State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company a/s/o Robert S. Boligan v. Burley
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company a/s/o Robert S. Boligan
Defendant: Kristina Elizabeth Burley
Undetermined: Michael I. Coulson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00178
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Brian J Davis
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER directing the clerk to remove from the docket 9 the initial disclosure notice filed on March 29. As with other discovery related documents, initial disclosure notices should not be filed unless the Court needs them to decide a motion. Counsel is directed to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d)(1) ("[D]isclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) or (2)...must not be filed until they are used in the proceeding or the court orders filing[.]") and Local Rule 3.03(d) ("[M]atters disclosed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26...shall not be filed with the Court as a matter of course but may later be filed in whole or in part if necessary[.]"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/3/2019. (ABK)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kristina Elizabeth Burley. (Dunlap-Smart, Samantha)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Amended Notice of Appearance and E-Mail Designations Appearance by Dennis Patrick Dore on behalf of Kristina Elizabeth Burley (Dore, Dennis)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE Mandatory Initial Disclosure by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company a/s/o Robert S. Boligan (Reiss, Jennifer) Modified on 4/3/2019 - PDF removed per Court Order, see Doc. 12. (AEJ)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company a/s/o Robert S. Boligan. (Reiss, Jennifer) Modified text on 3/29/2019. (AEJ)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on Friday, May 31, 2019 at 2:00 pm before Michael I. Coulson. (Coulson, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (AEJ)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Conduct mediation hearing by 6/3/2019; Discovery due by 1/6/2020; Dispositive motions due by 2/7/2020; Pretrial statement due by 6/17/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 7/6/2020 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Docket Sheets)(AMP)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Dunlap-Smart, Samantha)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-178-J-39PDB. (SJB)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Court, case number 2019-CA-000074 filed in State Court on 01-03-2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15113001 filed by Kristina Elizabeth Burley. (Dunlap-Smart, Samantha) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2019: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court ANSWER, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (AEJ). Modified on 2/11/2019 to separate and re-upload PDFs to properly adhere to the filing guidelines. (AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company a/s/o Robert S. Boligan v. Burley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Elizabeth Burley
Represented By: Samantha Dunlap-Smart
Represented By: Dennis Patrick Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company a/s/o Robert S. Boligan
Represented By: Jennifer Lynne Reiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Michael I. Coulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?