Gilbert v. Jacksonville Police, State of Florida

Plaintiff: Kalvin Gilbert
Defendant: Jacksonville Police, State of Florida
Case Number: 3:2019cv00426
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #16 Motion for issuance filed by Jacksonville Police, State of Florida. (Pinkstaff, Tiffiny)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for issuance of memorandum of law in support of its' motion for issuance of a subpoena pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1783 (b) and 4 CFR 28.46 (b) (1) evidence supporting summary judgment motion rule 56 by Kalvin Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(PAM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Jacksonville Police, State of Florida re 13 Order (Pinkstaff, Tiffiny)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #9 Motion for summary judgment filed by Jacksonville Police, State of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pinkstaff, Tiffiny)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER: On or before July 11, 2019, Defendant shall file a notice informing the Court whether or not it agrees with the Case Management Report #12, filed by Plaintiff on June 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/1/2019. (AMP)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (AEJ)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kalvin Gilbert. (AEJ)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMARY JUDGMENT Notice re #9 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/17/2019. (AEJ)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for summary judgment by Kalvin Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Introduction, #2 Exhibit)(AEJ)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jacksonville Police, State of Florida. (Pinkstaff, Tiffiny)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jacksonville Police, State of Florida.(Safi, Tiffiny)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 05/14/2019 by Kalvin Gilbert as to Jacksonville Sheriff's Office. (AEJ)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 5/14/2019 by Kalvin Gilbert as to State of Florida c/o City of Jacksonville. (AEJ)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER advising pro se Plaintiff of some procedural rules with which he must comply. Plaintiff's proof of service due by 7/15/2019. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 5/13/2019. (RLS)
May 7, 2019 FEES paid by Kalvin Gilbert (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number JAX030773) (AFC)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER with directions to the Clerk and Plaintiff. Plaintiff's compliance due by 5/8/2019. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/17/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form)) (RLS)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacksonville Police, State of Florida filed by Kalvin Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (no IFP, no service copies)(AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. Jacksonville Police, State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacksonville Police, State of Florida
Represented By: Tiffiny Douglas Pinkstaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalvin Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?