Roor International BV et al v. Smoker's Palace, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Sohel Dahi, Jalal Dabbas and Smoker's Palace, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00061
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Monte C Richardson
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sohel Dahi (KKH)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Smoker's Palace, Inc. (KKH)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Sohel Dahi, Smoker's Palace, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 1/16/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Sohel Dahi. (Sasson, Jamie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 1/17/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Smoker's Palace, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (KKH)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Jalal Dabbas, Sohel Dahi, Smoker's Palace, Inc.. (KKH)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-61-J-20MCR. (SJB)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15003844) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Smoker's Palace, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sohel Dahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jalal Dabbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smoker's Palace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?