Showa Glove, Co. v. Web.com Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Showa Glove, Co.
Defendant: New Ventures Services, Corp., Network Solutions, LLC and Web.com Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00383
Filed: March 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: Duval
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, dismissing this case without prejudice. The Clerk should close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/30/2018. (SEJ)
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Showa Glove, Co. (Turner, Christa)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including September 13, 2018 to respond to the Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial #1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 8/16/2018. (TSP)
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the #1 Complaint, by Showa Glove, Co.. (Turner, Christa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 8/15/2018 to correct docket entry relationships and edit text. (TMC)
June 18, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 06/15/2018 by Showa Glove, Co. as to Web.com Group, Inc.. (Turner, Christa)
June 18, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 06/15/2018 by Showa Glove, Co. as to New Ventures Services, Corp.. (Turner, Christa)
June 18, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER of service returned executed on 06/15/2018 by Showa Glove, Co. as to Network Solutions, LLC. (Turner, Christa)
March 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
March 20, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Web.com Group, Inc. (TMC)
March 20, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Network Solutions, LLC. (TMC)
March 20, 2018 Filing 2 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (TMC)
March 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Network Solutions, LLC, New Ventures Services, Corp., Web.com Group, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX027103) filed by Showa Glove, Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(TMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Showa Glove, Co. v. Web.com Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Ventures Services, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Web.com Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Showa Glove, Co.
Represented By: Christa C. Turner
Represented By: Katrina M. Quicker
Represented By: Jason P. Grier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?