Wiggins v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Arthur A. Wiggins, III
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00188
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 04/01/2019 as to US Attorney General, by Arthur A. Wiggins, III (Berger, Erik) Modified on 4/11/2019 to edit text as to date of service and as to whom. (TMC)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 03/28/2019 as to Commissioner of Social Security, by Arthur A. Wiggins, III (Berger, Erik) Modified on 4/11/2019 to edit text as to date of service and as to whom. (TMC)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of Service executed on 03/25/2019 as to US Attorney, by Arthur A. Wiggins, III. (Berger, Erik) Modified on 4/11/2019 to edit text as to date of service and as to whom. (TMC)
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Regarding Representation re #10 Order by Arthur A. Wiggins, III (Berger, Erik). Modified on 4/8/2019 to edit text and docket entry relationship (JSG).
March 21, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JSG)
March 21, 2019 FEES paid by Arthur A. Wiggins, III (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number JAX030379) (AFC)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/5/2019. (MM)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #9 motion to appear pro hac vice. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/1/2019. (MM)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Meredith E. Marcus to appear pro hac vice by Arthur A. Wiggins, III. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Marcus, Meredith) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
February 19, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Meredith E. Marcus, appearing on behalf of Arthur A. Wiggins, III (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX030192.). (AFC)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/15/2019. (MD)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/14/2019. (MM)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik William Berger on behalf of Arthur A. Wiggins, III (Berger, Erik)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1). Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/13/2019. (JSG)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-188-J-32MCR. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (SJB)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Meredith E. Marcus to appear pro hac vice by Arthur A. Wiggins, III. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Marcus, Meredith)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Arthur A. Wiggins, III. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 (Commissioner), #2 USM-285 (Attorney General), #3 USM-285 (U.S. Attorney))(Marcus, Meredith)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Arthur A. Wiggins, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Marcus, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiggins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur A. Wiggins, III
Represented By: Meredith E. Marcus
Represented By: Erik William Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?