Jeancharles v. Selene et al

Plaintiff: Kens Jeancharles
Defendant: Selene, Plaza Home Mortgage LLC and Selene Finance LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00396
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaza Home Mortgage LLC (Ruff, Michael) Modified text on 7/2/2019. (AEJ)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Pelkowski, Michael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Change Track Designation by Kens Jeancharles. (Pelkowski, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kens Jeancharles. (Pelkowski, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaza Home Mortgage LLC. (Ruff, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Lauren Solano on behalf of Selene Finance LP (Solano, Sara)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of compliance for Service of Notice of Designation Under Local Rule 3.05 by Kens Jeancharles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pelkowski, Michael)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.01 as to Sara L. Solano (signed by deputy clerk). (AEJ)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/24/2019. (CKS)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Selene Finance LP.(Simms-Petredis, Jacqueline)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-396-J-39JRK. (SJB)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court 4th Judicial Circuit in and for Duval County Florida, case number 16-2019-CA-001431 filed in State Court on 2/25/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15324785 filed by Selene. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Record)(Simms-Petredis, Jacqueline) Modified text on 4/8/2019. (AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeancharles v. Selene et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene
Represented By: Jacqueline Simms-Petredis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Home Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Michael Thomas Ruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance LP
Represented By: Jacqueline Simms-Petredis
Represented By: Sara Lauren Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kens Jeancharles
Represented By: Michael Joseph Pelkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?