Canadian Standards Association v. Golden Dragon Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Canadian Standards Association
Defendant: Golden Dragon Association, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00276
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Golden Dragon Association, Inc.. (Stein, Stefan)
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Golden Dragon Association, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Stein, Stefan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Golden Dragon Association, Inc..(Stein, Stefan)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Stefan V. Stein, Esq., and William V. Stein, Esq., of Gray Robinson, P.A., are hereby substituted as counsel for Adrienne C. Love, Esq., and the law firm of Pennington P.A. The Clerk is directed to terminate Ms. Love as counsel of record for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/8/2019. (TSP)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Golden Dragon Association, Inc.. (Love, Adrienne) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Love on behalf of Golden Dragon Association, Inc. (Love, Adrienne)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Canadian Standards Association of Filing Defendant's Acceptance of Service (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Acceptance of Service)(Holihan, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Canadian Standards Association. (Holihan, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Canadian Standards Association. Related case(s): No (Holihan, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Golden Dragon Association, Inc. (AEJ)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (AEJ)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-276-J-39JBT. (SJB)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Golden Dragon Association, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15206791) filed by Canadian Standards Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 CSA Trademark Registrations, #3 Exhibit 2 Index of Representative CSA Trademarks, #4 Exhibit 3 goldenlighting.com website, #5 Exhibit 4 Seizure Notices, #6 Exhibit 5 Photographs of CBP samples, #7 Exhibit 6 Photographs of hayneedle.com purchase, #8 Exhibit 7 Declarations of Administrative Forfeiture, #9 Exhibit 8 Photographs of 1stoplighting.com purchase, #10 Exhibit 9 Representative List of Infringing Fixtures, #11 Exhibit 10 Cease and Desist Letter, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons)(Holihan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canadian Standards Association v. Golden Dragon Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canadian Standards Association
Represented By: Michael Walls Holihan
Represented By: Kimberly Harchuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Dragon Association, Inc.
Represented By: William Stein
Represented By: Stefan Vaughn Stein
Represented By: Adrienne Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?