Roor International BV et al v. Planet Smoke Shop, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Hristijan Koteski, Risto Koteski and Planet Smoke Shop, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00049
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
2 Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. New case number: 3:19-cv-49-J-20JBT. Judge Timothy J. Corrigan no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Harvey E. Schlesinger for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(b). Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 1/22/2019. (MD)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Risto Koteski. (TMC)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Hristijan Koteski. (TMC)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Planet Smoke Shop, Inc.. (TMC)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (TMC)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-49-J-32JBT. (SJB)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14994708) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Planet Smoke Shop, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hristijan Koteski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risto Koteski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Smoke Shop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?