Hameen v. Lopez et al
Plaintiff: Jamaal Abu-Talib Hameen
Defendant: David Mesrobian, Hon. Joel B. Toomey, Hon. Brian J. Davis, Elizabeth Warren, Maria Chapa Lopez, Derek Pratico, Frank Talbot, Derek A. Pratico, Brian J. Davis, Marcia Morales Howard, David B Mesrobian, Detective Edwards and Joel B. Toomey
Case Number: 3:2019cv00105
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #4 motion to amend to add additional defendant; granting #7 motion to dismiss; granting #10 motion for joinder in motion to dismiss; dismissing this case with prejudice as to all defendants; directing the clerk to close the file. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 2/20/2019.(SRW)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition, titled 'Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint with Prejudice and Supporting Memorandum of Law' re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Jamaal Abu-Talib Hameen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(JSG)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Joinder of Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Marcia Morales Howard. (Harwin, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Complaint by Marcia Morales Howard. (Harwin, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Marcia Morales Howard. Related case(s): Yes (Harwin, Michael)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Brian J. Davis, Maria Chapa Lopez, David B Mesrobian, Derek A. Pratico, Frank Talbot, Joel B. Toomey, Elizabeth Warren. (Harwell, Lacy)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Complaint by Brian J. Davis, Maria Chapa Lopez, David B Mesrobian, Derek A. Pratico, Frank Talbot, Joel B. Toomey, Elizabeth Warren. (Harwell, Lacy)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brian J. Davis, Maria Chapa Lopez, David B Mesrobian, Derek A. Pratico, Frank Talbot, Joel B. Toomey, Elizabeth Warren. Related case(s): Yes (Harwell, Lacy)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 Complaint, titled 'Motion to Add Additional Defendant', by Jamaal Abu-Talib Hameen. (TMC)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Brian J. Davis, Detective Edwards, Marcia Morales Howard, Maria Chapa Lopez, David B Mesrobian, Derek A. Pratico, Frank Talbot, Joel B. Toomey, Elizabeth Warren filed by Jamaal Abu-Talib Hameen. (Filed in State Court on 09/17/2018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(TMC)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-105-J-32PDB. (SJB)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Fourth Judicial Circuit in and for Duval County, Florida, case number 16-2018-CA-6314 filed in State Court on 09/17/18. filed by David Mesrobian, Brian J. Davis, Elizabeth Warren, Maria Chapa Lopez, Derek Pratico, Joel B. Toomey, Frank Talbot. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Pending Motions, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet (State), #6 Civil Cover Sheet (Federal))(Harwell, Lacy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hameen v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mesrobian
Represented By: Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Joel B. Toomey
Represented By: Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Brian J. Davis
Represented By: Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Warren
Represented By: Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Chapa Lopez
Represented By: Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Pratico
Represented By: Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Talbot
Represented By: Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek A. Pratico
Represented By: Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian J. Davis
Represented By: Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Morales Howard
Represented By: Michael J. Harwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B Mesrobian
Represented By: Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel B. Toomey
Represented By: Lacy R. Harwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamaal Abu-Talib Hameen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?