Dong v. Deutsche Bahn AG
Plaintiff: Wanxu Dong
Defendant: Deutsche Bahn AG
Case Number: 3:2019cv00275
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 , #6 , and #7 Motions for Ashly I. Boesche, Kristine A. Bergman, and Janet A. Marvel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ashly I. Boesche, Kristine A. Bergman, and Janet A. Marvel are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff with Crystal T. Broughan as local counsel. Ms. Boesche, Ms. Bergman, and Ms. Marvel shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/12/2019. (MDC)
March 11, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Janet A. Marvel, appearing on behalf of Wanxu Dong (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX030327.) Related document: #7 MOTION for Janet A. Marvel to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
March 11, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kristine A. Bergman, appearing on behalf of Wanxu Dong (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX030327.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Kristine A. Bergman to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
March 11, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Ashly I. Boesche, appearing on behalf of Wanxu Dong (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX030327.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Ashly I. Boesche to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Janet A. Marvel to appear pro hac vice by Wanxu Dong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Broughan, Crystal) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Kristine A. Bergman to appear pro hac vice by Wanxu Dong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Broughan, Crystal) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Ashly I. Boesche to appear pro hac vice by Wanxu Dong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Broughan, Crystal) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: Based upon the parties' filings, the Court is satisfied of the existence of subject matter jurisdiction over this action. (MMG)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Deutsche Bahn AG. (BD)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-275-J-34JRK. (SJB)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bahn AG (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15206336) filed by Wanxu Dong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Broughan, Crystal) Modified text on 3/6/2019 (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dong v. Deutsche Bahn AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanxu Dong
Represented By: Janet A. Marvel
Represented By: Ashly I. Boesche
Represented By: Kristine A. Bergman
Represented By: Crystal T. Broughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bahn AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?