Roor International BV et al v. Jay Chabila, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Jay Chabila, LLC and Ricky Jernigan
Case Number: 3:2019cv00400
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
2 Judge: Monte C Richardson
3 Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for default judgment against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Affidavit as to Damages, #3 Affidavit as to Value Damages, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sasson, Jamie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ricky Jernigan (KKH)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jay Chabila, LLC (KKH)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Jay Chabila, LLC, Ricky Jernigan by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Counsel contacted in regards to using the correct and complete case caption on all future pleadings. Modified on 6/28/2019 (KKH).
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 4/20/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Jay Chabila, LLC. (Sasson, Jamie)
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 5/17/2019 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct and complete case caption on all pleadings(TSW).
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 5/16/2019 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct case caption on all pleadings(TSW).
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 4/20/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Ricky Jernigan. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-400-J-20MCR. Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 4/10/2019. (MGG)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (RH)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Jay Chabila, LLC. (RH)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Ricky Jernigan. (RH)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. New case number: 3:19-cv-400-J-20PDB. Judge Marcia Morales Howard no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER reassigning this case to the Honorable Harvey E. Schlesinger for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/9/2019. (JW)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-400-J-34PDB. (SJB)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15328914) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Jay Chabila, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Chabila, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Jernigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?