The Ravines Community Association, Inc. v. Ravines Holding Co., LLC

Plaintiff: The Ravines Community Association, Inc.
Defendant: Ravines Holding Co., LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00345
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 Amended REPLY to #6 Counterclaim by The Ravines Community Association, Inc.. Related document: #6 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim filed by Ravines Holding Co., LLC.(Hackett, Leonard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ravines Holding Co., LLC. (Adams, William)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by The Ravines Community Association, Inc.. (Smith, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint notice regarding selection of mediator due by 8/30/2019; Discovery deadline is by 1/31/2020; Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 2/28/2020; Conduct mediation hearing by 3/31/2020; Pretrial statement due by 7/16/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan; and, Bench Trial set for trial term commencing 8/3/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 D before Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/2/2019. (MD)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hackett, Leonard)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #6 Counterclaim, by The Ravines Community Association, Inc..(Hackett, Leonard) Modified on 4/29/2019 to edit text and create docket entry relationship. (TMC)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard Thomas Hackett on behalf of The Ravines Community Association, Inc. (Hackett, Leonard)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 The Ravines Community Association, Inc.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Ravines Holding Co., LLC's Counterclaims. Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant shall have up to and including 4/26/2019 to file a response to the Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of Ravines Holding Company, LLC (Doc. No. 6). Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 4/23/2019. (MDC)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Counterclaims, by The Ravines Community Association, Inc.. (Smith, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 4/23/2019 to edit text. (TMC)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against The Ravines Community Association, Inc. by Ravines Holding Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Adams, William)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel (Jeffrey Rood, Esq. for Plaintiff) of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (TMC)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Ravines Holding Co., LLC with Jury Demand filed by The Ravines Community Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Part 1, #3 Exhibit B - Part 2, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Filed in State Court on 02/28/2019)(TMC)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-345-J-33JRK. (SJB)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, case number 2019-CA-254 filed in State Court on 02/28/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15276387 filed by Ravines Holding Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A-1, #2 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A-2, #3 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A-3, #4 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit B, #5 State Court Other Documents Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Purdy, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Ravines Community Association, Inc. v. Ravines Holding Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravines Holding Co., LLC
Represented By: Lauren Vickroy Purdy
Represented By: William E. Adams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ravines Community Association, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Troy Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Rood
Represented By: Leonard Thomas Hackett
Represented By: Michael Andrew Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?