Capitol Body Shop, Inc. et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Capitol Body Shop, Inc, Crystal Car Care, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC, B & W Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Protouch Collision, LLC, Barry Lewis, Canton Collision, LLC, Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc. and East McComb Body Shop, Inc.
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association, Shelter General Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, GEICO General Insurance Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv00015
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Henry Lee Adams
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2017 Mail returned as not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward re: #81 Order. Mail resent to Mark J. Botti @ 2550 M Street Northwest, Washington, DC 20037. (AEJ)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 1/9/2017. (MO)
January 6, 2017 Filing 80 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 6:14-cv-06000. File received electronically. Modified on 1/6/2017 to correctly reflect transferee Court(LRB).
September 15, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of hearing on all pending motions to dismiss set for 11/14/2014 at 10:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell. Case number 6:14-cv-00310 # 156,191,192,201,204,209,210,211,212,215,216,235,243,249,and 254. Case number 6:14-cv-06001 #104,106,108,110,112, and 114. Case number 6:14-cv-6000 #26,31,24,and 44. Case number 6:14-cv-6002 #9,17,and 19. Case number 6:14-cv-6003 # 14,45,51,and 54. (LAK) Modified on 9/16/2014 (LAM). [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
August 12, 2014 Filing 78 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 3:14-cv-00012. File received electronically [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
August 12, 2014 Filing 77 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Middle District of Florida. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
August 8, 2014 Filing 76 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Middle District of Florida. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
August 7, 2014 Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Legal Claim, #68 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Goldfine - PHV, Dan) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
August 7, 2014 Filing 74 Rebuttal re #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
August 7, 2014 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Support re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
August 6, 2014 Filing 72 Rebuttal re #41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order)(Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), #41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, and #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. The new deadline is August 7, 2014. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 07/31/14. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. (jc) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 30, 2014 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), #41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 28, 2014 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Legal Claim filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 23, 2014 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stamper Complaints)(Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 21, 2014 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 21, 2014 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, Dowdy & Dowdy, #2 Exhibit Complaint, US v. ACSC)(Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 18, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin B. Morgan on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Morgan, Benjamin) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 18, 2014 Filing 65 COPY of MDL NOTICE. (RRL) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. The new deadline is July 20, 2014. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 07/17/14. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. (jc) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 Joint Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Legal Claim. The new deadline is July 22, 2014. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 07/17/14. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. (jc) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 16, 2014 Filing 64 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 16, 2014 Filing 63 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 16, 2014 Filing 62 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Legal Claim by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 16, 2014 Filing 61 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Alexander Body Shop, LLC, Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Mark Cook, Crystal Car Care, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Barry Lewis, Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Walkers Collision Center, Inc. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Dan W. Goldfine be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/16/2014. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Michael R. Nelson, Jeffrey S. Cashdan and Christine A. Hopkinson be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/16/2014. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION for Dan W. Goldfine to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing)(Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 59 MOTION for Christine A. Hopkinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 58 MOTION for Jeffrey S. Cashdan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 15, 2014 Filing 57 MOTION for Michael R. Nelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 15, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Michael Nelson, $ 100, receipt number 34643028265. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 15, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fees paid by Christine A. Hopkinson and Jeffrey Cashdan, $ 200.00, receipt number 34643028282. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 15, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Dan W. Goldfine receipt number 0538-2725560 $ 100 (Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Kymberly Kochis be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants Progressive Casualty Insurance Company and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/14/2014. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 11, 2014 Filing 56 MOTION for Kymberly Kochis to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 11, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Kymberly Kochis, $ 100, receipt number 34643028216. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Ernest E. Vargo be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/2/14. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Richard L. Fenton be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Property and Casualty Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/2/14. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 1, 2014 Filing 55 MOTION for Richard L. Fenton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Admission to Bar of Illinois)(Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Michael H. Carpenter, Michael N. Beekhuizen, Peter T. Snow and Mark J. Botti be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/1/14 (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Michael P. Kenny, Tiffany L. Powers and Elizabeth Helmer be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurannce Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/1/14. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Shelter Mutual Insurance Company for Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Best, Robert) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 30, 2014 Filing 53 MOTION for Ernest E. Vargo to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 30, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Ernest E. Vargo receipt number 0538-2714914 $ 100 (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 52 MOTION for Mark J. Botti to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 51 MOTION for Peter T. Snow to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 50 MOTION for Michael N. Beekhuizen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 49 MOTION for Michael H. Carpenter to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Maron, David) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 27, 2014 Filing 47 MOTION for Richard L. Fenton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That the motion of Richard L. Fenton for pro hac vice admission is denied. The applicant did not obtain the signature of the resident attorney on the application for admission. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/27/14. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 27, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Michael N. Beekhuizen, $ 100, receipt number 34643028002. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 27, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fees paid by Tiffany L. Powers, Elizabeth Helmer, Michael P. Kenny, $ 300.00, receipt number 34643028000. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 27, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Michael H. Carpenter, $ 100, receipt number 34643028003. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 27, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Peter T. Snow, $ 100, receipt number 34643028001. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 27, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by Mark J. Botti, $ 100, receipt number 34643028004. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company. (Boschert, Neville) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Legal Claim filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Boschert, Neville) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Legal Claim by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Boschert, Neville) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] Modified on 9/15/2014 (LAK). [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support re #41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] Modified on 9/15/2014 (LAK). [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC for Allstate Insurance Company. (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company. (Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Property and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC for Allstate Property and Casualty Company. (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Brabec on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 35 MOTION for Elizabeth Helmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Helmer GA Bar Good Standing Certificate)(Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 34 MOTION for Tiffany L. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Powers DC, GA, VA and PA Bar Good Standing Certificates)(Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 32 MOTION for Michael P. Kenny to Appear Pro Hac Vice by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Kenny GA Bar Good Standing Certificate)(Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] Modified on 9/15/2014 (LAK). [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 30 ATTACHMENT re #29 MOTION for Richard L. Fenton to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 29 MOTION for Richard L. Fenton to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Griffin on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, 110 Order of Dismissal in A&E Auto Body, Inc. v. 21st Century Centennial Insurance Company, et al.; USDC, MD FL; No. 6:14cv310-ORL-31TBS)(Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 26, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Richard L. Fenton receipt number 0538-2712879 $ 100 (Griffin, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Michael E. Mumford be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/25/14. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Jamie L. Halavais be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendant GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/25/14. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 24, 2014 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 23, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION for Michael E. Mumford to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 23, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Neville H. Boschert on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Boschert, Neville) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 23, 2014 Filing 22 MOTION for Jamie L. Halavais to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 23, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Jamie L. Halavais receipt number 0538-2710573 $ 100 (Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 23, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Michael E. Mumford receipt number 0538-2710631 $ 100 (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Amelia W. Koch and Steven F. Griffith, Jr. be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants USAA Casualty Insurance Company and United Services Automobile Association in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/17/2014. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 13, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by (Amelia W Koch, Steven F. Griffith) $ 200, receipt number 34643027810. (TLC) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 21 MOTION for Steven F. Griffith, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Maron, David) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 11, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION for Amelia W. Koch to Appear Pro Hac Vice by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Maron, David) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Joshua Grabel be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Defendants GEICO General Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/4/2014. (JEJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 30, 2014 Filing 19 MOTION for Joshua Grabel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 30, 2014 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Joshua Grabel receipt number 0538-2694364 $ 100 (Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 29, 2014 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint,,, by Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Best, Robert) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Shelter General Insurance Company answer due 6/26/2014; Shelter Mutual Insurance Company answer due 6/26/2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/29/14. (WS) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/28/14. (WS) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 28, 2014 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint,,, by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, May 22, 2014 E-mail from Plaintiffs' Counsel to E. Barney Robinson III)(Robinson, Emerson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 23, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company (Gibson, Walker) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 23, 2014 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi (Gibson, Walker) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company answer due 6/26/2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/23/14. (WS) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi answer due 6/26/2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/23/14. (WS) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 22, 2014 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #3 Amended Complaint by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (Brabec, William) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. New deadline will be set out in docket entry to follow. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/22/14. (WS) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 21, 2014 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company (Raulston, Keith) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting unopposed #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint. GEICO Defendants have until 6/26/14 to respond to First Amended Complaint. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/21/14 (YWJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. USAA Casualty Insurance Company answer due 6/26/2014; United Services Automobile Association answer due 6/26/2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/20/14. (YWJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company answer due 6/26/2014; Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company answer due 6/26/2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/20/14. (YWJ) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 19, 2014 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint,,, and for Entry of an Order Confirming Stipulated Sixty (60) Day Extension of Time by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - email confirming agreement, #2 Exhibit B - email re agreement)(Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 16, 2014 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association (Maron, David) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 16, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson H. Ables, III on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company (Ables, Jackson) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois answer due 6/26/2014. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/14/14. (WS) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 13, 2014 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint,,, by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 6, 2014 Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to Defendants in re #3 Amended Complaint. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
May 6, 2014 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Canton Collision, LLC, Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., East McComb Body Shop, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Barry Lewis, Alexander Body Shop, LLC as to All Defendants. (Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
March 11, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellie F. Turnage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turnage, Ellie) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
March 11, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Halbert E. Dockins, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dockins, Halbert) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
March 4, 2014 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Barry Lewis, Crystal Car Care, Inc., Alexander Body Shop, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Fry, Allison) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
January 8, 2014 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, United Services Automobile Association. (ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]
January 7, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Shelter General Insurance Company, Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, and United Services Automobile Association ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643025398), filed by Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc., Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc., Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC, Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop, Inc., Patriot Auto Body, LLC, Porter's Body Shop, Inc., Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc., Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc., Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc., Protouch Collision, LLC, Walkers Collision Center, Inc., Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc., Bolden Body Shop, LLC, Mark Cook, Clinton Body Shop, Inc., Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc., Crystal Car Care, Inc., Barry Lewis, and Alexander Body Shop, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Company Market Share Report - 2012, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Farm's Dashboard/Scorecard, #3 Exhibit 3 - List of Procedures & Processes short paid/not paid, #4 Exhibit 4 - 1963 Consent Decree, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND) [Transferred from mssd on 8/12/2014.] [Transferred from flmd on 1/6/2017.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capitol Body Shop, Inc. et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Emerson Barney Robinson, III
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct General Insurance Company of Mississippi
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: Walker Reece Gibson
Represented By: Charles G. Copeland
Represented By: James R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: William C. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson - PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Joseph T. Kissane
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan
Represented By: William C. Brabec
Represented By: Benjamin B. Morgan
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson - PHV
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Cashdan
Represented By: Christine A. Hopkinson
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: Kymberly Kochis
Represented By: Joseph T. Kissane
Represented By: Francis X. Nolan
Represented By: William C. Brabec
Represented By: Benjamin B. Morgan
Represented By: Michael R. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Masters
Represented By: Robert Bradley Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais - PHV
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Neville H. Boschert
Represented By: Keith R. Raulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Amelia W. Koch
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Masters
Represented By: Robert Bradley Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: Jackson H. Ables, III
Represented By: Mark J. Botti - PHV
Represented By: Peter T. Snow - PHV
Represented By: Michael N. Beekhuizen - PHV
Represented By: Michael H. Carpenter - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo - PHV
Represented By: Michael E. Mumford - PHV
Represented By: Clifford (Ford) K. Bailey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Represented By: Jamie L. Halavais - PHV
Represented By: Dan W. Goldfine
Represented By: Neville H. Boschert
Represented By: Keith R. Raulston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: William C. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: Walker Reece Gibson
Represented By: Charles G. Copeland
Represented By: James R. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: Jackson H. Ables, III
Represented By: Mark J. Botti - PHV
Represented By: Peter T. Snow - PHV
Represented By: Michael N. Beekhuizen - PHV
Represented By: Michael H. Carpenter - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Jayne Golden
Represented By: Tiffany L. Powers
Represented By: Emerson Barney Robinson, III
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Elizabeth Helmer - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Body Shop, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Car Care, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Brothers Collision Center, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Body Shop, LLC
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B & W Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patriot Auto Body, LLC
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Body Shop of Ridgeland, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Rogers Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automotive Alignment & Body Service, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ridgeland Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Brothers Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bolden Body Shop, LLC
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hypercolor Automotive Reconditioning, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Fowler's Bodyworks, LLC
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protouch Collision, LLC
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Lewis
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canton Collision, LLC
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walkers Collision Center, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeshore Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porter's Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Carr Buick Pontiac Cadillac GMC, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Body Shop of Byram, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Cook
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Body Shop of Richland, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East McComb Body Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Halbert Edwin Dockins, Jr.
Represented By: John Arthur Eaves, Jr.
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Represented By: Ellie F. Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?