United States of America v. Real Property, Including All Improvements Thereon and Appurtenances Thereto, Located at 76437 Timber Creek Boulevard, Yulee, Nassau County, Florida 32097 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property, Including All Improvements Thereon and Appurtenances Thereto, Located at 76437 Timber Creek Boulevard, Yulee, Nassau County, Florida 32097, Real Property, Including All Improvements Thereon and Appurtenances Thereto, Located at 3240 S. Fletcher Avenue, Unit 445, Fernandina Beach, Nassau County, Florida 32034 and Real Property, Including All Improvements Thereon and Appurtenances Thereto, Located at 27488 Highway 129 South, Metter, Candler County, Georgia 30439
Claimant: Gretchen Camp and Richard Everett Camp, Jr.
Interested Party: Tax Commissioner of Candler County, Georgia
Case Number: 3:2019cv00346
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: official government internet site (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication March 29, 2019 - April 27, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Advertisement Details)(Glober, Bonnie)
May 10, 2019 Case Stayed. (JSG)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 motion to stay: this case is stayed until further Order and the Clerk shall administratively close the file. No later than 11/12/2019 the parties shall file a joint notice advising the Court of the status of the criminal cases against Richard Everett Camp, Jr., and against Gretchen Camp. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 5/10/2019. (SRW)
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding by Gretchen Camp, Richard Everett Camp, Jr. (DeMaggio, Bryan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF of service by United States of America, US Marshal 285 form for posting of property - 27488 Hway 129, S., Metter, Candler County, Ga. (Glober, Bonnie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Scott Fallgatter on behalf of Richard Everett Camp (Fallgatter, Curtis)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 CLAIM of Ownership by Richard Everett Camp. (Fallgatter, Curtis)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan E. DeMaggio on behalf of Gretchen Camp (DeMaggio, Bryan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 VERIFIED CLAIM by Gretchen Camp (DeMaggio, Bryan). Modified on 5/3/2019 to edit text (JSG).
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE of Purported Interested Party re #1 Complaint, #3 Notice of lis pendens filed by Patty Sikes, Tax Commissioner, Candler County, Georgia. (JSG) Modified on 4/23/2019 to edit text (JSG).
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF of service by United States of America as to 76437 Timber Creek Boulevard, Yulee, Nassau County, FL 32097 executed on 4/10/2019. (JSG)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF of service by United States of America as to 3240 S. Fletcher Avenue, Unit 445, Fernandina Beach, Nassau County, Florida 32034 executed on 4/10/2019. (JSG)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/29/2019. (MD)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Glober, Bonnie)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Glober, Bonnie)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Glober, Bonnie)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against all Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JSG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property, Including All Improvements Thereon and Appurtenances Thereto, Located at 76437 Timber Creek Boulevard, Yulee, Nassau County, Florida 32097 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property, Including All Improvements Thereon and Appurtenances Thereto, Located at 76437 Timber Creek Boulevard, Yulee, Nassau County, Florida 32097
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property, Including All Improvements Thereon and Appurtenances Thereto, Located at 3240 S. Fletcher Avenue, Unit 445, Fernandina Beach, Nassau County, Florida 32034
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property, Including All Improvements Thereon and Appurtenances Thereto, Located at 27488 Highway 129 South, Metter, Candler County, Georgia 30439
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bonnie Ames Glober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Gretchen Camp
Represented By: Jesse B. Wilkison
Represented By: Matthew R. Kachergus
Represented By: Camille Elizabeth Sheppard
Represented By: Bryan E. DeMaggio
Represented By: William J. Sheppard
Represented By: Elizabeth Louise White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Richard Everett Camp, Jr.
Represented By: Curtis Scott Fallgatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tax Commissioner of Candler County, Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?