. (Bolling, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
December 23, 2015 Filing 6 MOTION for Michael T. Renaud to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc.. (Bolling, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
December 23, 2015 Filing 5 MOTION for Daniel B. Weinger to appear pro hac vice by Parkervision, Inc.. (Bolling, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
December 16, 2015 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (RH) (RH). Modified on 12/17/2015 to correct (RH).
December 16, 2015 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Parkervision, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Parkervision, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 39)(Bolling, James)
December 15, 2015 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Apple Inc., LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., QUALCOMM Incorporated, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (RH)
December 14, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., QUALCOMM Incorporated, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX18555) filed by Parkervision, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 part A, #6 Exhibit 4 part B, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Civil Cover Sheet)(RH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parkervision, Inc. v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics MobileCOMM U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Wonjoo Suh
Represented By: Michael R. Franzinger
Represented By: John Andrew DeVault, III
Represented By: Brian R. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Erik Fuehrer
Represented By: Mark Fowler
Represented By: Jeremy Todd Elman
Represented By: Kevin Hamilton
Represented By: Erin McLaughlin
Represented By: Edward H. Sikorski
Represented By: Aaron Wainscoat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Edward Soto
Represented By: Robert T. Vlasis
Represented By: Brian E. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Wonjoo Suh
Represented By: Michael R. Franzinger
Represented By: John Andrew DeVault, III
Represented By: Brian R. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC
Represented By: Erik Fuehrer
Represented By: Mark Fowler
Represented By: Jeremy Todd Elman
Represented By: Kevin Hamilton
Represented By: Erin McLaughlin
Represented By: Edward H. Sikorski
Represented By: Aaron Wainscoat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Wonjoo Suh
Represented By: Michael R. Franzinger
Represented By: John Andrew DeVault, III
Represented By: Brian R. Nester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.
Represented By: Erik Fuehrer
Represented By: Mark Fowler
Represented By: Jeremy Todd Elman
Represented By: Kevin Hamilton
Represented By: Erin McLaughlin
Represented By: Edward H. Sikorski
Represented By: Aaron Wainscoat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUALCOMM Incorporated
Represented By: Benjamin Damstedt
Represented By: Courtney Kneece Grimm
Represented By: Stephen R. Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Karr
Represented By: Eamonn Gardner
Represented By: Timothy S. Teter
Represented By: Dena Chen
Represented By: Matthew Brigham
Represented By: Stephen C. Neal
Represented By: Michael E. Lockamy
Represented By: John Andrew DeVault, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Erik Fuehrer
Represented By: Mark Fowler
Represented By: Jeremy Todd Elman
Represented By: Kevin Hamilton
Represented By: Erin McLaughlin
Represented By: Edward H. Sikorski
Represented By: Aaron Wainscoat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parkervision, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Thomas
Represented By: Anthony E. Faillaci
Represented By: Michael T. Renaud
Represented By: Daniel B. Weinger
Represented By: Michael J. McNamara
Represented By: James Arthur Bolling
Represented By: Patrick T. Driscoll
Represented By: Kristina R. Cary
Represented By: Ibrahim Hallaj
Represented By: William A. Meunier
Represented By: James M. Wodarski
Represented By: Samuel F. Davenport
Represented By: Stephen D. Busey
Represented By: Louis J. Freeh
Represented By: Chandran B. Iyer
Represented By: Jason S. Charkow
Represented By: Stephanie R. Mandir
Represented By: Ronald M. Daignault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?