Southeast Farms, Inc. v. Watkins, et al.
Plaintiff: Southeast Farms, Inc.
Defendant: Jonathan Insetta, Luke A Watkins and Southeast Farms, Inc., a Florida corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00565
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Luke A. Watkins (TMC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Luke A Watkins by Southeast Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support of Application)(DeFalco, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 05/24/2019 by Southeast Farms, Inc. as to Luke A Watkins. (DeFalco, Steven)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Jonathan Insetta and Luke A Watkins. (TMC)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Southeast Farms, Inc., a Florida corporation. (DeFalco, Steven)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Southeast Farms, Inc., a Florida corporation. (DeFalco, Steven)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases -Duval County Circuit Court, Case No. 2018-CA-8507-CV-E per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Southeast Farms, Inc., a Florida corporation. Related case(s): Yes (DeFalco, Steven)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Southeast Farms, Inc., a Florida corporation. (DeFalco, Steven)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:19-cv-565-J-32MCR. (SJB)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan Insetta, Luke A Watkins (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15459724) filed by Southeast Farms, Inc., a Florida corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices, #2 Exhibit B - Reparation Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeFalco, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeast Farms, Inc. v. Watkins, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Insetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke A Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Farms, Inc., a Florida corporation
Represented By: Steven M. DeFalco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeast Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. DeFalco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?