Roor International BV et al v. Kinder Combs, LLC d/b/a Smoke City et al

Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Kinder Combs, LLC d/b/a Smoke City, James Combs and Kinder Combs, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00040
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Brian J Davis
1 Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
2 Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 2/19/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to James Combs. (Sasson, Jamie)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER taking under advisement #9 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default as to Kinder Combs, LLC. Plaintiffs' filing due by 3/21/19. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 2/28/2019. (TAM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Kinder Combs, LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 2/25/2019 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct and complete case number and case caption on all pleadings(TSW).
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 1/15/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Kinder Combs, LLC. (Sasson, Jamie)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (TSW)
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. New case number: 3:19-cv-40-J-20JBT. Judge Brian J. Davis no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING this case to the Honorable Harvey E. Schlesinger with his consent. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 1/17/2019. (AMP)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to James Combs and Kinder Combs, LLC. (AEJ)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-40-J-39JBT. (SJB)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14988096) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Kinder Combs, LLC d/b/a Smoke City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Combs, LLC d/b/a Smoke City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Combs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?