United States of America v. $3,749,960.40 seized from TD Ameritrade Account No. 942304361 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $42,000.00 seized from Sandy Spring Bank Account Number: 1678833001, $255,287.02 seized from UBS AG Account Number: UH-36477, $595,000.00 seized from Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, $171,756.76 seized from Sandy Spring Bank Account Number: 1678839001, $230,770.50 seized from TD Ameritrade Account Number: 88237106, $119,961.65 seized from SunTrust Bank Account Number: 1000245515605, $101,471.95 seized from Regions Bank Account Number: 103717402, $3,749,960.40 seized from TD Ameritrade Account No. 942304361, $210,381.25 seized from SunTrust Bank Account Number: 1000245515613, a 2013 Mercedes E-350 VIN Number: WDDHF2EBXDA741866, a 2016 Toyota Land Cruiser VIN Number: JTMCY7AJ8G4043834 and $155,194.79 seized from LPL Financial LLC Account Number: 3377-2394
Case Number: 3:2019cv00564
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 the motion by the United States to issue a warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 6/4/2019. (ABK)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (Glober, Bonnie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against $101,471.95 seized from Regions Bank Account Number: 103717402, $119,961.65 seized from SunTrust Bank Account Number: 1000245515605, $155,194.79 seized from LPL Financial LLC Account Number: 3377-2394, $171,756.76 seized from Sandy Spring Bank Account Number: 1678839001, $210,381.25 seized from SunTrust Bank Account Number: 1000245515613, $255,287.02 seized from UBS AG Account Number: UH-36477, $3,749,960.40 seized from TD Ameritrade Account No. 942304361, $42,000.00 seized from Sandy Spring Bank Account Number: 1678833001, $595,000.00 seized from Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, a 2013 Mercedes E-350 VIN Number: WDDHF2EBXDA741866, a 2016 Toyota Land Cruiser VIN Number: JTMCY7AJ8G4043834 filed by United States of America. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America.(Glober, Bonnie)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem as to defendant funds and vehicles by United States of America. (Glober, Bonnie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SJW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $3,749,960.40 seized from TD Ameritrade Account No. 942304361 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $42,000.00 seized from Sandy Spring Bank Account Number: 1678833001
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $255,287.02 seized from UBS AG Account Number: UH-36477
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $595,000.00 seized from Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $171,756.76 seized from Sandy Spring Bank Account Number: 1678839001
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $230,770.50 seized from TD Ameritrade Account Number: 88237106
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $119,961.65 seized from SunTrust Bank Account Number: 1000245515605
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $101,471.95 seized from Regions Bank Account Number: 103717402
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,749,960.40 seized from TD Ameritrade Account No. 942304361
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $210,381.25 seized from SunTrust Bank Account Number: 1000245515613
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: a 2013 Mercedes E-350 VIN Number: WDDHF2EBXDA741866
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: a 2016 Toyota Land Cruiser VIN Number: JTMCY7AJ8G4043834
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $155,194.79 seized from LPL Financial LLC Account Number: 3377-2394
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bonnie Ames Glober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?