Futch v. MTC Medical LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edith Futch
Defendant: Martha Lois Ford, Michelle Renee Fisher, Kelly Hurst, Management & Training Corp, D.O. Patrick Jennings Harris, MTC Medical LLC, Jillian Ronshawn Bartow, Jillian Bartow, Patrick Harris, Martha Ford and Michelle Fisher
Case Number: 3:2018cv01323
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 26 RETURN of service executed on 12/11/2018 by Edith Futch as to Martha Ford. (Currie, Christina)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond. Defendants Martha Ford, Jillian Bartow, Kelly Hurst, MTC Medical LLC, and Management & Training Corp. shall have until 01/11/2019 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/27/2018. (MM)
December 26, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jillian Bartow.(Brannon, Paul)
December 21, 2018 Filing 23 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jillian Bartow, Martha Ford, Kelly Hurst, MTC Medical LLC, Management & Training Corp. (Brannon, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 21, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul David Brannon on behalf of Jillian Bartow, Martha Ford (Brannon, Paul)
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Memo of Law filed by Edith Futch. (Lauer, Greg)
December 17, 2018 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on 11/30/18 by Edith Futch as to Patrick Harris. (Currie, Christina)
December 17, 2018 Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on 12/5/2018 by Edith Futch as to Kelly Hurst. (Currie, Christina)
December 17, 2018 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 12/5/18 by Edith Futch as to Jillian Bartow. (Currie, Christina)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond. Defendants, Kelly Hurst, MTC Medical LLC, and Management & Training Corp., shall have until 12/28/2018 to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/12/2018. (ADM)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kelly Hurst, MTC Medical LLC, Management & Training Corp. (Brannon, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul David Brannon on behalf of Kelly Hurst, MTC Medical LLC, Management & Training Corp (Brannon, Paul)
December 5, 2018 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 11/20/2018 as to Management & Training Corp by Edith Futch . (Currie, Christina) Modified on 12/5/2018 to edit text (PAM).
December 5, 2018 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 11/20/2018 by Edith Futch as to MTC Medical LLC. (Currie, Christina)
December 5, 2018 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 11/20/18 as to MTC Medical LLC by Edith Futch (Attachments: #1 Affidavit mtc ros, #2 Affidavit mangmt and training ros)(Currie, Christina) Modified on 12/5/2018 to edit text (PAM).
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Marie Currie on behalf of Edith Futch (Currie, Christina)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Supporting Memo of Law by Patrick Harris. (Ramsey, Richard)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Ramsey on behalf of Patrick Harris (Ramsey, Richard)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Jillian Bartow. (PAM)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Edith Futch. (Lauer, Greg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Michelle Fisher, Martha Ford, Patrick Harris, Kelly Hurst, MTC Medical LLC, Management & Training Corp. (PAM)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Edith Futch. (Lauer, Greg)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of compliance re #1 Complaint redacted Exhibits by Edith Futch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lauer, Greg)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:18-cv-1323-J-39MCR. (SJB)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14803875) filed by Edith Futch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lauer, Greg) Modified on 11/9/2018 (PAM). Counsel directed to refile Ex 1-2 and 1-4 due to personal identifiers e.g. DOB. Modified on 11/13/2018 - exhibits 1-2 and 1-4 PDFs removed per chambers, see redacted versions filed as Doc. 3. (AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Futch v. MTC Medical LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Lois Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Renee Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Hurst
Represented By: Paul David Brannon
Represented By: Douglas P. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management & Training Corp
Represented By: Paul David Brannon
Represented By: Douglas P. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.O. Patrick Jennings Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Medical LLC
Represented By: Paul David Brannon
Represented By: Douglas P. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jillian Ronshawn Bartow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jillian Bartow
Represented By: Paul David Brannon
Represented By: Douglas P. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Harris
Represented By: Richard E. Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Ford
Represented By: Paul David Brannon
Represented By: Douglas P. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Fisher
Represented By: Paul David Brannon
Represented By: Douglas P. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Futch
Represented By: Greg M. Lauer
Represented By: Christina Marie Currie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?