Jax Airport Hotel, LLC et al v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jax Airport Hotel, LLC and Turn-Key Hospitality Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01492
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Jax Airport Hotel, LLC, Turn-Key Hospitality Solutions, Inc.. (Albee, Helen)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Heim Albee on behalf of Jax Airport Hotel, LLC, Turn-Key Hospitality Solutions, Inc. (Albee, Helen)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Complaint by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Montminy, Briana)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. of Filing (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 State Court Other Documents)(Thomas, Milo) Modified on 12/21/2018 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct and complete case number on all pleadings(TSW).
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. filed by Jax Airport Hotel, LLC, Turn-Key Hospitality Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KKH)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:18-cv-1492-J-20JBT. (SJB)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LG Electronics, Inc. for LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc... (Thomas, Milo)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Circuit Court of the Fourth Judicial Circuit In and For Duval County, Florida, case number 2018-CA-7855 filed in State Court on 11/16/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14938598 filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 State Court Other Documents)(Thomas, Milo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jax Airport Hotel, LLC et al v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jax Airport Hotel, LLC
Represented By: Helen Heim Albee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turn-Key Hospitality Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Helen Heim Albee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Milo Scott Thomas
Represented By: Briana M. Montminy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?