Roor International BV et al v. Step-In Food Mart, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Step-In Food Mart, Inc. and Dipak Patel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00063
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Brian J Davis
1 Judge: Monte C Richardson
2 Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. New case number: 3:19-cv-63-J-20MCR. Judge Brian J. Davis no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING this case to the Honorable Harvey E. Schlesinger with his consent. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 1/17/2019. (AMP)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Step-In Food Mart, Inc. (PAM)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued for Step-in Food Mart, Inc R/A Dipak Patel filed by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. (Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 1/11/2019 to edit text (PAM).
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Dipak Patel. (PAM)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued for Dipak Patel filed by Roor International BV and Stream, Inc. (Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 1/11/2019 to edit text (PAM).
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (PAM)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-63-J-39MCR. (SJB)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15004519) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Step-In Food Mart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Step-In Food Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dipak Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?