Roor International BV et al v. Blaze FL Store 2, LLC
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Blaze FL Store 2, LLC, ELIAS HABBABEH and Blazenflame LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00197
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Monte C Richardson
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-197-J-20MCR. Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 4/4/2019. (MGG)
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. New case number: 3:19-cv-197-J-20JBT. Judge Brian J. Davis no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TRANSFERRING this case to the Honorable Harvey E. Schlesinger with his consent. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 4/3/2019. (AMP)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 3/15/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. (Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 3/15/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings.
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to ELIAS HABBABEH. (PAM)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Blazenflame LLC. (PAM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summonses by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Blazenflame LLC, #2 Proposed Summons Elias Habbabeh)(Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 2/25/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blazenflame LLC, ELIAS HABBABEH filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 2/25/2019 (PAM). Counsel notified to use entire case number on future pleadings
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 2/19/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Blaze FL Store 2, LLC. (Sasson, Jamie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 2/19/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Blaze FL Store 2, LLC. (Sasson, Jamie)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (PAM)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Blaze FL Store 2, LLC. (PAM)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-197-J-39JBT. (SJB)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15134810) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Blaze FL Store 2, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Chezare Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Chezare Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaze FL Store 2, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIAS HABBABEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blazenflame LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?