Thomas v. State of Florida et al
Plaintiff: Andwele Thomas
Defendant: State Of Florida and Pegasus Mgt.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00365
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 6/25/2019. (JW)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to show cause why this case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 5/24/2019. (JW)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Reverse Eviction. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/23/2019. (JW)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 EMERGENCY MOTION to Reverse Eviction by Andwele Thomas. (BD)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's #8 Emergency Motion and #9 Motion to Stay at Current Residence. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/22/2019. (MMG)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay at Current Residence, to Overturn Eviction 24 hrs Order by Andwele Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION to Prevent Eviction by Andwele Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BD)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER striking Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before May 17, 2019. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/15/2019. (MMG)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER reminding Plaintiff of some of his responsibilities as a pro se litigant; directing Plaintiff to review and comply with the provisions of this Order, as well as the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rules of the Middle District of Florida, and any applicable statutes and regulations. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 4/8/2019. (BHC)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Andwele Thomas re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(RH)
April 5, 2019 FEES paid by Andwele Thomas (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number JAX030568) (AFC)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to either submit the $400.00 filing fee or complete and file the enclosed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, no later than 5/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 4/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs) (BHC)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Andwele Thomas by Andwele Thomas. (BD)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pegasus Mgt., State Of Florida with Jury Demand filed by Andwele Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(No IFP, no service copies)(BD) Modified text on 4/17/2019. ***STRICKEN pursuant to Order #7 (BD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. State of Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pegasus Mgt.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andwele Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?