United States for the Use and Benefit of J.B. Coxwell Contracting, Inc. v. Central Southern Construction Corporation et al

Plaintiff: United States for the Use and Benefit of J.B. Coxwell Contracting, Inc.
Defendant: Central Southern Construction Corporation and U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01270
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re #7 Notice of voluntary dismissal; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 11/8/2018. (MGG)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by United States for the Use and Benefit of J.B. Coxwell Contracting, Inc. (Ray, Thomas)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Central Southern Construction Corporation, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (TSW)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by United States for the Use and Benefit of J.B. Coxwell Contracting, Inc.. (Ray, Thomas)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by United States for the Use and Benefit of J.B. Coxwell Contracting, Inc.. (Ray, Thomas)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United States for the Use and Benefit of J.B. Coxwell Contracting, Inc.. (Ray, Thomas)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:18-cv-1270-J-20JBT. (NAS)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Breach of Contract and Recovery Under Miller Act Payment Bond against Central Southern Construction Corporation, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14768128) filed by United States for the Use and Benefit of J.B. Coxwell Contracting, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Central Southern Construction Corp., #2 Proposed Summons U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, #3 Exhibit A - Payment Bond, #4 Exhibit B - Purchase Order, #5 Exhibit Composite C - Signed Truck Tickets and Invoices, #6 Exhibit D - Written Demand for Payment, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ray, Thomas) Modified on 10/30/2018 to add receipt number (NAS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States for the Use and Benefit of J.B. Coxwell Contracting, Inc. v. Central Southern Construction Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Southern Construction Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States for the Use and Benefit of J.B. Coxwell Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Robert Ray
Represented By: Bethany Ray Reichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?