Eaton v. Winn - Dixie Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: Larry Donnell Eaton, Sr.
Defendant: Winn - Dixie Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00921
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
1 Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2018 8 MOTION to Add Evidence to the #7 Motion of Objection to a Dismissal of Defendant #6 Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Larry Donnell Eaton, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docs #1 to #12)(BD)
September 20, 2018 7 RESPONSE entitled "Motion to Object to a Dismissal of Defendant #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memo of Law filed by Larry Donnell Eaton, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD)
September 14, 2018 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memo of Law by All Defendants. (Snipes, April)
September 7, 2018 5 RETURN of service executed on 8/27/2018 by Larry Donnell Eaton, Sr as to Winn - Dixie Stores, Inc.. (BD)
August 21, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER advising pro se plaintiff of some procedural rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/21/2018. (ADM)
August 9, 2018 3 SUMMONS issued as to Winn - Dixie Stores, Inc.. (BD)
August 2, 2018 2 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
July 27, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Winn - Dixie Stores, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX028547) filed by Larry Donnell Eaton, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(BD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton v. Winn - Dixie Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Donnell Eaton, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winn - Dixie Stores, Inc.
Represented By: April Renee Snipes
Represented By: Adrian Rust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?