Sonnenmair v. Opslens Media Group LLC
Plaintiff: Janet Marie Sonnenmair
Defendant: Opslens Media Group LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01240
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be filed no later than 12/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/5/2018. (MMP)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Opslens Media Group LLC. (Lake, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant shall have up to and including 12/5/2018 to respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/20/2018. (MMP)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Opslens Media Group LLC. (Lake, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 10/31/2018 by Janet Marie Sonnenmair as to Opslens Media Group LLC. (Rothman, Joel)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (AEJ)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Opslens Media Group LLC. (AEJ)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Opslens Media Group LLC with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number JAX029298 filed by Janet Marie Sonnenmair. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonnenmair v. Opslens Media Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Marie Sonnenmair
Represented By: Alexander Charles Cohen
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opslens Media Group LLC
Represented By: James B. Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?