Johnston v. USA

Plaintiff: James Johnston
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00266
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Brian J Davis
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to United States of America. (AEJ)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by James Johnston. (Owens, Donny)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by James Johnston. (Owens, Donny) Modified on 3/7/2019 - contacted counsel about standard form. (AEJ)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-266-J-39PDB. (SJB)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15193265) filed by James Johnston.(Owens, Donny) Modified text on 3/4/2019. (AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnston
Represented By: Donny A. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?