Ritchie v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Palmer Ritchie
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00428
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Palmer Ritchie. Related case(s): No (Farrell, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Palmer Ritchie. (Farrell, Thomas)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Acree, William)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Acree, William)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/19/2019. (MD)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (JSG)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America; filing fee $400.00, receipt number JAX030614 filed by Palmer Ritchie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JSG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritchie v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: William Cleveland Acree, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palmer Ritchie
Represented By: Thomas M. Farrell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?