Burkett v. Hickory Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ronald Burkett
Defendant: Hickory Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00563
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to court interrogatories re: #5 Related case order and track 2 notice, 12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File by Ronald Burkett. (Ventura, Chanelle)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 the plaintiff's unopposed motion for more time to answer the Court's interrogatories. The plaintiff must answer the interrogatories by July 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on July 5, 2019. (ASL)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Answers to the Court's Interrogatories by Ronald Burkett. (Ventura, Chanelle)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Hickory Foods, Inc.. (Sharman, Joelle)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of change of address by Chanelle Ventura (Ventura, Chanelle)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Hickory Foods, Inc.. (Sharman, Joelle) Modified on 6/18/2019 (Notified counsel to use correct Judge's code on future filings) (BD).
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Hickory Foods, Inc.'s ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Hickory Foods, Inc..(Sharman, Joelle)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Ronald Burkett. (Ventura, Chanelle) Modified text on 5/31/2019. (Notified counsel to use complete case number including judges' codes on future filings) (BD).
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 - and FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Hickory Foods, Inc.. (BD)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-563-J-34PDB. (SJB)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of consent to join by Ronald Burkett, on behald of himself and those similarly situated re #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Burkett)(Ventura, Chanelle)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hickory Foods, Inc., a Florida for Profit Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15456907) filed by Ronald Burkett, on behald of himself and those similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Ventura, Chanelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burkett v. Hickory Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Burkett
Represented By: Chanelle Ventura
Represented By: Andrew Ross Frisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hickory Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Joelle C. Sharman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?