Ocean Palm Golf Club Partnership v. The City of Flagler Beach
Plaintiff: Ocean Palm Golf Club Partnership
Defendant: The City of Flagler Beach
Case Number: 3:2019cv00124
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James R Klindt
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including 4/8/2019 to respond to the Complaint (Doc. No. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/18/2019. (MDC)
March 16, 2019 Filing 7 Second Unopposed MOTION to extend time to respond to Complaint by The City of Flagler Beach. (Scott, Dale) Modified text on 3/18/2019 (KKH).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including 3/18/2019 to respond to the Complaint (Doc. No. 1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 2/20/2019. (MDC)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to respond to complaint (dk. 1) to March 18, 2019 by The City of Flagler Beach. (Scott, Dale)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to The City of Flagler Beach. (TSW)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-124-J-20JRK. (SJB)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The City of Flagler Beach with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15064253) filed by Ocean Palm Golf Club Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Smolker, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocean Palm Golf Club Partnership v. The City of Flagler Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Flagler Beach
Represented By: Dale Alan Scott
Represented By: Michael J. Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocean Palm Golf Club Partnership
Represented By: David Smolker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?