Martin v. Swisher International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stanley Martin
Defendant: Swisher International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00592
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Reply: defendant's reply brief, limited to 5 pages, shall be filed no later than 7/24/2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 7/5/2019. (SRW)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Swisher International, Inc.. (Wasser, Brent)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint with Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Stanley Martin. (Florin, Parker)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Notice of pendency of related cases Defendant's Notice of Pendency of Other Actions per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Swisher International, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Wasser, Brent)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Defendant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Swisher International, Inc.. (Wasser, Brent)
June 19, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Brent D. Wasser, appearing on behalf of Swisher International, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031070.) Related document: #12 MOTION for Stanford Glenn Wilson and Brent D. Wasser to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
June 19, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Stanford G. Wilson, appearing on behalf of Swisher International, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031070.) Related document: #12 MOTION for Stanford Glenn Wilson and Brent D. Wasser to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Motion to Proceed Pro Hac Vice. If Stanford G. Wilson, Esq. and Brent D. Wasser, Esq. have not already done so, they each shall immediately pay the admission fee and register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 6/18/2019. (RLS)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing by Swisher International, Inc. re #12 MOTION for Stanford Glenn Wilson to appear pro hac vice (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Kelly, Shannon). Modified on 6/17/2019 to edit text (JSG).
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Stanford Glenn Wilson and Brent D. Wasser to appear pro hac vice by Swisher International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(Kelly, Shannon). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 6/17/2019 to edit text (JSG).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Consented Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 6/28/2019 to respond to #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 6/14/2019. (RLS)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint with Memorandum of Law in Support by Stanley Martin. (Florin, Parker) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Stanley Martin. Related case(s): no (Florin, Parker)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Stanley Martin. (Florin, Parker)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint with Memorandum of Law in Support by Swisher International, Inc. (Kelly, Shannon). Modified on 6/10/2019 to edit text and docket entry relationship (JSG).
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Stanley Martin (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Florin, Parker). Modified on 5/30/2019 to edit text (JSG).
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Swisher International, Inc. (JSG)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-592-J-32JBT. (SJB)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Stanley Martin. (Florin, Parker)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Swisher International Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15483868) filed by Stanley Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Right to Sue)(Florin, Parker) Modified on 5/20/2019 to notify counsel's office to file Civil Cover Sheet (JSG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Swisher International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Martin
Represented By: Parker Young Florin
Represented By: Thomas D. Roebig, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor D. Roebig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swisher International, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon L. Kelly
Represented By: Brent D. Wasser
Represented By: Stanford G. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?