Reid v. Hakim et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Denise Reid
Defendant: Dr. Fraid Hakim, Dr. Georgia Liebert and Dr. Robert Still
Case Number: 3:2019cv00255
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Plaintiff; no later than 5/10/2019, Plaintiff shall file a written show cause response stating why the Court should not recommend that this matter be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute; Plaintiff must also comply with the #4 Order by 5/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 4/10/2019. (BHC)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Sandra Denise Reid. (PAM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
March 11, 2019 Mail addressed to Sandra Denise Reid marked return to sender no such number unable to forward re: #3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 and resent out of abundance of caution #4 Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. (PAM) Deputy Clerk resent to plaintiff at 2840 Rainwater Road, Apt. 1110 Tifton, GA 3173 as reflected on envelope. Modified on 3/11/2019 to edit text (PAM).
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER taking under advisement the #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, construed as a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; on or before 4/5/2019, Plaintiff shall complete and file the enclosed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs; on or before 4/5/2019, Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint consistent with this Order; as an alternative to filing an Amended Complaint, Plaintiff may pay the $400 filing fee by 4/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs) (BHC)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Sandra Denise Reid. (AEJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fraid Hakim, Georgia Liebert, Robert Still filed by Sandra Denise Reid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Hakim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Fraid Hakim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Georgia Liebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Robert Still
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Denise Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?