Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. et al v. Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.
Plaintiff: Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc and DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Defendant: Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01342
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.. (McNamara, Megan)
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. by Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc..(McNamara, Megan)
January 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney JAMES E. DOROSHOW, appearing on behalf of Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX029815.) Related document: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Jeff E. Schwartz, James E. Doroshow, Austen C. Endersby, and Ashe P. Puri to appear pro hac vice. (AEJ)
January 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney ASHE P. PURI, appearing on behalf of Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX029814.) Related document: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Jeff E. Schwartz, James E. Doroshow, Austen C. Endersby, and Ashe P. Puri to appear pro hac vice. (AEJ)
December 27, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jeff E. Schwartz, appearing on behalf of Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX029796.) Related document: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Jeff E. Schwartz, James E. Doroshow, Austen C. Endersby, and Ashe P. Puri to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
December 27, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Austen C. Endersby, appearing on behalf of Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX029795.) Related document: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Jeff E. Schwartz, James E. Doroshow, Austen C. Endersby, and Ashe P. Puri to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 the defendant's unopposed motion asking the Court to allow Jeff Schwartz, James Doroshow, Austen Endersby, and Ashe Puri to specially appear to represent it in this case and directing them to expeditiously pay the required fee and register with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system by completing the E-Filer Registration Form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 12/21/2018. (ASL)
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Jeff E. Schwartz, James E. Doroshow, Austen C. Endersby, and Ashe P. Puri to appear pro hac vice by Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.. (McNamara, Megan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 the motion for Joseph DeMaria and Susanne Calabrese to withdraw as the defendant's counsel; permitting Mr. DeMaria and Ms. Calabrese to withdraw from representing the defendant in this action; and directing the clerk to amend the docket accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 12/17/2018. (ABK)
December 7, 2018 Filing 17 Amended MOTION for Joseph DeMaria and Susanne Calabrese to withdraw as attorney by Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.. (DeMaria, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
December 6, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Joseph DeMaria and Susanne Calabrese to withdraw as attorney by Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.. (DeMaria, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 the defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. The defendant must respond to the complaint by January 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 12/3/2018. (ABK)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Anne McNamara on behalf of Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc. (McNamara, Megan)
November 29, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.. (DeMaria, Joseph)
November 29, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Susanne Mary Calabrese on behalf of Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc. (Calabrese, Susanne)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. DeMaria on behalf of Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc. (DeMaria, Joseph)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 11/16/2018 by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc. as to Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.. (Smith, Robert)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 the plaintiffs' motion asking the Court to allow Matthew Becker, Edward Mathias, and Rebecca Clegg to specially appear to represent them in this case. The Court grants the motion with respect to Messrs. Becker and Mathias and directs them to expeditiously register with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system by completing the E-Filer Registration Form. The motion indicates Ms. Clegg is a member in good standing and admitted to practice in state court, but does not indicate if she is in good standing of the bar of any United States District Court as required by Local Rule 2.02(a). The Court denies the motion with respect to Ms. Clegg without prejudice to filing a motion that includes the required qualifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 11/15/2018. (ASL)
November 13, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Rebecca L. Clegg, appearing on behalf of DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX029518.) Related document: #4 MOTION for Matthew J. Becker, Edward M. Mathias and Rebecca L. Clegg to appear pro hac vice. (TSW)
November 13, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Edward M. Mathias, appearing on behalf of DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX029517.) Related document: #4 MOTION for Matthew J. Becker, Edward M. Mathias and Rebecca L. Clegg to appear pro hac vice. (TSW)
November 13, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Matthew J. Becker, appearing on behalf of DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX029516.) Related document: #4 MOTION for Matthew J. Becker, Edward M. Mathias and Rebecca L. Clegg to appear pro hac vice. (TSW)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc. (TSW)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 Patent Report mailed to Alexandria, VA. (TSW)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:18-cv-1342-J-20PDB. Motion REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Matthew J. Becker, Edward M. Mathias and Rebecca L. Clegg to appear pro hac vice. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (SMS)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Matthew J. Becker, Edward M. Mathias and Rebecca L. Clegg to appear pro hac vice by DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc, Depuy Synthes Products, Inc.. (Smith, Robert)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc, Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. Trademark Report (Smith, Robert)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc, Depuy Synthes Products, Inc.. (Smith, Robert)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14811829) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J part 1, #11 Exhibit J part 2, #12 Exhibit J part 3, #13 Exhibit J part 4, #14 Exhibit J part 5, #15 Exhibit J part 6, #16 Exhibit J part 7, #17 Exhibit J part 8, #18 Exhibit J part 9, #19 Exhibit J part 10, #20 Exhibit J part 11, #21 Exhibit J part 12, #22 Exhibit J part 13, #23 Exhibit J part 14, #24 Exhibit J part 15, #25 Civil Cover Sheet, #26 Proposed Summons)(Smith, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. et al v. Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Depuy Synthes Products, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Clegg
Represented By: Edward M. Mathias
Represented By: Matthew J. Becker
Represented By: Robert Troy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Clegg
Represented By: Edward M. Mathias
Represented By: Matthew J. Becker
Represented By: Robert Troy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterinary Orthopedic Implants, Inc.
Represented By: Ashe P. Puri
Represented By: Joseph A. DeMaria
Represented By: Austen C. Endersby
Represented By: Megan Anne McNamara
Represented By: Susanne Mary Calabrese
Represented By: Jeff E. Schwartz
Represented By: James E. Doroshow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?