Hancock v. Centurion of Florida, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jannah Hancock
Defendant: Centurion of Florida, LLC, MHM Services, Inc. and MHM Health Professionals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01430
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #7 Second Amended Complaint by MHM Health Professionals, Inc.(Molloy, Catherine) Modified on 1/18/2019 to edit docket entry relationship (JSG).
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Molloy, Catherine)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by MHM Health Professionals, Inc.. (Molloy, Catherine)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER sua sponte denying as moot #5 Consented Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint in light of #7 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and #10 Defendant's Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/28/2018. (MM)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #7 Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint by MHM Health Professionals, Inc..(Molloy, Catherine)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice by Jannah Hancock. (Tarquin, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against MHM Health Professionals, Inc. with jury demand filed by Jannah Hancock(Tarquin, James). Modified on 12/17/2018 to edit text (JSG).
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #5 Consented Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall confer with Plaintiff and supplement their Motion with dates certain as to the requested extension by 12/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/12/2018. (MMP)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #2 Amended Complaint by MHM Health Professionals, Inc., MHM Services, Inc. (Molloy, Catherine). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified on 12/11/2018 to edit text and create docket entry relationship (JSG).
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing by Centurion of Florida, LLC, MHM Health Professionals, Inc., MHM Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Abstract Filing)(Page, Cayla). Modified on 12/4/2018 to edit text (JSG).
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cayla McCrea Page on behalf of Centurion of Florida, LLC, MHM Health Professionals, Inc., MHM Services, Inc. (JSG)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Centurion of Florida, LLC, MHM Health Professionals, Inc., MHM Services, Inc. with jury demand filed by Jannah Hancock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(JSG)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial Circuit, Suwannee County, Florida, case number 18-CA-137 filed in State Court on 7/9/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number JAX029664 filed by Centurion of Florida, LLC, MHM Services, Inc., MHM Health Professionals, Inc. (no state court docket sheet provided; notified counsel to file) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet).(JSG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock v. Centurion of Florida, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Florida, LLC
Represented By: Catherine H. Molloy
Represented By: Cayla McCrea Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Services, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine H. Molloy
Represented By: Cayla McCrea Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Health Professionals, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine H. Molloy
Represented By: Cayla McCrea Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jannah Hancock
Represented By: James Patrick Tarquin
Represented By: Mark D. Dillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?