Crenshaw v. Swisher International Inc
Plaintiff: Steve Crenshaw
Defendant: Swisher International Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00594
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Corrigan
Referring Judge: Brian J Davis
2 Judge: Joel B Toomey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 21 Case Reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. New case number: 3:19-cv-594-J-32JBT. Judge Brian J. Davis no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TRANSFERRING this case to the Honorable Timothy J. Corrigan with his consent. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/9/2019. (AMP)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER: #18 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. On or before July 25, 2019, Defendant shall file a Reply, which shall not exceed five substantive pages. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/8/2019. (AMP)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Swisher International Inc. (Wasser, Brent)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Steve Crenshaw. (Florin, Parker)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Notice of pendency of related cases Defendant's Notice of Pendency of Other Actions per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Swisher International Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Wasser, Brent)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Defendant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Swisher International Inc. (Wasser, Brent)
June 19, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Brent D. Wasser, appearing on behalf of Swisher International Inc (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031071.) Related document: #12 MOTION for Brent David Wasser to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
June 19, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Stanford G. Wilson, appearing on behalf of Swisher International Inc (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX031071.) Related document: #12 MOTION for Brent David Wasser to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Motion to Proceed Pro Hac Vice. If Stanford G. Wilson, Esq. and Brent D. Wasser, Esq. have not already done so, they each shall immediately pay the admission fee and register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 6/18/2019. (RLS)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of filing the Certificate of Good Standing by Swisher International Inc re #12 MOTION for Brent David Wasser to appear pro hac vice (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Kelly, Shannon) Modified text on 6/17/2019. (AEJ)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Brent David Wasser to appear pro hac vice by Swisher International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(Kelly, Shannon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey.
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: #10 Plaintiff's Consented Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. On or before June 28, 2019, Plaintiff shall respond to #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Memorandum of Law in Support, or #7 the Motion to Dismiss will be treated as unopposed. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 6/14/2019. (AMP)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Memorandum of Law in Support by Steve Crenshaw. (Florin, Parker) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 6/14/2019 to edit text (PAM).
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Steve Crenshaw. (Florin, Parker) Modified on 6/14/2019 to edit text (PAM).
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Steve Crenshaw. Related case(s): no (Florin, Parker)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Memorandum of Law in Support by Swisher International Inc. (Kelly, Shannon)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Steve Crenshaw (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Florin, Parker) Modified text on 5/29/2019. (AEJ)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Swisher International Inc. (AEJ)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:19-cv-594-J-39JBT. (SJB)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Steve Crenshaw. (Florin, Parker)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Swisher International Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15483975) filed by Steve Crenshaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Right to Sue)(Florin, Parker) Modified on 5/23/2019 - spoke with counsel re civil cover sheet. (AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crenshaw v. Swisher International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Crenshaw
Represented By: Parker Young Florin
Represented By: Taylor D. Roebig
Represented By: Thomas D. Roebig, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swisher International Inc
Represented By: Shannon L. Kelly
Represented By: Brent D. Wasser
Represented By: Stanford G. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?