Bubba Foods, LLC et al v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bubba Foods, LLC and Flanders Provisions Company, LLC
Defendant: First Specialty Insurance Corporation and Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00204
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Monte C Richardson
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Bubba Foods, LLC, Flanders Provisions Company, LLC. (Underkofler, Andrew)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion to appear pro hac vice. If Attorney Gable, Jr. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/2/2019. (MM)
April 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Richard D. Gable, Jr., appearing on behalf of Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX030514.) Related document: #18 Unopposed MOTION for Richard D. Gable, Jr. to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Richard D. Gable, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lewis, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified on 4/1/2019 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct and complete case number on all pleadings(TSW).
March 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to file Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Smith, Cyril) Modified on 4/1/2019 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct and complete case number on all pleadings(TSW).
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Bubba Foods, LLC, Flanders Provisions Company, LLC identifying Other Affiliate SFRMH Liquidation, Inc., Other Affiliate W.H. Morris, Inc., Other Affiliate F.H. Morris, LLC for Bubba Foods, LLC; Other Affiliate Waycross Investment Company, LLC for Flanders Provisions Company, LLC.. (Tucker, John) Modified on 3/25/2019 previously contacted counsel in regards to using the complete and correct case number on all pleadings(TSW).
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST for oral argument re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bubba Foods, LLC, Flanders Provisions Company, LLC. (Tucker, John)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bubba Foods, LLC, Flanders Provisions Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tucker, John)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' response to Defendant First Specialty Insurance Corporation's Motion to Dismiss is due on or before 03/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/19/2019. (MM)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 DEMAND for trial by jury by Bubba Foods, LLC. (Tucker, John) Modified on 3/11/2019 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct and complete case number on all pleadings(TSW).
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Specialty Insurance Corporation's Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Underkofler, Andrew) Modified on 3/8/2019 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct can complete case number on all pleadings(TSW).
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-204-J-20MCR. (SJW)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark Simpson with Exhibits, #2 Affidavit of Cyril Smith with Exhibits)(Smith, Cyril)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of Recusal. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 2/22/2019. (RLS)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint by Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc..(Lewis, William)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of recusal. The Clerk shall randomly reassign this case to another District Judge. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 2/20/2019. (SRW)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Circuit Court Case Docket by First Specialty Insurance Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal (Smith, Cyril). Modified on 2/20/2019 to edit text (JSG).
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-204-J-32JBT. (SJB)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc., First Specialty Insurance Corporation filed by Bubba Foods, LLC, Flanders Provisions Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(JSG)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit In And For Duval County, case number 2019-CA-0256 filed in State Court on 01/10/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15140114 filed by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Of Notice Of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Cyril) Modified on 2/19/2019 to notify counsel's office to file state court docket sheet (JSG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bubba Foods, LLC et al v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Specialty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Cyril Elliot Smith
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Represented By: Fredrick H. L. McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: William Roderick Lewis
Represented By: Richard D. Gable, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bubba Foods, LLC
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel, Jr.
Represented By: John A. Tucker
Represented By: Andrew Evan Underkofler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flanders Provisions Company, LLC
Represented By: Leonard V. Feigel, Jr.
Represented By: John A. Tucker
Represented By: Andrew Evan Underkofler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?