Osborne Associates, Inc. v. Cangemi et al

Plaintiff: Osborne Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Sheryl Cangemi, Julie Calianno and Silver Salons & Spas LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv01135
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: Monte C. Richardson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, in part, and denying, in part, 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, construed as a Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff shall post a bond. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 11/14/2017. (JW)
October 17, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED: This matter is set for a hearing on 3 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction with Incorporated Memorandum of Law on Thursday, November 2, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details and briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/17/2017. (MMG)
October 12, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER taking under advisement 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. See Order for details.Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/12/2017. (MMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborne Associates, Inc. v. Cangemi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osborne Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Julian Antony Jackson-Fannin
Represented By: Sarah O'Laughlin Kulik
Represented By: Lawrence H. Pockers
Represented By: Kevin Eugene Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Cangemi
Represented By: Blake J. Fredrickson
Represented By: Stanford R. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Calianno
Represented By: Blake J. Fredrickson
Represented By: Stanford R. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Salons & Spas LLC
Represented By: Blake J. Fredrickson
Represented By: Stanford R. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?